Baldonado et al v. Arvinmeritor Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Baldonado and Virginia Baldonado
Defendant: Arvinmeritor Inc., BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc., CNH America LLC, Rockwell Automation Inc., Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc., Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc., Honda North America Inc., Ford Motor Company, Great Dane Limited Partnership, Massey Ferguson Corp., General Electric Company, Caterpillar Inc., Pratt & Whitney Power Systems Inc., Deere & Company, Georgia Pacific LLC and Pneumo Abex Corporation
Cross Defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC, Paccar Inc., Eaton Corporation, Does 1-500, Murco Wall Products Inc., Dana Companies LLC, Union Carbide Corporation, Luk Clutch Systems LLC, Goodrich Corporation, Honeywell International Inc., Lockheed Martin Corp., Genuine Parts Company, Robert Bosch LLC, Navistar Inc., National Automotive Parts Assocation, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company and Cummins Inc.
Cross Claimant: CNH Industrial America LLC (fka CNH America LLC), IMO Industries Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and NMBFIL Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00833
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christopher J Burke
Referring Judge: Sue L Robinson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2014 Filing 150 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of #149 Letter enclosing certified copy of the #148 Order of Remand and certified copy of the U.S. District Court docket sheet. (nmfn)
August 26, 2014 Filing 149 Letter to Clerk, Superior Court of the State of Delaware in and for New Castle County from Deputy Clerk, U.S. District Court enclosing certified copy of the order of remand and certified copy of the U.S. District Court docket sheet. - re #148 Order of Remand. (nmfn)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER re #142 Stipulation to Remand. IT IS ORDERED, pursuant to the agreement of the removing party and plaintiffs that this case is remanded to the Superior Court of Delaware in and for New Castle County. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/26/2014. (nmfn)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #141 Motion to Dismiss all claims and cross-claims against Defendant Pratt & Whitney Power Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/26/2014. (nmfn)
August 15, 2014 Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Witness and Exhibit List filed by Michael Baldonado.(Coffey, Diane)
August 15, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1 CD of Diagnostic Radiology from Lovelace Medical Center re #114 Scheduling Order, #143 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to PRODUCE medical and diagnostic materials to August 15, 2014 filed by Michael Baldonado.(Coffey, Diane)
August 15, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE OF SERVICE of BANKRUPTCY CLAIM FORMS filed by Michael Baldonado.(Coffey, Diane)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #143 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to PRODUCE medical and diagnostic materials to August 15, 2014 filed by Michael Baldonado. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/15/2014. (dlk)
August 14, 2014 Filing 143 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to PRODUCE medical and diagnostic materials to September 15, 2014 - filed by Michael Baldonado. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coffey, Diane) Modified on 8/14/2014 (dlk).
August 6, 2014 Filing 142 Joint STIPULATION to Remand by Genuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bradley, Paul)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #139 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by General Electric Company, #137 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by NMBFIL Inc., #138 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Lockheed Martin Corp. Party General Electric Company, Lockheed Martin Corp., and NMBFIL Inc terminated. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/6/2014. (nmfn)
August 5, 2014 Filing 141 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice - filed by Pratt & Whitney Power Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Bradley, Paul)
August 5, 2014 Filing 140 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pratt & Whitney Power Systems Inc.. (Bradley, Paul)
August 5, 2014 Filing 139 STIPULATION of Dismissal by General Electric Company. (Valocchi, Beth)
August 4, 2014 Filing 138 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Roberts, Sarah)
August 4, 2014 Filing 137 STIPULATION of Dismissal by NMBFIL Inc.. (Roberts, Sarah)
August 4, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Pratt & Whitney Power Systems Inc..(Bradley, Paul)
July 28, 2014 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Caterpillar Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
July 28, 2014 Filing 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Robert Bosch LLC's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Robert Bosch LLC.(Culley, David)
July 28, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 (a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by IMO Industries Inc..(Ford, Eileen)
July 28, 2014 Filing 132 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holdings, Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc. filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc.. (Ahern, Andrew)
July 25, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Georgia Pacific LLC.(Pierce, Matthew)
July 25, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by CNH Industrial America LLC (fka CNH America LLC).(Murphy, Peter)
July 25, 2014 Filing 129 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CNH Industrial America LLC (fka CNH America LLC).(Murphy, Peter)
July 24, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE of Honda North America, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) Of The Federald Rules Of Civil Procedure by Honda North America Inc. (Singewald, Christian)
July 24, 2014 Filing 127 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honda North America Inc..(Singewald, Christian)
July 24, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Browning, Ryan)
