Parallel Networks Licensing LLC v. Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff: Parallel Networks Licensing LLC
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Case Number: 1:2013cv02073
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 513 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re 505 . (*See Order for further details). Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 3/6/2020. (nmg)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 468 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 9/26/2017. (nmfn)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 359 MEMORANDUM ORDER - denying re 340 MOTION for a Phased Trial filed by Microsoft Corporation, denying 339 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Construction of the Releasing Limitation in View of New Intrinsic filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Kent A. Jordan on 2/22/17. (rwc)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 194 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Rule 12(c) filed by Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 6/4/2015. (fms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parallel Networks Licensing LLC v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parallel Networks Licensing LLC
Represented By: Christopher T. Bovenkamp
Represented By: Gregory J. Brodzik
Represented By: Douglas Cawley
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Represented By: Monte Terrell Squire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?