Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Ricoh Company Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures I LLC and Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Defendant: Ricoh Company Ltd., Ricoh Americas Corporation and Ricoh Electronics Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00474
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2016 187 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER accepting 157 Memorandum Order to the extent explained in this memorandum order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall show cause, on or before June 6, 2016, why defendants should not be precluded from using any inform ation provided by their parent RCL2 in their defense. Plaintiff may respond on or before June 20, 2016. The court will address the issue at the June 22, 2016 expert discovery status conference. See memorandum order for further details. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/23/2016. (nmfn)
March 22, 2016 161 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/22/2016. (nmfn)
January 7, 2016 131 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re: claim construction. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/7/2016. (nmfn)
September 12, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 9/12/2014. (nmfn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures I LLC et al v. Ricoh Company Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Represented By: Steven S. Cherensky
Represented By: Monica M. Eno
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Sam Kim
Represented By: Matthew D. Powers
Represented By: Palani P. Rathinasamy
Represented By: Stefani C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricoh Company Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricoh Americas Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricoh Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?