Jordan v. Mirra
Plaintiff: Gigi Jordan
Defendant: Raymond A. Mirra, Jr.
Intervenor: Cyrus R Vance, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01485
Filed: December 16, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sherry R. Fallon
Presiding Judge: Sue L. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Gerald A. McHugh on 12/20/2019. (amf) (Main Document 368 replaced on 12/20/2019) (amf).
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (D.I. 316 ). SEE ORDER FOR ADDIITIONAL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Gerald A. McHugh on 5/15/2019. (nmg)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MEMORANDUM Signed by Judge Gerald A. McHugh on 7/17/2018. (nmf)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (D.I. 199 ) granting 112 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (D.I. 176 ) is DISMISSED with prejudice as to Counts I through VI and VIII through X. Plaintiff may therefore proceed on Count VII only. Signed by Judge Gerald A. McHugh on 11/28/2017. (nmfn)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 112 MOTION to Dismiss. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 10/2/2017. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/14/2017. (lih)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 158 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's motion to amend (D.I. 123 ) is granted. Defendants' motions to dismiss (D.I. 108 , 112 ) are recommitted to Judge Fallon for consideration on the merits. ORDER STAYING CASE pending resolution of the motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 8/31/2016. (nmfn)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- DENYING 145 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply, DENYING 108 MOTION to Dismiss, GRANTING 123 MOTION to Amend/Correct 84 Amended Complaint, DENYING 112 MOTION to Dismiss. Please note that when fili ng Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 6/24/2016. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 6/7/2016. (lih)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Mirra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gigi Jordan
Represented By: David J. Ferry, Jr.
Represented By: Rick S. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond A. Mirra, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth J. Nachbar
Represented By: Lauren Kimberly Neal
Represented By: Leslie A. Polizoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Cyrus R Vance, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?