July 24, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Luk Clutch Systems LLC.(Larson, William)
July 23, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Eaton Corporation.(Naylor, Joseph)
July 22, 2014 Filing 123 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) filed by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian)
July 22, 2014 Filing 122 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by Michael Baldonado.(Coffey, Diane)
July 22, 2014 Filing 121 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Assocation.(Bradley, Paul)
July 22, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Union Carbide Corporation.(Valocchi, Beth)
July 22, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by General Electric Company.(Valocchi, Beth)
July 22, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE OF SERVICE of RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Navistar Inc..(Guerke, Kevin)
July 22, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Federal Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures filed by BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc..(Donelson, Matthew)
July 21, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure filed by Murco Wall Products Inc..(Levitsky, Stephanie)
July 21, 2014 Filing 115 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Honeywell International Inc..(Florax, Joelle)
July 17, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher J. Burke - Scheduling Teleconference held on 7/17/2014 to discuss the proposed order filed by the parties. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi (Hawkins).) (dlk)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 8/15/2014. Amended Pleadings due by 8/15/2014. Final Discovery Requests due by 12/19/2014. A Status Teleconference is set for 2/27/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Christopher J. Burke Dispositive Motions due by 3/13/2015. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 07/17/2014. (mlc)
July 8, 2014 Filing 113 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Stipulated Scheduling Order submitted in advance of Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference by Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Assocation. (Kinsley, Donald)
July 8, 2014 Filing 112 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Donald R. Kinsley regarding Proposed Scheduling Order and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference on July 17, 2014, at 2:00 PM. (Kinsley, Donald)
July 1, 2014 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie S. Levitsky on behalf of Murco Wall Products Inc. (Levitsky, Stephanie)
June 25, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Pierce on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Pierce, Matthew)
June 25, 2014 Filing 109 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 filed by NMBFIL Inc..(Roberts, Sarah)
June 25, 2014 Filing 108 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dap Products Inc. for NMBFIL Inc. filed by NMBFIL Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Roberts, Sarah)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS #105 granting #10 Motion to Dismiss ; granting #18 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within fifteen (15) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/10/2014. (nmfn)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) TELECONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A joint scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) will be held on 7/17/2014 at 02:00 PM. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to Chambers of Christopher J. Burke by dialing 302-573-4595. (2) For the purpose of being prepared the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a joint proposal to the Court no later than July 11, 2014. The Court's form scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Burke, Forms). (3) If there are disputed issues between the parties regarding the content of the Scheduling Order, the parties should note those areas of dispute in the Proposed Order, along with their proposals for the language the Court should adopt as to that issue. In addition, the parties may each separately file a letter (of no more than two single-spaced pages) setting forth their position as to these disputed issues. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 05/28/2014. (mlc)
May 23, 2014 Filing 106 Letter to Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Donald R. Kinsley regarding Joint Letter in Compliance with the Oral Order date May 20, 2014. (Kinsley, Donald)
May 20, 2014 Filing 105 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending GRANTING D.I. #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC, and GRANTING D.I. #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paccar Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 6/6/2014. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 05/20/2014. (mlc)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: In light of the Report and Recommendation issued this day addressing all pending motions in this case, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint letter by no later than May 30, 2014 addressing whether it is appropriate for the Court to hold a Rule 16(b) teleconference and enter a schedule regarding remaining deadlines in the case, and if so, recommending when such a Rule 16(b) teleconference should be held.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 05/20/2014. (mlc)
May 13, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Andrew R. Silverman as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer With Firm. (Smiertka, Stephanie)
May 9, 2014 Filing 103 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Andrew R. Silverman as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer With Firm. (Larson, William)
May 9, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Andrew R. Silverman as co-counsel. Reason for request: No Longer With Firm. (Browning, Ryan)
March 18, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jennifer D. Davis Oliva as Counsel for LuK Clutch Systems, LLC by Luk Clutch Systems LLC (Larson, William)
