Nokia Corporation v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Nokia Corporation
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Counter_claimant: Apple Inc.
Counter_defendant: Nokia Corporation and Nokia Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00015
Filed: January 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2011 Filing 78 MOTION to Stay (DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §1659(a)) - filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, David)
February 14, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Cynthia D. Vreeland for Apple Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
February 8, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Louis W. Tompros for Apple Inc. added for electronic noticing. (nms)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 77 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Lee, Dominic E. Massa, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Louis W. Tompros, Christopher R. Noyes, Mark D. Selwyn and Keith L. Slenkovich of WilmerHale filed by Apple Inc.. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/28/2011. (nms)
January 26, 2011 Filing 77 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William F. Lee, Dominic E. Massa, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Louis W. Tompros, Christopher R. Noyes, Mark D. Selwyn and Keith L. Slenkovich of WilmerHale - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
January 26, 2011 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by David Ellis Moore on behalf of Apple Inc. (Moore, David)
January 26, 2011 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Horwitz on behalf of Apple Inc. (Horwitz, Richard)
January 12, 2011 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (bkb)
January 10, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack B. Blumenfeld on behalf of Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
January 10, 2011 Remark: SEALED documents (D.I. Nos. 46-47) received from USDC/WD/WI on 1/10/11. (fms)
January 6, 2011 Filing 73 Local Counsel Letter sent to Allyson J. Portney. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/10/2011. (fms)
January 6, 2011 Filing 72 Local Counsel Letter sent to Keith L. Slenkovich. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/10/2011. (fms)
January 6, 2011 Filing 71 Local Counsel Letter sent James Donald Peterson. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/10/2011. (fms)
January 6, 2011 Filing 70 Local Counsel Letter sent to John Scheller. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/10/2011. (fms)
January 6, 2011 Filing 69 Local Counsel Letter sent to Byron Holz. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/10/2011. (fms)
January 6, 2011 Filing 68 Record of case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number in Other District: 3:10-cv-00249. Copy of Docket Sheet attached.
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by Defendant Apple, Inc., granting 12 Motion to Transfer to the District of Delaware by Defendant Apple Inc. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/4/2011. (arw) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 64 Motion to Admit Bruce J. Rose, S. Benjamin Pleune, Ross R. Barton, Jessica J. Sibley, Dwayne C. Norton, Brady Cox and Marsha Mullin Pro Hac Vice. Bruce J. Rose,Scott Benjamin Pleune,Jessica J Sibley,Dwayne C. Norton,Brady Cox and Marsha Mullin for Nokia Corporation and Nokia Inc. admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/30/10. (rep) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 21, 2010 Filing 65 Declaration of John C. Scheller filed by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendant Nokia Inc. re: 64 Motion to Admit Bruce J. Rose, S. Benjamin Pleune, Ross R. Barton, Jessica J. Sibley, Dwayne C. Norton, Brady Cox, Marsha Mullin Pro Hac Vice filed by Nokia Inc., Nokia Corporation (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 21, 2010 Filing 64 Motion to Admit Bruce J. Rose, S. Benjamin Pleune, Ross R. Barton, Jessica J. Sibley, Dwayne C. Norton, Brady Cox, Marsha Mullin Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendant Nokia Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Scheller, John) Modified on 12/22/2010 (jas/t). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 20, 2010 Filing 63 Declaration of William C. Simpson filed by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendant Nokia Inc. re: 58 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendant Nokia Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - CV) (Newton, Michael) Modified docket text on 12/22/2010 (jas/p). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 20, 2010 Filing 62 Declaration of David T. Blaauw filed by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendant Nokia Inc. re: 58 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendant Nokia Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - CV) (Newton, Michael) Modified docket text on 12/22/2010 (jas/p). