Kabbaj v. Google Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Younes Kabbaj
Defendant: Google Inc., Amazon Inc., Yahoo Inc. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2013cv01522
Filed: August 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORAL ORDER: The motion to recuse (D.I. #136 ) is filed in a closed case. It is therefore moot, and is dismissed. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/17/2016. (nms)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Address updated per: (46 in 1:14-cv-00780-RGA, 25 in 1:14-cv-01484-RGA, 70 in 1:14-cv-00982-RGA, 92 in 1:14-cv-01001-RGA, 136 in 1:13-cv-01522-RGA, 132 in 1:10-cv-00431-MAK, 106 in 1:12-cv-01322-RGA) MOTION for Recusal Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00431-MAK et al.(rwc)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for Recusal of Judge Andrews, Magistrate Thynge, and the Delaware District Court from all Civil Litigation Involving Plaintiff and Leave to Amend Pleasdings - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (rwc)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 USCA Order Terminating Appeal as to #123 Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit filed by Younes Kabbaj. USCA Decision: dismissing appeal. (sc, )
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MANDATE of USCA as to #112 Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit filed by Younes Kabbaj. USCA Decision: USDC judgment of 4/7/14 is affirmed. (Attachments: #1 Opinion)(sc, )
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Changing Plaintiff's address of record (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/1/2015. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00431-RGA et al.(nms)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE to Remove Address by Younes Kabbaj (etg, )
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Address updated per: (68 in 1:14-cv-00982-RGA, 108 in 1:10-cv-00431-RGA, 19 in 1:14-cv-01484-RGA, 104 in 1:12-cv-01322-RGA, 133 in 1:13-cv-01522-RGA, 44 in 1:14-cv-00780-RGA, 89 in 1:14-cv-01001-RGA) Order Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00431-RGA et al.(rbe)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORAL ORDER: Plaintiff can not use the Court of Appeals as his address. The Notice of Address Change (81 in 14-cv-1001-RGA, 130 in 13-cv-1522-RGA, 59 in 14-cv-982-RGA, 35 in 14-cv-780-RGA, 104 in 10-cv-00431-RGA, 101 in 12-cv-1322-RGA, 16 in 14-cv-1484-RGA) is therefore without effect. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/26/2015. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00431-RGA et al.(nms)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: Removed Remark made by Clerk's Office - Docketed in error. (rwc)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Change of Address by Younes Kabbaj (address not updated pending judge's approval). (mas, )
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Denying #128 MOTION to Certify Previous Order as Appealable as Per FRCP 54(b). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2015. (nms)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION to Certify Previous Order as Appealable as Per FRCP 54(b) - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (mas)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Change of Address by Younes Kabbaj (etg, )
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiffs Motions for Recusal and Amended Motions for Recusal of Chief United States Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 144 and 455 in C. A. No. 10-431-RGA, D.I. 74, 75 are DENIED. 2. Plaintiffs Motions for Recusal and Amended Motions for Recusal of Chief United States Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 144 and 455 in C. A. Nos. 13-1522-RGA, D.I. 118, 119; 14-780-RGA, D.I. 5, 16, 17; 14-982-RGA, D.I. 7, 8; and 14-1001-RGA, D.I. 24, 29 are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/18/14. (cak)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM OPINION: The Court denies plaintiffs Motion to Recuse and Amended Motions to Recuse United States Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 144 and 455 in C. A. No. 10-431-RGA at D.I. 74, 75, and further denies as the motions found in C. A. Nos. 13-1522-RGA at D.I. 118, 119; 14-780-RGA at D.I. 5, 16, 17; 14-982-RGA at D.I. 7, 8; 14-1001-RGA at D.I. 24, 29 are moot. An appropriate order will be entered. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/18/14. (cak)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Third Circuit re #123 Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit filed by Younes Kabbaj. USCA Case Number 14-4715. USCA Case Manager: Shannon (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (jk)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Third Circuit of #122 Order,. Appeal filed by Younes Kabbaj (TPO sent). No fee paid, no IFP. (mas)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Denying Motions for Recusal and Amended Motions for Recusal of United States District Judge Richard G. Andrews (see D.I.75 in 10-cv-00431-RGA, D.I. 8 in 14-cv-00982-RGA, D.I. 17 in 14-cv-00780-RGA, D.I. 119 in 13-cv-01522-RGA, D.I. 84 in 12-cv-01322-RGA-MPT, D.I. 29 in 14-cv-01001-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/12/2014. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00431-RGA et al.(nms)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Motions for Recusal and Amended Motions for Recusal of United States District Judge Richard G. Andrews. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/12/2014. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00431-RGA et al.(nms)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: MOTION for Recusal filed on 8/12/14 was missing pages. Document replaced on 9/24/14 to include the three missing pages. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00431-RGA et al.(mas)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER: In these cases, there are one or more recusal motions pending. Except for No. 13-1522, which is on appeal, each of the cases has various other non-recusal motions pending, for a total of about sixteen in the four cases. More motions may easily be filed. The Court has a duty to consider the recusal motions. Until the recusal motions are resolved, were the Court to take any action on any other pending motions, such action would likely have to be revisited should the Court grant any of the recusal motions. Thus, the Court will take not take any action on any pending motions before the recusal motions are decided. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/27/2014. Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-00431-RGA, 1:13-cv-01522-RGA, 1:14-cv-00780-RGA, 1:14-cv-00982-RGA, 1:14-cv-01001-RGA(nms)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The Motions for Recusal and the Amendment to the Motion and Affidavit for Recusal are no longer referred to Chief Judge Mary Pat Thynge. The referrals were done in error. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-01322-RGA-MPT, 1:13-cv-01522-RGA, 1:14-cv-00780-RGA, 1:14-cv-00982-RGA, 1:14-cv-01001-RGA(nms)
August 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred: #118 MOTION for Recusal, #119 MOTION for Recusal (nms)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 AMENDED MOTION for Recusal - filed by Younes Kabbaj.(rwc) Modified on 8/19/2014 (nms).