March 18, 2014 Filing 100 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jennifer D. Davis Oliva as Counsel for Georgia-Pacific LLC by Georgia Pacific LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Smiertka, Stephanie)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #97 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Deere & Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/5/2014. (nmfn)
February 24, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re All Plaintiffs : Entry of appearance of attorney Diane M. Coffey. Attorney Kara Hager terminated. (Coffey, Diane)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #96 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Deere & Company. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/18/2014. (fms)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: In light of the stipulation between Deere & Company and Plaintiffs dismissing Plaintiffs' claims made against Deere & Company (D.I. 96), and Deere & Company's motion to dismiss all claims and cross claims against it (D.I. 97), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that if any other defendant opposes Deere & Company's motion, such opposition must be filed by no later than February 26, 2014. If no opposition is filed by that date, the District Court will enter an order dismissing Deere & Company from this case. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/13/2014. (dlk)
February 12, 2014 Filing 97 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Stipulation of Dismissal of Deere & Company - filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Guerke, Kevin)
February 12, 2014 Filing 96 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Deere & Company by Deere & Company. (Guerke, Kevin)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting #93 Motion to Dismiss Goodrich Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/7/2014. (nmfn)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: In light of the stipulation between Goodrich Corporation and plaintiffs dismissing plaintiffs' claims made against Goodrich Corporation (D.I. 92), and Goodrich Corporation's motion to dismiss all claims and cross claims against it (D.I. 93), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that if any other defendant opposes Goodrich Corporation's motion, such opposition must be filed by no later than January 2, 2014. If no opposition is filed by that date, the District Court will enter an order dismissing Goodrich Corporation from this case.Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/20/2013. (dlk)
December 19, 2013 Filing 94 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from Donald E. Reid regarding Stipulation of Dismissal between Plaintiffs and Goodrich Corporation - re #93 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs Have Stipulated To Dismissal Of All Claims Against Goodrich Corporation, #92 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Reid, Donald)
December 19, 2013 Filing 93 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Plaintiffs Have Stipulated To Dismissal Of All Claims Against Goodrich Corporation - filed by Goodrich Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Of Dismissal As To Goodrich Corporation Only)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Reid, Donald)
December 19, 2013 Filing 92 STIPULATION of Dismissal As To Goodrich Corporation Only by Goodrich Corporation. (Reid, Donald)
October 30, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Elizabeth Smiertka on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Smiertka, Stephanie)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #87 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James L. McCrystal filed by Eaton Corporation, and D.I. #82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald Hellbusch filed by Union Carbide Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/24/2013. (dlk)
October 22, 2013 Filing 90 ANSWER to Complaint with TRIAL BY JURY OF TWELVE DEMANDED and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Ford Motor Company.(Singewald, Christian)
October 10, 2013 Filing 89 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation, plc (Ireland) for Eaton Corporation.. (Naylor, Joseph)
October 9, 2013 Filing 88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Brescia - filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Della Porta, Armand)
October 9, 2013 Filing 87 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James L. McCrystal - filed by Eaton Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Skiles, Nicholas)
October 9, 2013 Filing 86 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David D. Reynard, Jr. - filed by NMBFIL Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Della Porta, Armand)
October 9, 2013 Filing 85 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Margot A. Heflick - filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Della Porta, Armand)
October 9, 2013 Filing 84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Patricia Yee - filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Della Porta, Armand)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #80 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Ellis Kugler, Esquire filed by Caterpillar Inc., D.I. #81 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Troy Helling, Esquire filed by Caterpillar Inc., D.I. #88 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Brescia filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc., D.I. #86 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David D. Reynard, Jr. filed by NMBFIL Inc., D.I. #84 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Patricia Yee filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.,D.I. #79 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael T. Wharton filed by Navistar Inc., D.I. #85 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Margot A. Heflick filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.,D.I. #78 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ferlin P. Ruiz filed by Pratt & Whitney Power Systems Inc.. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/9/2013. (dlk)
October 8, 2013 Filing 83 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Courtney G. Bowline - filed by Murco Wall Products Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Nolte, R.)
