SOSSIN v. GOOGLE, INC. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Larry Sossin
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00797
Filed: June 26, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2012 NOTICE: Documents relating to all actions should be filed on the master docket sheet and on the docket sheet of each individual action. Documents relating to two or more, but not all, individual actions should be filed on the master docket sheet, and on the docket sheet of each affected individual action. Documents affecting a single individual action should be filed on the docket sheet of that action and on the master docket sheet. (els)
June 26, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: MDL No. 1:12-md-2358 has been opened and assigned to the Honorable Sue L. Robinson. Attorneys of record who will be electronically filing documents may use the attached form to register for a CM/ECF login and password. Please see the docket for further entries. (els)
June 26, 2012 Filing 8 Record of case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number in Other District: 2:12-cv-02113. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
June 22, 2012 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GOOGLE, INC. ORDER OF MDL PANEL TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE served on LARRY SOSSIN (KLAUSNER, TONIA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/26/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 6 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the District of Delaware. (ma) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/26/2012.]
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 4/16/12. (dc, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/26/2012.]
April 13, 2012 Filing 4 Joint MOTION to Stay by GOOGLE, INC., LARRY SOSSIN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KLAUSNER, TONIA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/26/2012.]
April 12, 2012 Filing 3 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JEREMY M. KLAUSNER terminated. Attorney TONIA O. KLAUSNER for GOOGLE, INC. added.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(KLAUSNER, TONIA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/26/2012.]
April 6, 2012 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOOGLE, INC. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/26/2012.]
April 6, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GOOGLE, INC. from NJ SUPERIOR COURT LAW DIVISION, SPECIAL CIVIL PART: SUSSEX COUNTY, case number SC-153-12. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4282174) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit1, # 2 Exhibit2, # 3 Exhibit3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 6/26/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOSSIN v. GOOGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Sossin
Represented By: Barry R. Eichen
Represented By: Stephen G. Grygiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Tonia O. Klausner
Represented By: Anthony J. Weibell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?