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Recusal Pursuant to U.S.C. Sections 144 & 455 - filed by Younes Kabbaj.(rwc) Modified on 8/19/2014 (nms). (Main Document 118 replaced on 9/24/2014) (mas, ).
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Letter to Younes Kabbaj from Clerk of Court regarding copies of all sealed documents in all cases. (etg)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Letter to Clerk of Court from Younes Kabbaj requesting copies of all sealed documents in all cases. (etg)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Denying #107 MOTION for Reconsideration re #98 Order; Dismissing as Moot #110 MOTION for Extension of Time; and Dismissing as Moot #111 MOTION Concerning Notice of Appeal. Plaintiff is ORDERED to return to the Court any "signed in blank" District of Delaware subpoenas in his possession. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/16/2014. (nms)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM re MOTION for Reconsideration (D.I. #107 ), Motion for Extension of Time (D.I. #110 ), and Motion Concerning Notice of Appeal (D.I. #111 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/16/2014. (nms)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re #112 Notice of Appeal to the Third Circuit filed by Younes Kabbaj. USCA Case Number 14-2663 (sc)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Third Circuit of #97 Memorandum Opinion, #98 Order Terminating Case. Appeal filed by Younes Kabbaj. IFP granted per #109 Order. TPO mailed. (cla, )
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MOTION Concerning Notice of Appeal - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (cla, )
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Remark - return of undeliverable mail of DI 97 & 98 re-mailed to plaintiff. (cla, )
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline re #110 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appeal. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/19/2014. (nms)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appeal - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (cla, )
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Granting #103 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2014. (nms)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Set Answering Brief Deadline: re #107 MOTION for Reconsideration re #98 Order, and #97 Memorandum Opinion. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/19/2014. (nms)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Denying #102 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appeal, filed by Younes Kabbaj. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/30/2014. (nms)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MOTION for Reconsideration re #97 Memorandum Opinion, #98 Order - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (cla, )
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 RESPONSE to #102 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appeal, filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 4/30/2014 (nms).
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ADDENDUM - filed by Younes Kabbaj. Addendum to #103 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (rwc)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order The following sealed document(s) will be retained permanently in the Clerk's Office for safekeeping: DI# 51. (cla, )
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: DI #104 was incorrectly filed as a Motion for Reconsideration. It has been modified to reflect that it is an Opening Brief in Support of DI #103 per direction from the court. (mdb)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 OPENING BRIEF in Support - re #103 Motion for leave to proceed in fomra pauperis on appeal filed by Younes Kabbaj. (rwc) Modified on 4/24/2014 (mdb).
