Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc. v. Strine et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.
Defendant: Leo E. Strine, Jr., John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Sam Glasscock, III, Delaware Court of Chancery, State Of Delaware and J. Travis Laster
Case Number: 1:2011cv01015
Filed: October 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2014 Information on Post Decision Matters from the U.S. Court of Appeals: NOTICE from U.S. Supreme Court. Petition for Writ of Certiorari filed by Leo E. Strine, Jr., et al., on 01/21/2014 and placed on the docket 01/23/2014. Supreme Court Case No. 13-869. (bkb)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SO ORDERED, re 50 Stipulation and Proposed Order (filed by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.) Relating To A Supplemental Award of Attorney's Fees; PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary A. McLaughlin on 12/8/2013. (bkb)
November 25, 2013 Filing 50 PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RELATING TO A SUPPLEMENTAL AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.. (Finger, David)
November 14, 2013 Filing 49 MANDATE of USCA as to 46 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit), filed by Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Delaware Court of Chancery, Leo E. Strine, Jr., J. Travis Laster, Sam Glasscock, III, John W. Noble, State Of Delaware. USCA Decision: Affirmed. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion)(tw, )
October 15, 2012 Filing 48 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Delaware Court of Chancery, Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr, State Of Delaware, Leo E. Strine, Jr for proceedings held on February 9, 2012 before Judge Judge Mary A. McLaughlin. (Friedlander, Joel)
October 11, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re 46 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit), filed by Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Delaware Court of Chancery, Leo E. Strine, Jr., J. Travis Laster, Sam Glasscock, III, John W. Noble, State Of Delaware. USCA Case Number 12-3859. USCA Case Manager: Tonya (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (tw, )
October 2, 2012 Copy of 46 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit), mailed to: Mr. Hamermesh and Mr. Chandler (els)
October 1, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: Notice of Appeal entered on the docket as Appeal to Federal Circuit, D.I. 45 removed from the docket per request of filer. Re-filed as Appeal to the Third Circuit Court of Appeals, D.I. 46 . Appeal fee payment docketed separately. (rbe) Modified on 10/1/2012 (rbe).
October 1, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEAL of 44 SO ORDERED, Judgment, 41 Memorandum Opinion, 42 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings,,,,, . Appeal filed by Delaware Court of Chancery, Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr, State Of Delaware, Leo E. Strine, Jr. (Friedlander, Joel)
October 1, 2012 APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $ 455.00 received re 46 Notice of Appeal (Third Circuit), filed by Donald F. Parsons, Jr., Delaware Court of Chancery, Leo E. Strine, Jr., J. Travis Laster, Sam Glasscock, III, John W. Noble, State Of Delaware. ( Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0311-1148085.) (Friedlander, Joel) Modified on 10/1/2012 (rbe). Modified on 10/1/2012 (rbe). Modified on 10/1/2012 (rbe).
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SO ORDERED, re 43 Proposed Order filed by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.. Signed by Judge Mary A. McLaughlin on 9/10/12. (dab)
September 10, 2012 Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RELATING TO AN AWARD OF COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.. (Finger, David)
August 30, 2012 JUDGMENT--PLEASE SEE 8/30/12 ORDER 42 (bkb)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that 28 Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED; 19 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED for defendants The Delaware Court of Chancery and the State of Delaware against the plaintiff Delaware Coalition for Open Government, Inc.; JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED for the plaintiff Delaware Coalition for Open Government, Inc. against the defendants The Hon. Leo E. Strine, Jr., The Hon. John W. Noble, The Hon. Donald F. Parsons, The Hon. J. Travis Laster and the Hon. Sam Glasscock, III; PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.. Signed by Judge Mary A. McLaughlin on 8/30/2012. (bkb)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 19 defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings and 28 plaintiff's cross motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Mary A. McLaughlin on 8/30/2012. (bkb)
March 12, 2012 Filing 40 Letter to The Honorable Mary A. McLauglin from Andre G. Bouchard regarding response to the Order the Court entered on March 8, 2012 - re 39 Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B Part 2)(Bouchard, Andre)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER- Defendant shall provide the Court with a copy of judgment or a record citation where it may be found, and describe how the judgment can be accessed by the public. Signed by Judge Mary A. McLaughlin on 3/8/2012. (lih)
