Neology Inc. v. Federal Signal Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Neology Inc.
Defendant: Federal Signal Technologies LLC, Sirit Corporation and Federal Signal Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv00672
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 133 SEALED MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement with Proposed Order and Exhibits A and B filed by Neology Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 9/21/2012. (cak)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: denying 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting 94 Report and Recommendation; the Oral Argument scheduled for 8/8/12 at 10:00 AM is cancelled. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/2/12. (ntl)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Neology Inc. and 20 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion For Enlargement Of Page Limitation For Its Brief In Support Of Motion For Preliminary Injuncti on] filed by Neology Inc. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 7/5/2012. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 6/18/2012. (cak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neology Inc. v. Federal Signal Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Signal Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sirit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Signal Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neology Inc.
Represented By: Anthony J. Dain
Represented By: Victor M. Felix
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Robin L. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?