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 20, 2010 Filing 61 Declaration of Allyson J. Portney filed by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc. re: 55 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - November 6, 2002 Office Action and January 17, 2003 Amendment in Response from the prosecution history of United States Patent No. 6,603,431, # 2 Exhibit B - March 25, 2003 Notice of Allowability from the prosecution history of United States Patent No. 6,603,431 File History, # 3 Exhibit C - January 19, 2001 Office Action and April 5, 2001 Amendment in Response from the prosecution history of United States Patent No. 6,348,894, # 4 Exhibit D - September 22, 2005 Notice of Allowance from the prosecution history of United States Patent No. 7,532,680, # 5 Exhibit E - December 27, 2005 Preliminary Amendment from the prosecution history of United States Patent No. 7,532,680, # 6 Exhibit F - Cited Reference, M. Soviero, Your World According to Newton, Popular Science, September 1992, from the prosecution history of United States Patent No. 5,612,719, # 7 Exhibit G - May 28, 1993 Office Action and August 30, 1993 Response from the prosecution history of United States Patent No. 5,612,719, # 8 Exhibit H - November 15, 1993 Office Action and January 18, 1994 Response from the prosecution history of United States Patent No. 5,612,719, # 9 Exhibit I - November 28, 1995 Office Action and July 9, 1996 Response from the prosecution history of United States Patent No. 5,612,719, # 10 Exhibit J - July 7, 1994 Office Action and October 21, 1994 Response from the prosecution history of United States Patent No. 5,612,719, # 11 Exhibit K - September 27, 1996 Office Action and November 5, 1996 Response from the prosecution history of United States Patent No. 5,612,719, # 12 Exhibit L - Declaration of Daniel Sievenpiper, Ph.D, # 13 Exhibit M - Declaration of Patrick Fay, # 14 Exhibit N - Declaration of Michael Braasch, Ph.D, # 15 Exhibit O - Excerpt from 1st Edition of Websters Dictionary) (Massa, Dominic) Modified exhibit descriptions and docket text on 12/20/2010 (jas/p). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 20, 2010 Filing 60 Claims Construction Initial Brief re: 55 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc. (Massa, Dominic) Modified docket text on 12/20/2010 (jas/p). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 17, 2010 Filing 59 Claims Construction Initial Brief re: 58 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendant Nokia Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1.U.S. Patent No. 5,946,647, # 2 Exhibit 2.U.S. Patent No. 5,612,719, # 3 Exhibit 3.Excerpts from Helander, Martin et. al, Handbook of Human-Computer Interaction 2nd Ed. (1997), # 4 Exhibit 4.Nokia N900 Device Details webpage, # 5 Exhibit 5.Excerpts from Nokia N900 User Guide, # 6 Exhibit 6.Nokia N8 Device Details webpage, # 7 Exhibit 7.Excerpts from Nokia N8 User Guide, # 8 Exhibit 8.Excerpts from The American Heritage Dictionary of the English Language (1976), # 9 Exhibit 9.U.S. Patent No. 5,398,310, # 10 Exhibit 10.U.S. Patent No. 5,588,105, # 11 Exhibit 11.U.S. Patent No. 5,523,775, # 12 Exhibit 12.Office Action issued during prosecution of the 719 Patent dated September 7, 1994, # 13 Exhibit 13.U.S. Patent No. 4,139,837, # 14 Exhibit 14.Response to Office Action filed during prosecution of the 719 Patent dated October 24, 1994, # 15 Exhibit 15.Office Action issued during prosecution of the 719 Patent dated April 9, 1996, # 16 Exhibit 16.U.S. Patent No. 5,347,295, # 17 Exhibit 17.Response to Office Action filed during prosecution of the 719 Patent dated July 9, 1996, # 18 Exhibit 18.U.S. Patent No. 7,760,559, # 19 Exhibit 19.Declaration of Dr. David T. Blaauw dated December 17, 2010, # 20 Exhibit 20.Intel PXA27x Processor Family Datasheet (2005), # 21 Exhibit 21.Intel PXA27x Processor Family Developers Manual (April 2004), # 22 Exhibit 22.Office Action issued during prosecution of the 559 Patent dated September 10, 2007, # 23 Exhibit 23.Response to Office Action filed during prosecution of the 559 Patent dated November 29, 2007, # 24 Exhibit 24.U.S. Patent No. 7,380,116, # 25 Exhibit 25.Office Action issued during prosecution of the 116 Patent dated April 20, 2007, # 26 Exhibit 26.Amendment filed during prosecution of the 116 Patent dated July 20, 2007, # 27 Exhibit 27.Declaration of William C. Simpson dated December 16, 2010, # 28 Exhibit 28.Excerpts from Websters 9th New Collegiate Dictionary (1983), # 29 Exhibit 29.U.S. Patent No. 7,054,981, # 30 Exhibit 30.Office Action issued during prosecution of the 981 Patent dated November 5, 2004, # 31 Exhibit 31.Amendment A filed during prosecution of the 981 Patent dated March 4, 2005, # 32 Exhibit 32.Amendment B filed during prosecution of the 981 Patent dated August 