October 8, 2013 Filing 82 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald Hellbusch - filed by Union Carbide Corporation. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Valocchi, Beth)
October 8, 2013 Filing 81 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Troy Helling, Esquire - filed by Caterpillar Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Ford, Eileen)
October 8, 2013 Filing 80 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Laura Ellis Kugler, Esquire - filed by Caterpillar Inc.. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Ford, Eileen)
October 7, 2013 Filing 79 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael T. Wharton - filed by Navistar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Counsel, #3 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Guerke, Kevin)
October 7, 2013 Filing 78 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ferlin P. Ruiz - filed by Pratt & Whitney Power Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Ferlin P. Ruiz, Esquire)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Bradley, Paul)
September 23, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Baldonado on October 9, 2013 by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Della Porta, Armand)
August 26, 2013 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc..(Ahern, Andrew)
August 26, 2013 Filing 75 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holding, Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc... (Ahern, Andrew)
August 19, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Ross Silverman on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC (Silverman, Andrew)
August 16, 2013 Filing 73 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (Daugherty, Sally)
August 16, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally J. Daugherty on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Daugherty, Sally)
August 16, 2013 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Daugherty, Sally)
August 12, 2013 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by NMBFIL Inc.. (Roberts, Sarah)
August 12, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Anne Roberts on behalf of NMBFIL Inc. (Roberts, Sarah)
August 8, 2013 Filing 68 STATUS REPORT by Michael Baldonado, Virginia Baldonado. (Hager, Kara)
August 8, 2013 Filing 67 Letter to The Honorable Christopher J. Burke from James M. Kron, Esquire on behalf of Defendants PACCAR Inc and Daimler Trucks North America, LLC regarding status report, as requested by the Court (DI 60) - re #60 Order,. (Kron, James)
August 7, 2013 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM Past, Present, or Future against All Defendants by IMO Industries Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
August 2, 2013 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by William Bruce Larson, Jr on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Luk Clutch Systems LLC (Larson, William)
July 31, 2013 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of IMO Industries Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SO ORDERED D.I. #62 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clay Carroll, Esquire filed by Michael Baldonado, Virginia Baldonado. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/29/2013. (dlk)
July 25, 2013 Filing 62 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clay Carroll, Esquire - filed by Michael Baldonado, Virginia Baldonado. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Clay Carroll, Esquire)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Hager, Kara)
July 25, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Baldonado on October 9, 2013 by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Della Porta, Armand)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that within 14 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall submit a statement to the Court, no more than 2 single-spaced pages, regarding the status of this matter, and any Defendant who elects to do so may also submit a statement, no more than 2 single-spaced pages. (See Order for further details). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 7/25/2013. (dlk)
July 17, 2013 Filing 59 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Davin M. Reust - filed by Deere & Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel)Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(Guerke, Kevin)
July 16, 2013 Filing 58 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc. for Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc... (Roberts, Sarah)
July 16, 2013 Filing 57 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Roberts, Sarah)
July 16, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE of Vacation of Deposition by Lockheed Martin Corp. (Roberts, Sarah)
July 16, 2013 Filing 55 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Roberts, Sarah)
July 16, 2013 Filing 54 INITIAL DISCLOSURES pursuant to Rule 26 by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc..(Roberts, Sarah)
July 15, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Armand J. Della Porta, Jr on behalf of Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc. (Della Porta, Armand)
July 12, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Murphy on behalf of CNH America LLC (Murphy, Peter)
July 2, 2013 Filing 51 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael Baldonado on July 31, 2013 by Lockheed Martin Corp..(Della Porta, Armand)
June 19, 2013 Filing 50 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim Past, Present, and Future of any Co-Defendant by Deere & Company.(Guerke, Kevin)
June 19, 2013 Filing 49 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim Past, Present or Future of any Co-Defendant, ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim Past, Present or Future of any Co-Defendant by Navistar Inc..(Guerke, Kevin)
June 14, 2013 Filing 48 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim by Pratt & Whitney Power Systems Inc..(Bradley, Paul)