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on Appeal - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (rwc)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Response, if any, to #102 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Appeal shall be due by 4/29/2014. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/22/2014. (nms)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appeal - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (rwc)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER that on or before May 8, 2014, Plaintiff shall show cause why he should not be ordered to return to the Court any "signed in blank" District of Delaware subpoenas in his possession. The MOTION to Dismiss Amazon.com Inc. (D.I. #100 ) as a defendant is Dismissed as Moot. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/17/2014. (nms)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION to Dismiss Amazon.com Inc. as Defendant - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (cla, )
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SUBPOENA filed by Younes Kabbaj directed to Amazon Inc. for 5/7/14 at 12:00pm (cla, )
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting Motions to Dismiss (D.I. #39 , #46 ); Denying Motion for Sanctions (D.I. #64 ); Denying Motions for Leave to Amend (D.I. #81 , #92 , #96 ); Dismissing as Moot the remaining motions (D.I. #26 , #28 , #56 , #76 , #90 ). The Clerk of Court is directed to Close the case (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/7/2014. (nms)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding pending motions to dismiss, motions to amend, discovery motions, and a motion for sanctions (D.I. #26 , #28 , #39 , #46 , #56 , #64 , #76 , #81 , #90 , #92 , #96 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/7/2014. (nms)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re #96 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/7/2014. (nms)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION to File Second Amended Complaint - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint)(mdb)
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #90 MOTION to Quash Or Stay Subpoena Directed to Wordpress.com Aka Automattic Inc. - filed by Younes Kabbaj.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/27/2014. (cla, )
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Withdrawal of #91 MOTION to Add Wordpress as Defendant - filed by Younes Kabbaj (cla, )
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ADDENDUM to #76 MOTION to Stay, by Younes Kabbaj. (mdb) Modified on 3/18/2014 (nms).
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Add American School of Tangier as Defendant - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (mdb)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION to Add Wordpress as Defendant - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (mdb)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re #90 MOTION to Quash Or Stay Subpoena Directed to Wordpress.com Aka Automattic Inc.. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 3/31/2014. (nms)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION to Quash Or Stay Subpoena Directed to Wordpress.com Aka Automattic Inc. - filed by Mark S. Simpson. (Attachments: #1Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Finger, David) Modified on 3/13/2014 (nms).
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPLY in further support of #76 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by Younes Kabbaj. (mdb) Modified on 3/7/2014 (nms).
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 REDACTED VERSION of #86 Exhibit 1 to D.I. 48, by Yahoo Inc.. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 3/4/2014 (nms).
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY to #64 MOTION for Sanctions, filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 3/4/2014 (nms).
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 [SEALED] EXHIBIT 1 to #48 Answering Brief in Opposition (see Order at D.I. #85 ). (nms)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting #68 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to D.I. 48, filed by Yahoo Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/25/2014. (nms)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Remark - ***Set Reply Brief Deadline re #76 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/3/2014. (cla, )
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE to #76 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 2/24/2014 (nms).
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 REPLY re #68 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to D.I. 48, filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 2/24/2014 (nms).
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re #81 MOTION to Add Defendant/Set Deadline. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/28/2014. (nms)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition - re #64 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Younes Kabbaj. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/28/2014. (mdb)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION to Add Defendant/Set Deadline - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (cla, )
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Subpoena - filed by Younes Kabbaj (cla, )
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (cla, )
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #68 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to D.I. 48 - filed by Younes Kabbaj.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/21/2014. (cla, )
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Remark - Motions terminated: 79 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Younes Kabbaj. Plaintiff paid the filing fee on 10/02/2013. (cla, )
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER. The Plaintiff is sending emails, or copies of emails, to rga_civil@ded.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is notified that sending emails to that address does not constitute a court filing, and is effective for no other purpose. Any previously sent emails are being deleted. Plaintiff is further requested to send no further emails to that address. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/6/2014. (nms)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re #76 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond/Stay of Litigation. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/21/2014. (nms)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond/Stay of Litigation - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (mdb)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESPONSE from Verizon Internet Services Inc. - re #44 Notice of Subpoena. (mdb)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SO ORDERED, re #73 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #64 Motion for Sanctions to February 17, 2014, filed by Yahoo Inc. (Reset Briefing Schedule: re #64 MOTION for Sanctions. Answering Brief due 2/17/2014). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/3/2014. (nms)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The duplicate redacted filings found at docket items 71 and 72 have been removed from the docket. As the Court has not ruled on the motion filed at docket item 68, the redacted filing is prematurely filed. (nms)
February 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendant Yahoo! Inc.s Motion for Sanctions to February 17, 2014 - filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re #68 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to D.I. 48. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/10/2014. (nms)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REDACTED VERSION of #65 MEMORANDUM in Support, by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 1/27/2014 (nms).
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 REDACTED VERSION of #64 MOTION for Sanctions by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Seal Exhibit 1 to D.I. 48 - filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 1/27/2014 (nms).
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting #66 MOTION to Seal, filed by Yahoo Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/21/2014. (nms)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Seal #64 Motion for Sanctions, and #65 Memorandum in Support - filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.) Modified on 1/23/2014 (nms).
