St. Jude Medical Cardiology Division Inc. et al v. Volcano Corporation
Plaintiff: St. Jude Medical Systems AB, St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc. and St. Jude Medical Cardiology Division Inc.
Defendant: Volcano Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv00441
Filed: April 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting, and Granting with Leave to Amend 155 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Strike (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/11/2014. (nms)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the issue of claim construction of six disputed terms. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed Order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/22/2014. (nms)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/30/2013. (nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Jude Medical Cardiology Division Inc. et al v. Volcano Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volcano Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Jude Medical Systems AB
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Jude Medical Cardiology Division Inc.
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Steven J. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?