June 14, 2013 Filing 47 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim by National Automotive Parts Assocation.(Bradley, Paul)
June 14, 2013 Filing 46 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim , ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim, #33 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Crossclaim by Genuine Parts Company.(Bradley, Paul)
June 7, 2013 Filing 45 JOINDER by General Electric Company, joining in #1 Notice of Removal,, . (Valocchi, Beth)
June 6, 2013 Filing 44 REPLY BRIEF re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paccar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kron, James)
June 6, 2013 Filing 43 REPLY BRIEF re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kron, James)
June 6, 2013 Filing 42 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Eaton Corporation. (Naylor, Joseph)
June 6, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S. Naylor on behalf of Eaton Corporation (Naylor, Joseph)
June 6, 2013 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Other Affiliate The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation.. (Valocchi, Beth)
June 6, 2013 Filing 39 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by General Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate NBC Universal Inc., Other Affiliate GE Capital, Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity, Other Affiliate ValueVision Media, Inc for General Electric Company.. (Valocchi, Beth)
June 6, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth E. Valocchi on behalf of General Electric Company (Valocchi, Beth)
June 4, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara Anne Fruehauf on behalf of Arvinmeritor Inc., Cummins Inc., Great Dane Limited Partnership, Massey Ferguson Corp. (Fruehauf, Barbara)
June 3, 2013 Filing 36 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Baldonado, Virginia Baldonado.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/13/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Hager, Kara)
June 3, 2013 Filing 35 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Michael Baldonado, Virginia Baldonado.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/13/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Hager, Kara)
May 30, 2013 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Honeywell International Inc. identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Honeywell International Inc... (Florax, Joelle)
May 30, 2013 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Florax, Joelle)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/29/2013. Motions referred to Christopher J. Burke.(nmfn)
May 22, 2013 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Browning, Ryan)
May 22, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan William Browning on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Browning, Ryan)
May 22, 2013 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE: In conjunction with the disclosure statement docketed in this action (SEE DI#16 ), corporate parents and other affiliates should be added to the case. The event code ADD CORPORATE AFFILIATES/PARENTS, found in the OTHER DOCUMENTS list, should be used to add this information. (rwc)
May 22, 2013 Corporate Affiliates/Parents added per Disclosure Statement: identifying Corporate Parent Daimler North America Corporation for Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Kron, James)
May 21, 2013 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
May 20, 2013 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Pratt & Whitney Power Systems Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Pratt & Whitney Power Systems Inc... (Bradley, Paul)
May 20, 2013 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by National Automotive Parts Assocation. (Bradley, Paul)
May 20, 2013 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Genuine Parts Company. (Bradley, Paul)
May 20, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Robert Kinsley on behalf of Pratt & Whitney Power Systems Inc. (Kinsley, Donald)
May 20, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Ann Fox on behalf of Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Assocation (Fox, Stephanie)
May 20, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Bradley on behalf of Genuine Parts Company, National Automotive Parts Assocation, Pratt & Whitney Power Systems Inc. (Bradley, Paul)
May 16, 2013 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Luk Clutch Systems LLC identifying Corporate Parent LuK USA, LLC for Luk Clutch Systems LLC.. (Oliva, Jennifer)
May 16, 2013 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Georgia Pacific LLC identifying Corporate Parent Georgia-Pacific Holdings LLC for Georgia Pacific LLC.. (Oliva, Jennifer)
May 16, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Danella Oliva on behalf of Georgia Pacific LLC, Luk Clutch Systems LLC (Oliva, Jennifer)
May 16, 2013 Filing 19 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/3/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(Kron, James)
May 16, 2013 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order relative to Motion To Dismiss Certain Claims)(Kron, James)
May 16, 2013 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Daimler Trucks North America LLC.(Kron, James)
May 16, 2013 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Daimler Trucks North America LLC. (Kron, James)
May 16, 2013 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Paccar Inc.. (Kron, James)
May 15, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew P. Donelson on behalf of BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc. (Donelson, Matthew)
May 15, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Trocki Mantzavinos on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Mantzavinos, Megan)
May 15, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Reese on behalf of Pneumo Abex Corporation (Reese, C.)
