Nokia Corporation et al v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Nokia Corporation and Intellisync Corporation
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00259
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/25/2011. (asw)
May 19, 2011 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 5/25/2011. (asw)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 25, 2011 filed by Apple Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/19/2011. (asw)
May 18, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay (DEFENDANT APPLE INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §1659(a) - filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, David)
May 18, 2011 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 25, 2011 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 18, 2011 filed by Apple Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Apple Inc. answer due 5/18/2011.Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/18/11. (mmm)
April 15, 2011 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 18, 2011 - filed by Apple Inc.. (Moore, David)
April 6, 2011 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 5, 2011 Filing 5 DECLARATION OF MAILING (as to service on Apple Inc.) by Intellisync Corporation, Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A & B)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 29, 2011 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,209,911; 6,212,529; 6,141,664; 6,445,932; 5,898,740; 7,319,874;. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
March 28, 2011 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Intellisync Corporation, Nokia Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Nokia Corporation for Intellisync Corporation. (els)
March 28, 2011 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. on 3/29/2011. (els)
March 28, 2011 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els)
March 28, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-866968.) - filed by Nokia Corporation, Intellisync Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - F, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(els)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nokia Corporation et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nokia Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellisync Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?