iMTX Strategic LLC v. Apple Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: iMTX Strategic LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00546
Filed: April 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2014 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00546-GMS through 1:14-cv-00551-GMS (rjb)
April 28, 2014 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Apple Inc. on 4/28/2014. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (cla, )
April 25, 2014 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by iMTX Strategic LLC. (cla, )
April 25, 2014 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,269,854 B2;. (cla, )
April 25, 2014 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cla, )
April 25, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Apple Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1505531.) - filed by iMTX Strategic LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cla, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: iMTX Strategic LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iMTX Strategic LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?