Walker Digital LLC v. Facebook Inc. Featured Case

Techcrunch: Facebook Sued For Having Privacy Controls In Place. Yes, Seriously.

Plaintiff: Walker Digital LLC
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv01026
Filed: November 24, 2010
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2011 20 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,884,272;. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation of dismissal)(lid)
July 18, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED- re 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 7/18/2011. (lid)
July 18, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED- re 18 STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 7/14/2011. Signed by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 7/18/2011. (lid)
July 15, 2011 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice, by Facebook Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Herrmann, Richard) Modified on 7/18/2011 (nms).
July 12, 2011 18 STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 22, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. 17 Stipulation for extention of time for DefendantFacebook, Inc. to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Walker Digital, LLC's Complaint filed by Facebook Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 7/11/2011. Signed by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 6/22/2011. (dlk)
June 21, 2011 17 Joint STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to and including July 11, 2011 by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 13, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to June 21, 2011 filed by Walker Digital LLC, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 6/21/2011. Signed by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 6/13/2011. (dlk)
June 13, 2011 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to June 21, 2011 - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
June 7, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED- re 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint until June 9, 2011. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 6/9/2011. Signed by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 6/7/2011. (lid)
June 3, 2011 15 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint until June 9, 2011, by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven) Modified on 6/6/2011 (nms).
May 11, 2011 14 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Amy A. Quinlan as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer with firm. (Herrmann, Richard)
April 18, 2011 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 6/3/2011. (dlk)
April 18, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Facebook to respond to complaint to June 3, 2011 filed by Walker Digital LLC, Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 4/18/2011. (dlk)
April 15, 2011 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to complaint to June 3, 2011 - filed by Facebook Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
April 4, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED D. I. 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to complaint to April 15, 2011 filed by Walker Digital LLC, Facebook Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 4/15/2011.. Signed by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 4/4/42011. (dlk)
April 1, 2011 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to complaint to April 15, 2011 - filed by Facebook Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
March 21, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to complaint to April 4, 2011 filed by Walker Digital LLC, Facebook Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 4/4/2011.. Signed by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 3/21/2011. (dlk)
March 18, 2011 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to complaint to April 4, 2011 - filed by Facebook Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
March 1, 2011 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 3/18/2011. (dlk)
March 1, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to complaint to March 18, 2011 filed by Walker Digital LLC, Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 3/1/2011. (dlk)
February 28, 2011 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to complaint to March 18, 2011 - filed by Facebook Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
February 15, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to February 28, 2011 - Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 2/28/2011. Signed by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 2/14/11. (rwc)
February 14, 2011 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to Complaint to February 28, 2011 - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
January 19, 2011 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 2/14/2011. (dlk)
January 18, 2011 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Facebook Inc. to respond to complaint to February 14, 2011 filed by Walker Digital LLC, Facebook Inc.. Signed by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 1/18/2011. (dlk)
January 14, 2011 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to complaint to February 14, 2011 - filed by Facebook Inc., Walker Digital LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
December 23, 2010 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Evan M. Rosenbaum,Francisco A. Villegas,Damir Cefo,Sandra C. McCallion,Karen H. Bromberg for Walker Digital LLC added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
December 17, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karen H. Bromberg, Sandra C. McCallion, Francisco A. Villegas, Damir Cefo, and Evan M. Rosenbaum filed by Walker Digital LLC. Ordered by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 12/17/2010. (dlk)
December 16, 2010 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karen H. Bromberg, Sandra C. McCallion, Francisco A. Villegas, Damir Cefo, and Evan M. Rosenbaum - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Herrmann, Richard) (Main Document 7 replaced on 12/17/2010) (dlk).
December 16, 2010 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to January 14, 2011 filed by Walker Digital LLC, Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 1/14/2011. Signed by Judge Berle M. Schiller on 12/16/10. (fms)
December 13, 2010 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to January 14, 2011 - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Herrmann, Richard)
December 8, 2010 Case Assigned to Judge Berle M. Schiller of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship). Please include the initials of the Judge (BMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (Courtesy copies of filings should be sent to the chambers of the assigned Judge). (rjb)
December 3, 2010 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Walker Digital LLC. Walker Digital LLC served on 11/24/2010, answer due 12/15/2010. (Herrmann, Richard)
November 24, 2010 Summons Issued as to Facebook Inc. on 11/24/2010. (dzs, )
November 24, 2010 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Walker Digital LLC. (dzs, )
November 24, 2010 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,884,272;. (dzs, )
November 24, 2010 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dzs, )
November 24, 2010 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Facebook Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-813146.) - filed by Walker Digital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dzs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker Digital LLC v. Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walker Digital LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?