Mobile-Plan-It LLC v. Facebook Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Mobile-Plan-It LLC
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00137
Filed: February 4, 2014
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2014 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mobile-Plan-It LLC. Facebook Inc. served on 2/5/2014, answer due 2/26/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen)
February 5, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Facebook Inc. on 2/5/2014. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (mdb)
February 4, 2014 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,312,091;. (mdb)
February 4, 2014 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mdb)
February 4, 2014 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Facebook Inc.. Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1454554.) - filed by Mobile-Plan-It LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobile-Plan-It LLC v. Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mobile-Plan-It LLC
Represented By: Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Represented By: Sara E. Bussiere
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Represented By: Kathryn D. Duvall(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Erin Pritchard(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.