Gourley v. Google,Inc et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: William G. Gourley
Defendant: Google Inc. and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 1:2012cv00794
Filed: June 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (rwc)
June 25, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (rwc)
June 25, 2012 Filing 9 Record of case transferred in from District of Kentucky Western; Case Number in Other District: 5:12-cv-00048. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 22, 2012 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 1 from Judicial Panel on MultiDistrict Litigation re:MDL 2358 (MLG) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 6/25/2012.]
April 27, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE of Presentationor Waiver of Oral Argument by William G. Gourley (Bryant, Mark) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 6/25/2012.]
April 23, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Google,Inc. Google,Inc served on 3/29/2012, answer due 4/19/2012. (Bryant, Mark) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 6/25/2012.]
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell granting 4 Motion to Stay pending ruling by MDL Panel. cc:counsel (MLG) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 6/25/2012.]
April 3, 2012 Filing 4 JOINT MOTION FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION by Plaintiff William G. Gourley Responses due by 4/27/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Bryant, Mark) Modified on 4/4/2012 (JSS). [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 6/25/2012.]
March 28, 2012 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Google,Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (KJA) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 6/25/2012.]
March 27, 2012 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (KJA) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 6/25/2012.]
March 27, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10, Google,Inc Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0644-1395611., filed by William G. Gourley. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (KJA) [Transferred from Kentucky Western on 6/25/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gourley v. Google,Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William G. Gourley
Represented By: Mark P. Bryant
Represented By: Emily Ward Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?