Gunn v. First American Financial Corporation

Plaintiff: La Mar Gunn
Defendant: First American Financial Corporation and Douglas A. Shachtman
Case Number: 1:2013cv00174
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 27 MOTION for Recusal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/7/2014. (nms)
May 30, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding 22 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/30/2014. (nms)
June 18, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 3 Complaint, and 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/18/2013. (nms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunn v. First American Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Mar Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas A. Shachtman
Represented By: John A. Elzufon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?