INTERNATIONAL UNION, UNITED AUTOMOBILE, AEROSPACE AND AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT WORKERS OF AMERICA (UAW) et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: |
International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, UAW, Dolores Gromalski and Pablo Gomez |
Defendant: |
Visteon Corporation, Visteon Systems LLC, Visteon Systems LLC Health and Welfare Benefit Plan for Hourly Employees-North Penn Location, Visteon Carribean Inc. and Visteon Carribean Inc. Employee Group Insurance Plan |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv01742 |
Filed: |
October 22, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Delaware |
Office: |
Wilmington Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard G. Andrews |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor/Management Relations |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 9, 2015 |
Filing
99
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (D.I. 90 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/9/2015. (nms)
|
July 18, 2014 |
Filing
77
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 73 MOTION for Order Referring Case to the Bankruptcy Court or, In The Alternative, Retaining the Case in the District Court. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/18/2014. (nms)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL UNION, UNITED AUTOMOBILE, AEROSPACE AND AGRICULTURAL IMPLEMENT WORKERS OF AMERICA (UAW) et al v. Ford Motor Company |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: International Union, United Automobile, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, UAW |
Represented By: |
John G. Adam |
Represented By: |
Susan E. Kaufman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Dolores Gromalski |
Represented By: |
Susan E. Kaufman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Pablo Gomez |
Represented By: |
Susan E. Kaufman |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Visteon Corporation |
Represented By: |
James E. O'Neill, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Visteon Systems LLC |
Represented By: |
James E. O'Neill, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Visteon Systems LLC Health and Welfare Benefit Plan for Hourly Employees-North Penn Location |
Represented By: |
James E. O'Neill, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Visteon Carribean Inc. |
Represented By: |
James E. O'Neill, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Visteon Carribean Inc. Employee Group Insurance Plan |
Represented By: |
James E. O'Neill, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?