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 [SEALED] MEMORANDUM in Support re #64 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Yahoo Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 2/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bayliss, A.)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 [SEALED] MOTION for Sanctions - filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying #60 MOTION to File Sur-Reply Brief, filed by Younes Kabbaj. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/7/2014. (nms)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 REPLY BRIEF re #56 MOTION to Quash or Stay Subpoena Directed to the Americam School of Tangiers filed by Mark S. Simpson. (Finger, David)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Remark: The Sur-Reply Brief submitted by Plaintiff with regard to the Motions to Dismiss found at D.I. 39 and D.I. 46 has been returned to Plaintiff along with a copy of the Order filed at D.I. 59. (nms)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion re #56 MOTION to Quash or Stay Subpoena Directed to the Americam School of Tangiers - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (cla, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (cla, )
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a sur-reply without seeking leave to file a sur-reply. No reason is apparent as to why a sur-reply should be permitted. Thus, Plaintiff's sur-reply will not be filed. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/2/2014. (nms)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 REPLY BRIEF re #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Bayliss, A.)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re #56 MOTION to Quash or Stay Subpoena Directed to the Americam School of Tangiers. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/6/2014. (nms)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 REPLY BRIEF re #39 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Amazon Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Liston, Ian) Modified on 12/23/2013 (nms).
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Quash or Stay Subpoena Directed to the Americam School of Tangiers - filed by Mark S. Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Finger, David) Modified on 12/20/2013 (nms).
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas Patrick Lane filed by Yahoo Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2013. (nms)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Attorney Thomas P. Lane for Yahoo Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Thomas Patrick Lane - filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Thomas Patrick Lane, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bayliss, A.)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Serve Subpoena, Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Subpoena dated November 13, 2013, and Notice of Service of Defendant Yahoo! Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Subpoena dated November 13, 2013 by Federal Express to Plaintiff re #53 Objections, #52 Response to Motion filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OBJECTIONS by Yahoo Inc. to Subpoena dated November 13, 2013. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The Notice of Service filed at D.I. 53 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall file all discovery materials in compliance with Local Rule 5.4(a). (nms)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE to #26 MOTION to serve subpeona, filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 12/18/2013 (nms).
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Revoking Plaintiff's Electronic filing rights. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2013. (nms)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #49 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit, filed by Younes Kabbaj. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/17/2013. (nms)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order CORRECTING ENTRY: The exhibit filed as attachments to D.I. 45 have been removed from that filing. The exhibits have been re-docketed and placed under seal. They can now be found at D.I. 51. (nms)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (Kabbaj, Younes)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Younes Kabbaj. Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/26/2013. (Attachments: #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Kabbaj, Younes) Modified on 2/25/2014 (nms).
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SEALED EXHIBITS re #45 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Younes Kabbaj. (nms)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Yahoo Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/30/2013. (Bayliss, A.)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bayliss, A.)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Younes Kabbaj.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/23/2013. (Kabbaj, Younes) Modified on 12/17/2013 (nms).
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Subpoena by Younes Kabbaj (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Objections to Subpoenas, by Google Inc..(Liston, Ian) Modified on 12/2/2013 (nms).
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.'s Objections to Subpoenas, by Amazon Inc..(Liston, Ian) Modified on 12/2/2013 (nms).
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE to #26 MOTION to serve subpeona, filed by Amazon Inc., Google Inc.. (Liston, Ian) Modified on 12/2/2013 (nms).
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #39 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Amazon Inc., Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/16/2013. (Liston, Ian) Modified on 12/2/2013 (nms).
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Amazon Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liston, Ian) Modified on 12/2/2013 (nms).
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #38 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Plead, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint to December 12, 2013, filed by Yahoo Inc. (Reset Answer Deadlines: Yahoo Inc. answer due 12/12/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/20/2013. (nms)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Plead, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint to December 12, 2013 - filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Bayliss, A.) Modified on 11/20/2013 (nms).