February 21, 2012 Filing 38 Official Transcript of Hearing held on 2/9/12 before Judge Mary A. McLaughlin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diana Doman Transcribing,Telephone number 856-435-7172. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/13/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2012. (rwc)
February 10, 2012 Filing 37 Letter to Judge Mary A. McLaughlin, dated 2/2/2012, from William W. Erhart regarding request to add Gannett Co. Inc. as an additional news media organization to 36 Amicus Curiae BRIEF in Support. (lih)
February 10, 2012 Filing 36 Amicus Curiae BRIEF in Support re 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Committee for Freedom of the Press.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/27/2012. (lih)
February 10, 2012 Filing 35 Amicus Curiae BRIEF in Support re 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by NASDAQ OMX Group Inc., NYSE Euronext.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/27/2012. (lih)
February 10, 2012 CORRECTING ENTRY: Upon review of D.I. 32, deputy clerk determined document was a proposed amicus brief re 31 Motion for leave to file rather than a supplemental motion for leave to file as it was filed by counsel. (lih)
February 9, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary A. McLaughlin - Oral Argument held on 2/9/2012. (Court Reporter Milahn Hull.) (lih)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER- granting 31 MOTION for Leave, granting 27 MOTION for Leave to File, denying 30 MOTION for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Mary A. McLaughlin on 1/24/2012. (lih)
January 23, 2012 Filing 33 REPLY BRIEF re 28 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendants' Combined Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Answering Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by State Of Delaware. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B)(Bouchard, Andre)
January 20, 2012 Filing 32 Proposed Amicus Brief re 31 Motion for leave to file - filed by Committee for Freedom of the Press. (Erhart, William) Modified on 2/10/2012 (lih).
January 20, 2012 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to permit William W. Erhart to File an Amicus Brief - filed by Committee for Freedom of the Press. (Erhart, William)
January 11, 2012 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on Pleadings - filed by Dwight L. Davis. (rwc)
January 9, 2012 Filing 29 BRIEF (Combined Opening and Answering) re 28 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/26/2012. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/20/2012. (Finger, David)
January 9, 2012 Filing 28 Cross MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings - filed by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.. (Finger, David)
December 30, 2011 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae in support of Defendants' 19 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - filed by NASDAQ OMX Group Inc., NYSE Euronext. ATTACHMENTS: # 1 Brief of Amici Curiae NASDAQ OMX Group Inc. & NYSE Euronext in support) (rwc).
December 27, 2011 Filing 26 Amicus Curiae BRIEF in Support - re 19 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings - filed by Amicus Curiae The Corporation Law Section of the Delaware State Bar Association. (rwc)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER- granting 21 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Signed by Judge Mary A. McLaughlin on 12/27/2011. (lih)
December 23, 2011 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Docket Clerk linked DI#'s 23 & 24 to DI# 21 and modified the entries in accordance with the Clerk's Office guidelines: CM/ECF Tips for Attorneys for e-filing Motions and related briefing (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). (rwc)
December 22, 2011 Filing 24 REPLY in Further Support of 21 Motion for Leave to File Brief As Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants' Motions For Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Amicus Curiae The Corporation Law Section of the Delaware State Bar Association. (DiTomo, John) Modified on 12/23/2011 (rwc).
December 21, 2011 Filing 23 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition to 21 Motion of the Corporation Law Section of the Delaware State Bar Association for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants' Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.. (Finger, David) Modified on 12/23/2011 (rwc).
December 21, 2011 Filing 22 Compendium of Unreported Decisions [Compendium Of Other Authorities Cited In Brief Of Amicus Curiae The Corporation Law Section Of The Delaware State Bar Association In Support Of Defendants' Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings by Amicus Curiae The Corporation Law Section of the Delaware State Bar Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tabs 1-3, # 2 Exhibit Tabs 4-5, # 3 Exhibit Tabs 6-9, # 4 Exhibit Tab 10, # 5 Exhibit Tabs 11-14, # 6 Exhibit Tabs 15-17, # 7 Exhibit Tabs 18-21, # 8 Exhibit Tabs 22-24, # 9 Exhibit Tab 25, # 10 Exhibit Tab 26-28)(Hurd, S.)
December 21, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to permit S. Mark Hurd to File an Amicus Brief [Motion Of The Corporation Law Section Of The Delaware State Bar Association For Leave To File Brief As Amicus Curiae In Support Of Defendants' Motions For Judgment On The Pleadings] - filed by Amicus Curiae The Corporation Law Section of the Delaware State Bar Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hurd, S.)
