InterDigital Communications Inc. et al v. ZTE Corporation et al
Plaintiff: InterDigital Communications Inc., Interdigital Technology Corporation, IPR Licensing Inc. and InterDigital Holdings Inc.
Defendant: ZTE Corporation and ZTE (USA) Inc.
Counter_claimant: ZTE (USA) Inc.
Counter_defendant: IPR Licensing Inc., InterDigital Communications Inc., InterDigital Holdings Inc. and Interdigital Technology Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv00009
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 584 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding MOTION for Certification of Partial Final Judgment Under 54(b) (D.I. 578 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/7/2016. (nms)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 571 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law that the Asserted Patent Claims are not Infringed and, in the Alternative, For a New Trial (D.I. 465 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/18/2016. (nms)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 530 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding Dr. Haas's testimony (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/17/2015. (nms)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 496 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for various disputed terms. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/6/2015. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00009-RGA, 1:13-cv-00010-RGA(nms)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part certain pending motions (see D.I. 277 in 13-cv-00009-RGA, D.I. 285 in 13-cv-00009-RGA, D.I. 287 in 13-cv-00009-RGA, D.I. 280 in 13-cv-00009-RGA) (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/28/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00009-RGA, 1:13-cv-00010-RGA(nms)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding the construction of a claim term found in U.S. Patent No. 7,286,847 (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/8/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00009-RGA, 1:13-cv-00010-RGA(nms)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding a dispute over the construction of several claim terms found in U.S. Patent No. 7,286,847 (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/29/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00009-RGA, 1:13-cv-00010-RGA(nms)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM OPINION re MOTION to Dismiss Amended FRAND Counterclaims (see D.I. 71 in 13cv9-RGA, and D.I. 55 in 13cv10-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/28/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00009-RGA, 1:13-cv-00010-RGA(nms)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the issue of claim construction of various disputed terms. Within five days the parties should submit a proposed order consistent with this opinion suitable for submission to the jury (see Memorandum Opinion for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/22/2014. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00009-RGA, 1:13-cv-00010-RGA(nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InterDigital Communications Inc. et al v. ZTE Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterDigital Communications Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Represented By: Michael B. Levin
Represented By: Maura L. Rees
Represented By: David S. Steuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interdigital Technology Corporation
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPR Licensing Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterDigital Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: ZTE (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: IPR Licensing Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: InterDigital Communications Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Represented By: Michael B. Levin
Represented By: Maura L. Rees
Represented By: David S. Steuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: InterDigital Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Interdigital Technology Corporation
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?