19, 2005, # 33 Exhibit 33.Patent Examiners Amendment and Interview Summary issued during prosecution of the 981 Patent dated December 28, 2005, # 34 Exhibit 34.U.S. Patent No. 7,532,680, # 35 Exhibit 35.U.S. Patent No. 5,117,201, # 36 Exhibit 36.U.S. Statutory Invention Registration H965, # 37 Exhibit 37.CML Semiconductor Products FX009A Datasheet (July 1994), # 38 Exhibit 38.Analog Devices AD8320 Datasheet (1998), # 39 Exhibit 39.U.S. Patent No. 5,752,172, # 40 Exhibit 40.U.S. Patent No. 6,603,431, # 41 Exhibit 41.U.S. Patent No. 6,348,894, # 42 Exhibit 42.Excerpt from The Compact Edition of the Oxford English Dictionary, Vol. 1 (1971), # 43 Exhibit 43.U.S. Patent No. 6,317,083, # 44 Exhibit 44.U.S. Patent No. 7,558,696) (Newton, Michael) Modified docket text on 12/20/2010 (jas). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 17, 2010 Filing 58 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendant Nokia Inc. (Newton, Michael) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 17, 2010 Filing 57 Disregard; see 61 . Modified on 12/20/2010 (jas). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 17, 2010 Filing 56 Disregard; see 60 . Modified on 12/20/2010 (jas). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 17, 2010 Filing 55 Motion Requesting Claims Construction by Counter Claimants Apple, Inc., Defendant Apple, Inc. (Massa, Dominic) Modified on 12/20/2010 (jas/t). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 52 Motion to Admit Allyson Portney Pro Hac Vice. Allyson J. Portney for Apple, Inc. admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 12/10/10. (rep) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 7, 2010 Filing 53 Declaration of Allyson J. Portney filed by Defendant Apple, Inc. re: 52 Motion to Admit Allyson J. Portney Pro Hac Vice filed by Apple, Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
December 7, 2010 Filing 52 Motion to Admit Allyson J. Portney Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Apple, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 CM/ECF Registration Form) (Peterson, James) Modified docket text on 12/8/2010 (jas). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
November 16, 2010 Filing 51 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Delaware by Defendant Apple, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Apple Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Transfer Venue to the District of Delaware) (Peterson, James) Modified docket text on 11/17/2010 (jas). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
November 3, 2010 Filing 50 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Supplemental Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A to Supplemental Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit B to Supplemental Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit C to Supplemental Memorandum) (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **On October 19, 2010, the court held a telephonic hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel discovery (dkt. 45 ). After hearing from both sides, the court denied the motion. Prior to plaintiff's motion, defendant had agreed to provide the relevant information on product design, including design changes. Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(b)(1), the information requested by plaintiff in its motion is not relevant to plaintiff's claims or defenses; such information is barely relevant to the subject matter involved in the action, and plaintiff certainly did not show good cause for disclosure. Pursuant to Rule 26(b)(2)(C)(iii), any hypothetical benefit of this information articulated by plaintiff--for damages, impeachment, whatever--is significantly outweighed by the burden on defendant of dragging defendant's response to "Antennagate" into a lawsuit that alleges infringement of structural patents. The parties should continue their prompt and cordial exchange of discovery and they should not hesitate to file appropriate discovery motions with the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/19/10. (rep) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
October 19, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Motion Hearing held on 10/19/2010 [:20] (cak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
October 15, 2010 Filing 48 Reply to Counterclaim by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation. (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
October 15, 2010 Filing 47 SEALED Brief in Opposition by Defendant Apple Inc. re: 45 Motion to Compel filed by Nokia Inc., Nokia Corporation (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- 2010-08-10 Order No. 35 Denying MTC, # 2 Exhibit B -- 2010-10-08 MDL Order, # 3 Exhibit C -- '431 patent, # 4 Exhibit D -- '894 patent, # 5 Exhibit E -- '083 patent) (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.] Modified on 1/6/2011 (fms).
