Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., et al v. Navient Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of Chicago, George A. Menold, Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Tore Heniz Markus Jagrelius, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund and Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc.
Defendant: Navient Corporation, Barry A. Munitz, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., William M. Diefenderfer, III., RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Diane Suitt Gilleland, Barclays Capital Inc., John Kane, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Somsak Chivavibul, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Steven L. Shapiro, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Barry L. Williams, Ann Torre Bates, John F. Remondi, Linda Mills, Jane J. Thompson and Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Petitioner: Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust and The City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust
Case Number: 1:2016cv00112
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Referring Judge: Gregory M Sleet
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 142 Official Transcript of Discovery Dispute Teleconference held on 01/08/20 before Judge Maryellen Noreika. Court Reporter/Transcriber Heather M. Triozzi,Email: Heather_Triozzi@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2020. (Triozzi, Heather)
January 10, 2020 Filing 141 REDACTED VERSION of #137 Declaration, by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13)(Farnan, Kelly)
January 10, 2020 Filing 140 REDACTED VERSION of #136 Letter by Ann Torre Bates, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 9, 2020 Filing 139 REDACTED VERSION of #135 Declaration by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - N)(Foulds, Christopher) Modified on 1/9/2020 (dlw).
January 9, 2020 Filing 138 REDACTED VERSION of #134 Letter by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Foulds, Christopher) Modified on 1/9/2020 (dlw).
January 8, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Maryellen Noreika - Discovery Telephone Conference held on 1/8/2020 re #134 , #135 , #136 , and #137 . The transcript of this telephone conference shall serve as the Court's ruling. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (mdb)
January 3, 2020 Filing 137 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Christopher S. Turner re #136 Letter by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-13)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 1/6/2020 (dlw).
January 3, 2020 Filing 136 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Kelly E. Farnan regarding Opposition to Plaintiffs' January 2, 2020 Letter - re #134 Letter. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 1/6/2020 (dlw).
January 2, 2020 Filing 135 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Jeremy P. Robinson re #134 Letter by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - N, #2 Certificate of Service)(Foulds, Christopher) Modified on 1/3/2020 (dlw).
January 2, 2020 Filing 134 [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Maryellen Noreika from Christopher M. Foulds regarding Plaintiffs to outline discovery issues to be addressed at the January 8, 2020 Teleconference - re 124 Order Setting Teleconference,,. (Foulds, Christopher)
December 27, 2019 Filing 133 REDACTED VERSION of #130 Declaration by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N - Z)(Friedlander, Joel) Modified on 1/2/2020 (dlw).
December 27, 2019 Filing 132 REDACTED VERSION of #129 Reply Brief by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Friedlander, Joel) Modified on 1/2/2020 (dlw).
December 27, 2019 Filing 131 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams re #104 MOTION for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives, and Appointment of Class Counsel. (Farnan, Kelly)
December 20, 2019 Filing 130 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Jeremy P. Robinson re #129 Reply Brief by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N-Z, #2 Certificate of Service)(Friedlander, Joel) Modified on 12/27/2019 (dlw).
December 20, 2019 Filing 129 [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re #104 MOTION for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives, and Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Friedlander, Joel) Modified on 12/27/2019 (dlw).
December 16, 2019 Filing 128 AMENDED NOTICE to Take Deposition of Navient Corporation on December 17, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Quinn, Christopher) Modified on 12/16/2019 (dlw).
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 SO ORDERED re #126 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order (Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Fact Discovery completed by 4/29/2020. Opening Expert Reports due by 5/22/2020. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 6/19/2020. Reply Expert Reports due by 11/30/2020. Expert Discovery due by 8/14/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/14/2020. Answering Brief due 10/30/2020. Reply Brief due 11/30/2020. A Pretrial Conference is set for 5/14/2021 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. A 7-day Jury Trial is set for 5/24/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/13/2019. (dlw)
December 12, 2019 Filing 126 STIPULATION to Amend Scheduling Order re #81 Scheduling Order,, by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Foulds, Christopher)
December 11, 2019 Filing 125 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Navient Corporations Response and Objections to Plaintiffs Notice of Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition of Navient Corporation filed by Navient Corporation.(Farnan, Kelly)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORAL ORDER Setting Teleconference - After having been advised by the parties of their inability to resolve a discovery dispute(s), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Discovery Dispute Telephone Conference is set for 1/8/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Maryellen Noreika. The opening letter(s) (not to exceed three (3) pages) is due on 1/2/2020 and the responsive letter(s) (not to exceed three (3) pages) is due on 1/3/2020. All parties wishing to join the call shall do so by individually dialing into 302-573-4545 not earlier than 1:55 PM. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/5/2019. (dlw)
November 25, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Rene Stulz on December 12, 2019 filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Quinn, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 122 AMENDED NOTICE to Take Deposition of Robert Montgomery on November 26, 2019 filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Quinn, Christopher) Modified on 11/26/2019 (dlw).
