InterDigital Communications Inc. et al v. Nokia Corporation et al
Plaintiff: InterDigital Communications Inc., Interdigital Technology Corporation, IPR Licensing Inc. and InterDigital Holdings Inc.
Defendant: Nokia Corporation and Nokia Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00010
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 529 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 501 MOTION for Reargument of Order Severing Nokia Corporation for Separate Trial. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/29/2015. (nms)
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 480 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the issue of claim construction of a disputed term found in U.S. Patent No. 8,380,244. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/24/2015. (nms)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Motion to Join as a Defendant Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25 (D.I. 268 ), and Cross-MOTION to Substitute Party: Microsoft Mobile Oy to replace Nokia Corporation as a named party on counterclaims (D.I.[302) (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/28/2014. (nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InterDigital Communications Inc. et al v. Nokia Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterDigital Communications Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Represented By: Michael B. Levin
Represented By: Maura L. Rees
Represented By: David S. Steuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Interdigital Technology Corporation
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IPR Licensing Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InterDigital Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Melissa N. Brochwicz Donimirski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Corporation
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?