Impax Laboratories Inc. et al v. Lannett Holdings Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Impax Laboratories Inc. and AstraZeneca AB
Defendant: Lannett Holdings Inc. and Lannett Company Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00984
Filed: July 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 TRIAL OPINION. Defendants have failed to prove the Dearn patents are invalid. If desired, Defendants should request an opportunity to cross-examine Ms. Allen within one week. If Defendants do not make that request, the parties should submit an agreed upon form of final judgment within two weeks. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/29/2017. (nms)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OPINION providing claim construction for disputed terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 6,750,237 and 7,220,767. Within five days the parties shall submit a proposed order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/1/2015. (nms)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM ORDER Consolidating Cases and Denying Motion to Dismiss (see D.I. 9 in 14cv984-RGA). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/10/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-cv-00984-RGA, 1:14-cv-00999-RGA(nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impax Laboratories Inc. et al v. Lannett Holdings Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Impax Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AstraZeneca AB
Represented By: Steven J. Balick
Represented By: Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lannett Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Austen C. Endersby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lannett Company Inc.
Represented By: Austen C. Endersby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?