December 16, 2011 Filing 20 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendants' Opening Brief in Support of Their Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by State Of Delaware.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/3/2012. (Bouchard, Andre)
December 16, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - filed by State Of Delaware. (Bouchard, Andre)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER- The oral argument scheduled for 2/9/2012 will be held at the United States Courthouse, 601 Market Street, Courtroom 13-A, Philadelphia, PA. Signed by Judge Mary A. McLaughlin on 12/1/2011. (lih)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SO ORDERED- re 14 Stipulation and Order Governing Briefing, Oral Argument and Discovery Stay. Set Scheduling Order Deadlines ( Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2011., Answering Brief due 1/9/2012., Reply Brief due 1/23/2012.) An Oral Argument is set for 2/9/2012 at 09:30 AM before Judge Mary A. McLaughlin. (PLEASE REFER TO ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) Signed by Judge Mary A. McLaughlin on 11/29/2011. (lih)
November 30, 2011 Filing 16 STIPULATION Revised Stipulation and Order Governing Briefing, Oral Argument and Discovery Stay re 14 Stipulation, 15 Letter by State Of Delaware. (Bouchard, Andre)
November 30, 2011 Filing 15 Letter to The Honorable Mary A. McLaughlin from Andre G. Bouchard regarding enclosing a revised stipulation and order. (Bouchard, Andre)
November 29, 2011 Filing 14 STIPULATION Stipulation and Order Governing Briefing, Oral Argument and Discovery Stay re 13 Letter by State Of Delaware. (Bouchard, Andre)
November 29, 2011 Filing 13 Letter to The Honorable Mary A. McLaughlin from Andre G. Bouchard regarding Stipulation and Order Governing Briefing, Oral Argument and Discovery Stay. (Bouchard, Andre)
November 28, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE - Setting Deadlines/Hearings ( A Scheduling Conference is set for 1/13/2012 at 09:30 AM before Judge Mary A. McLaughlin). Signed by Judge Mary A. McLaughlin on 11/28/11. (rwc)
November 28, 2011 Case Assigned to Judge Mary A. McLaughlin of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania. Please include the initials of the Judge (MAM) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
November 28, 2011 Filing 11 DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT; The Honorable Mary A. McLaughlin (E. District of Pennsylvania) is designated and assigned to this case. Signed by Theodore A. McKee, Chief Judge, U.S. Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, on 11/28/2011. (Attachments: # 1 designation letter)(bkb)
November 23, 2011 Remark: this case has been submitted for assignment to a Judge outside the District. (rjb)
November 16, 2011 Filing 10 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Delaware Court of Chancery, Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr, Leo E. Strine, Jr.(lih)
November 16, 2011 Filing 9 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by State Of Delaware.(Bouchard, Andre)
November 8, 2011 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.. Sam Glasscock, III served on 11/1/2011, answer due 11/22/2011. (Finger, David)
November 8, 2011 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.. State Of Delaware served on 10/26/2011, answer due 11/16/2011. (Finger, David)
November 8, 2011 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.. Delaware Court of Chancery served on 10/26/2011, answer due 11/16/2011. (Finger, David)
November 8, 2011 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.. J. Travis Laster served on 10/26/2011, answer due 11/16/2011. (Finger, David)
November 8, 2011 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.. Donald F. Parsons, Jr served on 10/26/2011, answer due 11/16/2011. (Finger, David)
November 8, 2011 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.. Leo E. Strine, Jr served on 10/26/2011, answer due 11/16/2011. (Finger, David)
October 25, 2011 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Delaware Court of Chancery on 10/25/2011; Sam Glasscock, III on 10/25/2011; J. Travis Laster on 10/25/2011; John W. Noble on 10/25/2011; Donald F. Parsons, Jr on 10/25/2011; State Of Delaware on 10/25/2011; Leo E. Strine, Jr on 10/25/2011. (rwc)
October 25, 2011 No Summons Issued (nms)
October 25, 2011 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nms)
October 25, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Delaware Court of Chancery, Sam Glasscock, III, J. Travis Laster, John W. Noble, Donald F. Parsons, Jr, State Of Delaware, Leo E. Strine, Jr - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-964406) - filed by Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc. v. Strine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delaware Coalition for Open Government Inc.
Represented By: David L. Finger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leo E. Strine, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Noble
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald F. Parsons, Jr.
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Glasscock, III
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaware Court of Chancery
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Delaware
Represented By: Andre G. Bouchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Travis Laster
Represented By: Lawrence A. Hamermesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?