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SUBPOENA filed by Younes Kabbaj directed to Amazon.com Inc. for 12/13/2013 (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SUBPOENA filed by Younes Kabbaj directed to Google Inc. for 12/13/2013 (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SUBPOENA filed by Younes Kabbaj directed to Yahoo Inc. for 12/13/2013 (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SUBPOENA filed by Younes Kabbaj directed to Google Inc. for 12/13/2013 (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SUBPOENA filed by Younes Kabbaj directed to Amazon Inc. for 12/13/2013 (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of SUBPEONA by Younes Kabbaj (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SUBPOENA filed by Younes Kabbaj directed to Yahoo Inc. for 12/13/2013 (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUBPOENA filed by Younes Kabbaj directed to Amazon Inc. for 12/13/2013 (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUBPOENA filed by Younes Kabbaj directed to Google Inc. for 12/13/2013 (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to serve subpeona on Wordpress - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Remark: Set Answering Brief Deadline re #26 MOTION to serve subpeona, and #25 MOTION to Stay re #23 Amended Complaint. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/29/2013. (nms)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The Motion to Stay (D.I. #25 ) is DENIED. The Motion to Dismiss (D.I. #19 ) is DISMISSED as Moot in view of the First Amended Complaint (D.I. #23 ). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/13/2013. (nms)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Address updated per: (27 in 1:13-cv-01522-RGA) Notice of Change of Address Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01522-RGA, 1:10-cv-00431-RGA, 1:12-cv-01322-RGA-MPT(rwc)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Change of Address by Younes Kabbaj (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to serve subpeona - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kabbaj, Younes)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Stay re #23 Amended Complaint, - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Younes Kabbaj re #23 Amended Complaint, (Kabbaj, Younes)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 42, #2 Exhibit 43, #3 Exhibit 44, #4 Exhibit 45, #5 Exhibit 46, #6 Exhibit 47, #7 Exhibit 48, #8 Exhibit 49, #9 Exhibit 50, #10 Exhibit 51, #11 Exhibit 52)(Kabbaj, Younes)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Answer, Plead, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to November 14, 2013, filed by Yahoo Inc. (Reset Answer Deadlines: Yahoo Inc. answer due 11/14/2013). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/25/2013. (nms)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Google Inc.. (Liston, Ian)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Amazon Inc.. (Liston, Ian)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Amazon Inc., Google Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/12/2013. (Liston, Ian) Modified on 10/25/2013 (nms).
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Amazon Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liston, Ian) Modified on 10/25/2013 (nms).
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Robert Liston on behalf of Amazon Inc., Google Inc. (Liston, Ian)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Bayliss, A.)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to Answer, Plead, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to November 14, 2013 - filed by Yahoo Inc.. (Bayliss, A.)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Thompson Bayliss on behalf of Yahoo Inc. (Bayliss, A.)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Amazon.com Inc. on 10/03/2013, filed by Younes Kabbaj. (Kabbaj, Younes)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Yahoo Inc. on 10/03/2013, filed by Younes Kabbaj. (Kabbaj, Younes)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Google Inc. on 10/03/2013, filed by Younes Kabbaj. (Kabbaj, Younes)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Address updated per e-mail confirmation. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01522-RGA, 1:10-cv-00431-RGA, 1:12-cv-01322-RGA-MPT(rwc)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of FRCP Rule 4. Acknowledgment filed by Younes Kabbaj. (rwc)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing fee paid in full: $ 400.00, receipt number 19835. FRCP Rule 4 issued. (rwc)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Amazon Inc. on 10/2/2013; Google Inc. on 10/2/2013; Yahoo Inc. on 10/2/2013. (rwc)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: Emergency MOTION Requesting Issuance of Summons (D.I. #10 ) is DENIED. There is no identified emergency. The Court must first do the screening required by 28 U.S.C 1915. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/26/2013. (nms)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Process Server - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01)(Kabbaj, Younes)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter to Court from Younes Kabbaj regarding Appeals Court Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kabbaj, Younes)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Remark: Mr. Kabbaj is now registered for e-filing and noticing in both CA 13-1522 RGA and CA 12-1322 RGA (rbe)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SO ORDERED re #4 MOTION Requesting Permission to File Electronically, filed by Younes Kabbaj. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2013. (nms)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 MOTION to Modify Filing Date. The Complaint is treated as though it was filed on August 28, 2013, nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/10/2013. (nms)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Modify Filing Date - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (nms)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/5/13. (mdb)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
September 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Remark: Copies of Summonses for Google Inc., Yahoo Inc., and Amazon Inc. placed in case file. (mdb)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION Requesting Permission to File Electronically, filed by Younes Kabbaj. (mdb) Modified on 9/4/2013 (nms).
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mdb)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed Pro Se with Jury Demand against Amazon Inc., Google Inc., John Does 1-10, Yahoo Inc. - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-10, #3 Exhibit 11-20, #4 Exhibit 21-23, #5 Exhibit 24-25, #6 Exhibit 26-27, #7 Exhibit 28-29, #8 Exhibit 30-31, #9 Exhibit 32, #10 Exhibit 33-35, #11 Exhibit 36-37, #12 Exhibit 38-41, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(mdb)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (mdb)
August 30, 2013 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - filed by Younes Kabbaj. (mdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kabbaj v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Younes Kabbaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Inc.
Represented By: Ian Robert Liston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yahoo Inc.
Represented By: A. Thompson Bayliss
Represented By: Thomas P. Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?