TQ Delta LLC v. ADTRAN Inc.
Plaintiff: TQ Delta LLC
Defendant: ADTRAN Inc.
Counter_claimant: ADTRAN Inc.
Counter_defendant: TQ Delta LLC
Case Number: 1:2014cv00954
Filed: July 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 915 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony Inconsistent with the Court's Claim Construction for Family 10 (D.I. 727 in C.A. 14-954-RGA) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/31/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 870 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Motion for Reargument and Claim Construction in Light of the Court's Opinion on ADTRAN's Motion for Claim Construction and Summary Judgment on the 956 and 411 Patents (D.I. 831 in C.A. 14-954-RGA) is DENIED-IN-PART and GRANTED-IN-PART (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 865 MEMORANDUM ORDER: ADTRAN's Motion for Clarification and Reconsideration (D.I. 794 in 14-cv-954-RGA; D.I. 791 in 15-cv-121-RGA) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/3/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 811 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/13/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 809 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/12/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 804 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 800 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/9/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms) (Main Document 800 replaced on 9/10/2019) (nms).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 762 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/15/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 674 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/23/2019. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 398 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Motion for Summary Judgment on the License Issue. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/18/2018. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the issue of claim construction of multiple terms in U.S. Patent No. 8,625,660. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion suitable for submission to the jury. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/27/2018. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00954-RGA, 1:15-cv-00121-RGA(nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TQ Delta LLC v. ADTRAN Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TQ Delta LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADTRAN Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: ADTRAN Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: TQ Delta LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?