October 8, 2010 Filing 46 SEALED Brief in Support by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendants Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc. re: 45 Motion to Compel filed by Nokia Inc., Nokia Corporation (Sealed Document) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - iPhone 4 Letter, # 2 Exhibit B - Portions of iPhone 4 Press Conference, # 3 Exhibit C - Apple Antenna Schedule Update, # 4 Exhibit D - N90 Design Review, # 5 Exhibit E - Apple's Antenna Designs and Test Labs, # 6 Exhibit F - Nokia's First Notice of Deposition to Apple, # 7 Exhibit G - Apple's Objections and Responses to Nokia's Notice of Deposition, # 8 Hill Deposition Transcript) (Scheller, John) Modified on 10/13/2010 to clarify docket text. (lak)[Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.] Modified on 1/6/2011 (fms).
October 8, 2010 Filing 45 Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendants Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 10/15/2010. (Scheller, John) Modified on 10/13/2010 to clean up docket text. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
October 1, 2010 Filing 44 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc. by Defendant Apple Inc., Counter Defendants Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent No 5,946,647, # 2 Exhibit B - US Patent No 5,612,719, # 3 Exhibit C - US Patent No 7,710,290, # 4 Exhibit D - US Patent No 7,380,116, # 5 Exhibit E - US Patent No 7,054,981, # 6 Exhibit F - US Patent No 5,379,430, # 7 Exhibit G - US Patent No 7,760,559) (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
September 17, 2010 Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Apple Inc., filed by Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,373,345, # 2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 7,558,696, # 3 Exhibit C - US Patent No. 6,317,083, # 4 Exhibit D - US Patent No. 6,348,894, # 5 Exhibit E - US Patent No. 6,603,431, # 6 Exhibit F - US Patent No. 7,532,680, # 7 Exhibit G - US Patent No. 5,752,172) (Koppelman, Ryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **The parties' stipulated protective order (dkt. 41 ) is accepted and entered with these edits to paragraph 2.3: the phrase "the Designating Party believes in good faith" and "believes in good faith" are deleted in order to make the definition of "confidential" objective, as required by circuit law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/14/10. (rep) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
September 14, 2010 Filing 41 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation. (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 30, 2010 Filing 40 Reply to Counterclaim by Counter Defendants Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc.. (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 16, 2010 Filing 39 Amended ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc. by Defendant Apple Inc., Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendants Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A U.S. Patent Nos. 5,946,647, # 2 Exhibit B US Patent No 5,612,719, # 3 Exhibit C US Patent No 7,710,290, # 4 Exhibit D US Patent No 7,380,116, # 5 Exhibit E US Patent No 7,054,981, # 6 Exhibit F US Patent No 5,379,430, # 7 Exhibit G US Patent No 7,760,559) (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 26 Motion to Admit Keith Slenkovich Pro Hac Vice. Keith L. Slenkovich for Apple Inc. admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/16/10. (rep) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 26 Motion to Admit William F. Lee, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Dominic E. Massa, Mark D. Selwyn, Anna T. Lee, Joel Cavanaugh, Louis W. Tompros and Christopher R. Noyes Pro Hac Vice. William F. Lee, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Dominic E. Massa, Mark D. Selwyn, Anna T. Lee, Joel Cavanaugh, Louis W. Tompros and Christopher Noyes for Apple Inc. admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/6/2010. (arw) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 6, 2010 Filing 36 Pretrial Conference Order - Amendments to Pleadings due 9/17/2010. Motions Requesting Claims Construction due 12/17/2010. Claims Construction Response Brief due 1/24/2011. Claims Construction Hearing set for 2/4/2011 at 09:00 AM. Dispositive Motions due 6/10/2011. Settlement Letters due 11/22/2011. Motions in Limine due 12/2/2011. Response to Motion due 12/12/2011. Final Pretrial Submissions due 12/14/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2011 at 02:00 PM Jury Selection and Trial set for 1/9/2012 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/4/2010. (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 