Microsoft Mobile, Inc. et al v. InterDigital, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Microsoft Mobile, Inc. and Microsoft Mobile Oy
Defendant: InterDigital, Inc., InterDigital Communications Inc., InterDigital Technology Corporation, InterDigital Patent Holdings Inc., InterDigital Holdings Inc. and IPR Licensing Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00723
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying Motion For The Issuance Of Letters Of Request Pursuant To The Hague Convention Of 18 March 1970 On The Taking Of Evidence Abroad In Civil Or Commercial Matters (D.I. 62 ) (see Memorandum Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2017. (nms)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 29 MOTION for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal (D.I. 29 ). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/13/2016. (nms)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM ORDER Denying 16 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/13/2016. (nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Mobile, Inc. et al v. InterDigital, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Mobile, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Cederoth
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: David T. Pritikin
Represented By: Stacy Quan
Represented By: Thatcher A. Rahmeier
Represented By: Paul H. Saint-Antoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Mobile Oy
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: Thatcher A. Rahmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterDigital, Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jacobson
Represented By: Michael B. Levin
Represented By: Maura L. Rees
Represented By: David S. Steuer
Represented By: Lucy Yen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterDigital Communications Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterDigital Technology Corporation
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterDigital Patent Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterDigital Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPR Licensing Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Belgam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?