May 15, 2013 Case Assigned to Judge Sue L. Robinson. Please include the initials of the Judge (SLR) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
May 14, 2013 Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paccar Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/31/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E in support re Motion To Dismiss Certain Claims)(Kron, James)
May 14, 2013 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Paccar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re Motion To Dismiss Certain Claims)(Kron, James)
May 14, 2013 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Paccar Inc..(Kron, James)
May 14, 2013 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Murco Wall Products Inc.. (Nolte, R.)
May 14, 2013 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Stokes Nolte on behalf of Murco Wall Products Inc. (Nolte, R.)
May 14, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joelle Florax on behalf of Honeywell International Inc. (Florax, Joelle)
May 13, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Culley on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC (Culley, David)
May 13, 2013 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Caterpillar Inc.. (Ford, Eileen)
May 13, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen M. Ford on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Ford, Eileen)
May 10, 2013 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (cla, )
May 10, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from Superior/DE, Case Number N12C-12-192 ASB (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-1287110)- filed by Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 2B, #4 Exhibit 2C, #5 Exhibit 2D, #6 Exhibit 2E, #7 Exhibit 2F, #8 Exhibit 2G, #9 Exhibit 2H, #10 Exhibit 2I, #11 Exhibit 2J, #12 Exhibit 2K, #13 Exhibit 2L, #14 Exhibit 2M, #15 Exhibit 2N, #16 Exhibit 2O1, #17 Exhibit 2O2, #18 Exhibit 2P, #19 Exhibit 2Q, #20 Exhibit 2R, #21 Exhibit 3)(cla, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2013: #22 Civil Cover Sheet) (cla, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldonado et al v. Arvinmeritor Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvinmeritor Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BorgWarner Morse Tec Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Donelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH America LLC
Represented By: Peter S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Anne Fruehauf
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G. Ahern, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda North America Inc.
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christian J. Singewald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Dane Limited Partnership
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massey Ferguson Corp.
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Represented By: Megan Trocki Mantzavinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney Power Systems Inc.
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Donald Robert Kinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Kevin A. Guerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific LLC
Represented By: Matthew Robert Pierce
Represented By: Stephanie S. Riley
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Melissa L. Troutner
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Andrew Ross Silverman
Represented By: Jennifer Danella Oliva
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Represented By: C. Scott Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Daimler Trucks North America LLC
Represented By: James M. Kron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Paccar Inc.
Represented By: James M. Kron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas E. Skiles
Represented By: Joseph S. Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Does 1-500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Murco Wall Products Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie S. Levitsky
Represented By: R. Stokes Nolte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Beth E. Valocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Luk Clutch Systems LLC
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Melissa L. Troutner
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Andrew Ross Silverman
Represented By: Jennifer Danella Oliva
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Joelle Florax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Lockheed Martin Corp.
Represented By: Sarah Anne Fruehauf
Represented By: Armand J. Della Porta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Robert Bosch LLC
Represented By: David G. Culley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Navistar Inc.
Represented By: Kevin A. Guerke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: National Automotive Parts Assocation
Represented By: Paul A. Bradley
Represented By: Stephanie Ann Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Jason A. Cincilla
Represented By: Andrew Ross Silverman
Represented By: Amaryah K. Bocchino
Represented By: Ryan William Browning
Represented By: Melissa L. Troutner
Represented By: William Bruce Larson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Cummins Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Baldonado
Represented By: Kara Anne Hager
Represented By: Diane M. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Baldonado
Represented By: Kara Anne Hager
Represented By: Diane M. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: CNH Industrial America LLC (fka CNH America LLC)
Represented By: Peter S. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Eileen M. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sally J. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: NMBFIL Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Anne Fruehauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?