TSMC Technology Inc. et al v. Zond LLC
Plaintiff: TSMC Technology Inc., Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited and TSMC North America Corp.
Defendant: Zond LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00721
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: Kent
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: granting in part 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/13/15. (ntl)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 7 MOTION to Enjoin is GRANTED; 13 MOTION to Transfer is DENIED; 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/26/15. (ntl)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending granting-in-part D.I. 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Zond LLC. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefin g consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/26/2015. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/8/2015. (dlk)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending granting D.I. 7 MOTION to Enjoin Zond, LLC From Maintaining a Later-Filed Action in the District Court of Massachusetts filed by TSMC North America Corp., TSMC Technology Inc., Taiwan Semicon ductor Manufacturing Company Limited,and denying D.I. 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Massachusetts filed by Zond LLC. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists s olely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/8/2015. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/19/2014. (dlk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TSMC Technology Inc. et al v. Zond LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TSMC Technology Inc.
Represented By: David C. Dotson
Represented By: Anthony J. Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Aleksander J. Goranin
Represented By: L. Norwood Jameson
Represented By: Richard C. Kim
Represented By: Robert Terry Parker
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Represented By: Patricia R. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Company Limited
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TSMC North America Corp.
Represented By: Richard L. Renck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zond LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Sara E. Bussiere
Represented By: Richard D. Kirk
Represented By: Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?