American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. v. Neapco Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc.
Defendant: Neapco Holdings LLC and Neapco Drivelines LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv01168
Filed: December 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Christopher J. Burke
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 MEMORANDUM OPINION re pending motions. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/27/18. (ntl)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 131 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply is GRANTED; 122 MOTION for Reargument is GRANTED; 105 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint is DENIED. The hearing on September 26, 2017 is CANCELLED and will be re-scheduled. Status report is due September 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/6/17. (ntl)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OPINION re Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 4/7/2017. (etg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc. v. Neapco Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Randal S. Alexander
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Castellano
Represented By: Boyd Cloern
Represented By: Katherine H. Johnson
Represented By: James R. Nuttall
Represented By: John W. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neapco Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neapco Drivelines LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?