INVISTA North America S.ar.l. et al v. M&G USA Corporation et al
Plaintiff: INVISTA North America S.ar.l.
Defendant: M&G USA Corporation and M&G Polymers USA LLC
Counter_claimant: M&G Polymers USA LLC and M&G USA Corporation
Counter_defendant: INVISTA North America S.ar.l.
Case Number: 1:2011cv01007
Filed: October 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 724 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 720 MOTION for Reconsideration re 719 Memorandum and Order filed by Auriga Polymers Inc., INVISTA North America S.ar.l. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/13/2016. (nmfn)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 719 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 678 MOTION for Relief From Continued Application of the Injunction filed by M&G Polymers USA LLC, M&G USA Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 12/28/2015. (nmfn)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 677 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 666 Proposed Pretrial Order. It is ordered that defendants shall submit for the court's review, on or before 5/14/2015, the expert reports upon which they rely for damages, consistent with the reasoning listed in the order. It is further ordered that plaintiffs may refer to their sales in Europe, consistent with the evidence of such presented in the liability phase of the case. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/13/2015. (fms)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 645 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 613 MOTION [Defendants' Motion Under Rule 60(b) For Relief From The Court's March 31, 2014 And April 21, 2014 Orders], denying 609 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY THE DAMAGES AND WILLFULNESS PHASE OF THIS CASE PENDING REEXAMINATION OF U.S. PATENT NO. 7,943,216. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/14/2015. (nmfn)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 568 adopting without objection 534 plaintiff's motion for modification of the protective order ; denying plaintiff's motion for order to show cause and for sanctions; denying 540 defendant's motion for leave to file sur-reply. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/25/2014. (nmfn)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 549 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/31/2014. (nmfn)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 427 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying defendants' request to preclude plaintiffs from presenting testimony or evidence relating to M&G's prior product ActiTUF. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that only jury selection and preliminary jury instructions will take place on July 17, 2013. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/16/2013. (nmfn)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 421 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 404 MOTION for Reconsideration re 382 Memorandum Opinion Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration and Request for Expedited Briefing. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 7/12/2013. (nmfn)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/25/2013. (nmfn)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ( 295 Memorandum and Order, 273 Order on Motion for Hearing granting D.I. 194 ; denying 274 . Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/5/2013. (nmfn)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 339 denying 91 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/30/2013. (nmfn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INVISTA North America S.ar.l. et al v. M&G USA Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INVISTA North America S.ar.l.
Represented By: A. Martina Tyreus Hufnal
Represented By: William J. Marsden, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas Edward McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&G USA Corporation
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&G Polymers USA LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: M&G Polymers USA LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: M&G USA Corporation
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: INVISTA North America S.ar.l.
Represented By: A. Martina Tyreus Hufnal
Represented By: William J. Marsden, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas Edward McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?