AVM Technologies LLC v. Intel Corporation
Plaintiff: AVM Technologies LLC
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Case Number: 1:2015cv00033
Filed: January 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 798 MEMORANDUM regarding Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law (D.I. 778 ; D.I. 779 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/14/2018. (nms)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 690 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding expert testimony (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/30/2017. (nms)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 667 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 404 MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding Intel's Reverse Doctrine of Equivalents Defense (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/28/2017. (ksr, )
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 660 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Intel's Utility Defense and to Strike Unreliable Expert Testimony on the Question of Utility (D.I. 407 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/27/2017. (nms)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 636 MEMORANDUM ORDER providing claim construction for a single term in claim 12 of U.S. Patent No. 5,859,547 (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/18/2017. (nms)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 632 MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting 409 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Issue Preclusion, Denying 419 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of No Damages Based On Issue Preclusion (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/17/2017. (ksr, )
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Magistrate Judge's Oral Order issued during the September 27, 2016, hearing. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/19/2016. (nms)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 393 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Objections (D.I. 305 to the Magistrate's Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/9/2016. (nms)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 328 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/5/2016. (ksr, )
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MEMORANDUM ORDER. SEE FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 5/3/16. (cak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AVM Technologies LLC v. Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVM Technologies LLC
Represented By: Benjamin J. Schladweiler
Represented By: Collins J. Seitz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Richard L. Horwitz
Represented By: David C. Marcus
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Quentin A. Palfrey
Represented By: David C. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?