6, 2010 Filing 35 Declaration of Christopher R. Noyes filed by Counter Claimant Apple Inc., Defendant Apple Inc. re: 26 Motion to Admit William F. Lee, Keith Slenkovich, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Domonic E. Massa, Mark D. Selwyn, Anna T. Lee, Joel Cavanaugh, Louis W. Tompros, and Christopher R. Noyes Pro Hac Vice filed by Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 6, 2010 Filing 34 Declaration of Louis W. Tompros filed by Counter Claimant Apple Inc., Defendant Apple Inc. re: 26 Motion to Admit William F. Lee, Keith Slenkovich, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Domonic E. Massa, Mark D. Selwyn, Anna T. Lee, Joel Cavanaugh, Louis W. Tompros, and Christopher R. Noyes Pro Hac Vice filed by Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 6, 2010 Filing 33 Declaration of Joel Cavanaugh filed by Counter Claimant Apple Inc., Defendant Apple Inc. re: 26 Motion to Admit William F. Lee, Keith Slenkovich, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Domonic E. Massa, Mark D. Selwyn, Anna T. Lee, Joel Cavanaugh, Louis W. Tompros, and Christopher R. Noyes Pro Hac Vice filed by Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 6, 2010 Filing 32 Declaration of Anna T. Lee filed by Counter Claimant Apple Inc., Defendant Apple Inc. re: 26 Motion to Admit William F. Lee, Keith Slenkovich, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Domonic E. Massa, Mark D. Selwyn, Anna T. Lee, Joel Cavanaugh, Louis W. Tompros, and Christopher R. Noyes Pro Hac Vice filed by Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 6, 2010 Filing 31 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn filed by Counter Claimant Apple Inc., Defendant Apple Inc. re: 26 Motion to Admit William F. Lee, Keith Slenkovich, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Domonic E. Massa, Mark D. Selwyn, Anna T. Lee, Joel Cavanaugh, Louis W. Tompros, and Christopher R. Noyes Pro Hac Vice filed by Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 6, 2010 Filing 30 Declaration of Dominic E. Massa filed by Counter Claimant Apple Inc., Defendant Apple Inc. re: 26 Motion to Admit William F. Lee, Keith Slenkovich, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Domonic E. Massa, Mark D. Selwyn, Anna T. Lee, Joel Cavanaugh, Louis W. Tompros, and Christopher R. Noyes Pro Hac Vice filed by Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 6, 2010 Filing 29 Declaration of Cynthia D. Vreeland filed by Counter Claimant Apple Inc., Defendant Apple Inc. re: 26 Motion to Admit William F. Lee, Keith Slenkovich, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Domonic E. Massa, Mark D. Selwyn, Anna T. Lee, Joel Cavanaugh, Louis W. Tompros, and Christopher R. Noyes Pro Hac Vice filed by Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 6, 2010 Filing 28 Declaration of Keith L. Slenkovich filed by Counter Claimant Apple Inc., Defendant Apple Inc. re: 26 Motion to Admit William F. Lee, Keith Slenkovich, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Domonic E. Massa, Mark D. Selwyn, Anna T. Lee, Joel Cavanaugh, Louis W. Tompros, and Christopher R. Noyes Pro Hac Vice filed by Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 6, 2010 Filing 27 Declaration of William F. Lee filed by Counter Claimant Apple Inc., Defendant Apple Inc. re: 26 Motion to Admit William F. Lee, Keith Slenkovich, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Domonic E. Massa, Mark D. Selwyn, Anna T. Lee, Joel Cavanaugh, Louis W. Tompros, and Christopher R. Noyes Pro Hac Vice filed by Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 6, 2010 Filing 26 Motion to Admit William F. Lee, Keith Slenkovich, Cynthia D. Vreeland, Dominic E. Massa, Mark D. Selwyn, Anna T. Lee, Joel Cavanaugh, Louis W. Tompros, and Christopher R. Noyes Pro Hac Vice by Counter Claimant Apple Inc., Defendant Apple Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: # 1 CM/ECF Registration forms) (Peterson, James) Modified on 8/6/2010; corrected spelling of first name from Domonic to Dominic Massa per filer call. (mmo). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
August 3, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 8/3/2010 [:18] (cak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
July 30, 2010 Filing 25 Brief in Reply in Support re: 12 Motionto Transfer to District of Delaware filed by Apple Inc. (Cahill, Bryan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
July 30, 2010 Filing 24 Certificate of Service by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendants Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc. re 23 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
