GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al v. Glenmark Generics Inc. USA
Plaintiff: GlaxoSmithKline LLC and SmithKline Beecham (Cork) Limited
Defendant: Glenmark Generics Inc. USA
Case Number: 1:2014cv00877
Filed: July 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MEMORANDUM ORDER re (383 in 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED, and the portion of Defendants' motion for summary judgment related to lost profits and the portion of Defendants' motion to exclude set forth herein (D.I. 248) are DENIED, and GSK's motions to exclude (Glenmark action D.I. 209; D.I. 246) are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 6/9/17. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00877-LPS-CJB, 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB (ntl)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MEMORANDUM ORDER re (302 in 1:14-cv-00877-LPS-CJB, 351 in 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED and the portion of Defendants' motion for summary judgment related to convoyed sales is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/26/17. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00877-LPS-CJB, 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB (ntl)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 319 MEMORANDUM ORDER re (346 in 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION is ADOPTED to the extent and as explained herein re Defendants' motion for summary judgment as related to invalidity is DENIED (248 in 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 5/25/17. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00877-LPS-CJB, 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB (ntl)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MEMORANDUM ORDER re (165 in 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB, 133 in 1:14-cv-00877-LPS-CJB) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/17/17. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00877-LPS-CJB, 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB (ntl)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending DENYING D.I. 161 MOTION for Leave to File /Defendant Glenmark Pharmaceuticals Inc., USA's Motion For Leave To Amend Its Answer, Affirmative Defenses And Counterclaims filed by Glenmark Pharmac euticals Inc., USA. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2017. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/15/2016. (mlc)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding Claim Construction. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 6/20/2016. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 6/3/2016. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00877-LPS-CJB, 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB(mlc)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM ORDER re (38 in 1:14-cv-00877-LPS-CJB, 39 in 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- Objections are OVERRULED and the Report is ADOPTED re (18 in 1:14-cv-00877-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Glenmark Generics Inc. USA; and (20 in 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. are GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 8/10/15. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00877-LPS-CJB, 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB (ntl)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Granting in part D.I.(18 in 1:14-cv-00877-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Glenmark Generics Inc. USA, and D.I. (20 in 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB) MOTION to Dismiss f or Failure to State a Claim filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc.. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) an d the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 5/11/2015. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/22/2015. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00877-LPS-CJB, 1:14-cv-00878-LPS-CJB(dlk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GlaxoSmithKline LLC et al v. Glenmark Generics Inc. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Represented By: William Chad Shear
Represented By: Limin NMI Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SmithKline Beecham (Cork) Limited
Represented By: William Chad Shear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenmark Generics Inc. USA
Represented By: James L. Higgins
Represented By: Adam Wyatt Poff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?