Openwave Systems Inc. v. Apple Inc. et al Featured Case

Openwave System's patent infringement lawsuit against Apple and RIM

Plaintiff: Openwave Systems Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc., Research In Motion LTD. and Research In Motion Corp.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00765
Filed: August 31, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Mitchell S. Goldberg
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER- Case is closed for administrative purposes with leave to reopen if further attention by the Court is required (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 10/18/2011. (lid)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SO ORDERED re 6 Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay Action Pending ITC Determination, filed by Openwave Systems Inc., Apple Inc., Research In Motion LTD., Research In Motion Corp. (Case stayed). Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 10/17/2011. (nms)
October 17, 2011 Filing 6 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Stay Action Pending ITC Determination by Apple Inc., Openwave Systems Inc., Research In Motion Corp., Research In Motion LTD.. (Herrmann, Richard)
October 11, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Scott J. Pivnick and the law firm of Alston & Bird as co-counsel. Reason for request: No longer affiliated with case. (Smith, Rodger)
September 7, 2011 Case Assigned to Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship). Please include the initials of the Judge (MSG) after the case number on all documents filed. (Courtesy copies of filings should be sent to the chambers of the assigned Judge). (rjb)
September 1, 2011 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc. on 9/1/2011; Research In Motion Corp. on 9/1/2011; Research In Motion LTD. on 9/1/2011. Requesting party should contact the Help Desk at 302-573-6170 to arrange for pick-up or mailing of the summons. (els)
August 31, 2011 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,233,608; 6,289,212; 6,405,037; 6,430,409; 6,625,447;. (els)
August 31, 2011 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Openwave Systems Inc.. (els)
August 31, 2011 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (els)
August 31, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc., Research In Motion Corp., Research In Motion LTD. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-938647.) - filed by Openwave Systems Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C, # 2 Exhibit D-E, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(els)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Openwave Systems Inc. v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Openwave Systems Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?