July 29, 2010 Filing 23 Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Report by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Claimant Apple Inc., Counter Defendants Nokia Corporation, Nokia Inc., Defendant Apple Inc. (Newton, Michael) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
July 20, 2010 Filing 22 Declaration of Coby S. Nixon filed by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation in Support of Brief in Opposition to Dkt 12 re: 12 Motionto Transfer to District of Delaware filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint dated 10-22-09, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Apple's First Amended Answer, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Joint Status Report 3-8-10, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 854 Patent - Order Granting Request, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 105 Patent-Order Granting Request, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 703 Patent-Order Granting Request, # 7 Exhibit 7 - 074 Patent-Order Granting Request, # 8 Exhibit 8 - 381 Patent-Order Granting Request, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Filing Date-Apple 034, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Filing Date-Apple 795, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of Filing Date-453 Patent, # 12 Exhibit 12 - 3-11-10 Nokia's Motion to Dismiss, # 13 Exhibit 13 - 7-2-10 Nokia's Opening Brief, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Nokia's First Proposed Amended Complaint, # 15 Exhibit 15 - 4-30-10 Scheduling Order, # 16 Exhibit 16 - 701 Complaint 12-29-09, # 17 Exhibit 17 - 12-29-10 Complaint 1002, # 18 Exhibit 18 - 704 Complaint 1-15-10, # 19 Exhibit 19 - 2-12-10 Stipulation and Order to Stay, # 20 Exhibit 20 - 1002 3-3-10 Stipulation and Order to Stay, # 21 Exhibit 21 - 5-24-10 Motion to Consolidate, # 22 Exhibit 22 - 6-21-10 Answering Brief, # 23 Exhibit 23 - 6-21-10 HTC's Answering Brief in Opposition, # 24 Exhibit 24 - Judicial Case Load Profile - Delaware, # 25 Exhibit 25 - Judicial Case Load Profile - WD Wis, # 26 Exhibit 26 - First Amended Complaint - Apple v. Creative Labs, # 27 Exhibit 27 - Complaint in Apple v HTC 10-166, # 28 Exhibit 28 - Complaint in Apple v. HTC 10-544, # 29 Exhibit 29 - Complaint in Apple v. HTC 10-167, # 30 Exhibit 30 - Nokia Counterclaims in Qualcomm v Nokia, # 31 Exhibit 31 - Nokia's Motion to Transfer, # 32 Exhibit 32 - US 6373345, # 33 Exhibit 33 - US 6359904) (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
July 20, 2010 Filing 21 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation re: 12 Motionto Transfer to District of Delaware filed by Apple Inc. (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
July 20, 2010 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
July 19, 2010 Filing 19 Reply to Counterclaim by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Counter Defendant Nokia Corporation. (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
July 15, 2010 Filing 18 Affidavit of Service by Counter Claimant Apple Inc. Counter Defendant Nokia Inc. served on 7/9/2010, answer due 7/30/2010. (Peterson, James) Modified on 7/16/2010. (arw) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
July 2, 2010 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Nokia Inc. (rep) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
July 2, 2010 Filing 16 Request for Issuance of Summons by Counter Claimant Apple Inc.. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
June 29, 2010 Filing 15 Declaration of Mark Bentley filed by Defendant Apple Inc. re: 12 Motionto Transfer to District of Delaware filed by Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
June 29, 2010 Filing 14 Declaration of Mark Selwyn filed by Defendant Apple Inc. re: 12 Motionto Transfer to District of Delaware filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2007-06-25 Nokia Reply Memo in Support of Motion to Transfer 07-c-187, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Nokia Fights Back Guardian 2009, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - 2009-10-22 Complaint 09-cv-791 and Exhibits A, B, F, G and H, # 4 Exhibit 4 - 2010-02-19 Apple's 1st Amended Answer Defenses Counterclaims 09-cv-791, # 5 Exhibit 5 - 2009-12-29 Complaint & attached exhibits 09-cv-1002, # 6 Exhibit 6 - 2009-12-29 Apple ITC Complaint 337-TA-701, # 7 Exhibit 7 - 2010-02-24 Apple's Answer Defenses Counterclaims 09-cv-1002, # 8 Exhibit 8 - 2010-01-15 Complaint of Apple 337-TA-704, # 9 Exhibit 9 - 2010-05-03 Scheduling Order - entire docket 09-cv-791, # 10 Exhibit 10 - 2010-05-24 Motion to Consolidate 09-cv-791, # 11 Exhibit 11- 2010-05-24 Motin for Consolidation 09-cv-1002, # 12 Exhibit 12 - 2010-05-24 Motion to Consolidate 10-cv-166, # 13 Exhibit 13 - 2010-05-24 Motion to Consolidate 10-cv-167, # 14 Exhibit 14 - 2007-05-24 Nokia Memo in Support of Motion to Transfer 07-cv-0187) (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
June 29, 2010 Filing 13 Brief in Support by Defendant Apple Inc. re: 12 Motionto Transfer to District of Delaware filed by Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
June 29, 2010 Filing 12 Motion to Transfer to District of Delaware by Defendant Apple Inc. Brief in Opposition due 7/20/2010. Brief in Reply due 7/30/2010. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
June 28, 2010 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Apple Inc. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
June 28, 2010 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Nokia Corporation by Defendant Apple Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent No 5,946,647, # 2 Exhibit B - US Patent No 5,612,719, # 3 Exhibit C - US Patent No 7,710,290, # 4 Exhibit D - US Patent No 7,380,116, # 5 Exhibit E - US Patent No 7,054,981, # 6 Exhibit F - US Patent No 5,379,430, # 7 Exhibit G - US Patent No 7,355,905) (Peterson, James) Modified on 7/16/2010 (arw). [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 5 Motion to Admit Michael Newton, Jason Cook, Stacey White, Patrick Flinn, John Haynes, Joseph Gleason, Ryan Koppelman, Coby Nixon, Stephen McNiff, and Byron Holz Pro Hac Vice. Michael John Newton, Jason W. Cook, Stacey G. White, Patrick J. Flinn, John D. Haynes, Joseph J. Gleason, Ryan Koppelman, Coby Nixon, Stephen McNiff, and Byron Holz for Nokia Corporation admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/28/10. (rep) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Apple Inc. answer due 6/28/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 5/28/10. (rep) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
May 27, 2010 Filing 7 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Apple Inc..Response due 6/3/2010. (Peterson, James) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
May 13, 2010 Filing 6 Declaration of John C. Scheller filed by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation re: 5 Motion to Admit Michael J. Newton, Jason W. Cook, Stacey G. White, Patrick J. Flinn, John D. Haynes, Joseph J. Gleason, Ryan W. Koppelman, Coby S. Nixon, Stephen G. McNiff, and Byron Holz Pro Hac Vice filed by Nokia Corporation (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
May 13, 2010 Filing 5 Motion to Admit Michael J. Newton, Jason W. Cook, Stacey G. White, Patrick J. Flinn, John D. Haynes, Joseph J. Gleason, Ryan W. Koppelman, Coby S. Nixon, Stephen G. McNiff, and Byron Holz Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation. (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
May 10, 2010 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation, Defendant Apple Inc.. Apple Inc. served on 5/7/2010, answer due 5/28/2010. (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.] (fms).
May 7, 2010 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. (vob) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
May 7, 2010 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Nokia Corporation (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]
May 7, 2010 Filing 1 PATENT COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 07580000000000547132.) PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # US 6,373,345, issued 04/16/02, held by Nokia Corporation ; Patent # US 7,558,696, issued 07/07/09, held by Nokia Corporation ; Patent # US 6,317,083, issued 11/13/01, held by Nokia Corporation ; Patent # US 6,348,894, issued 02/19/02, held by Nokia Corporation ; Patent # US 6,603,431, issued 08/05/03, held by Nokia Corporation;, filed by Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 6,373,345, # 2 Exhibit B - US 7,558,696, # 3 Exhibit C - US 6,317,083, # 4 Exhibit D - US 6,348,894, # 5 Exhibit E - US 6,603,431, # 6 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons, # 8 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Scheller, John) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 1/6/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nokia Corporation v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nokia Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Louis W. Tompros
Represented By: Cynthia D. Vreeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Nokia Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Nokia Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?