November 25, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Navient Corporation on December 10, 2019 filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Quinn, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 120 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Subpoena - Fenway Summer LLC filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Quinn, Christopher)
November 5, 2019 Filing 119 DECLARATION of Danielle J. McCall re #118 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 4)(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 11/6/2019 (dlw).
November 5, 2019 Filing 118 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #104 MOTION for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives, and Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams.R eply Brief due date per Scheduling Order is 12/20/2019. (Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 11/6/2019 (dlw).
November 1, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE of Lead Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Party Subpoena to Strada Education by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund (Quinn, Christopher)
October 31, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel re: Anthony D. Marinello, Esq. of Shearman & Sterling LLP by Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC re Add Attorneys Pro Hac Vice, SO ORDERED, (Seaman, John)
October 21, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Various Deponents on Various dates starting at 9:30 a.m. filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Quinn, Christopher)
October 18, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action - Federal Housing Finance Agency filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Quinn, Christopher)
October 11, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lord Abbett's Objections to the Navient Defendants' Amended Notice of Deposition Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) to Lead Plaintiff re #110 Notice to Take Deposition, filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Quinn, Christopher)
October 4, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Lead Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Party Subpoenas to i3 Group, University of Phoenix and FHLB Des Moines by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund (Quinn, Christopher)
September 20, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Michael L. Hartzmark, Ph.D. on October 16, 2019 filed by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams.(Farnan, Kelly)
September 20, 2019 Filing 110 AMENDED NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lead Plaintiffs 30(b)(6) filed by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams.(Farnan, Kelly) Modified on 9/23/2019 (dlw).
September 13, 2019 Filing 109 REDACTED VERSION of #106 Declaration by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-M)(Friedlander, Joel) Modified on 9/13/2019 (dlw).
September 13, 2019 Filing 108 REDACTED VERSION of #105 Opening Brief in Support by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Friedlander, Joel) Modified on 9/13/2019 (dlw).
September 13, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Lead Plaintiffs on October 8, 2019 filed by Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams.(Farnan, Kelly)
September 6, 2019 Filing 106 [SEALED] DECLARATION of Jeremy P. Robinson re #105 Opening Brief in Support, #104 MOTION to Certify Class by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Exhibit M, #12 Certificate of Service)(Friedlander, Joel) Modified on 9/9/2019 (dlw).
September 6, 2019 Filing 105 [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re #104 MOTION for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives, and Appointment of Class Counsel filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Friedlander, Joel) Modified on 9/9/2019 (dlw).
September 6, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION for Class Certification, Appointment of Class Representatives, and Appointment of Class Counsel - filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedlander, Joel) Modified on 9/9/2019 (dlw).
August 5, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (i) Lord Abbett's Responses and Objections to the Navient Defendants' First Set of Requests for Production and (ii) Lord Abbett's Responses to the Navient Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Quinn, Christopher)
August 1, 2019 Filing 102 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate New York Stock Exchange for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Seaman, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 101 NOTICE of Lead Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Party Subpoenas by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund, Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of Chicago (Quinn, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 100 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Navient Defendants': (1) First Set of Requests for Production to Lead Plaintiff and (2) First Set of Interrogatories to Lead Plaintiff filed by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams.(Farnan, Kelly)
June 24, 2019 Filing 99 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses and Objections to First Request for Production of Documents filed by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation.(Farnan, Kelly)
June 24, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Underwriter Defendants' Responses and Objections to Lord Abbett's First Request for Production of Documents filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC.(Seaman, John)
May 23, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents Directed to All Defendants filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Quinn, Christopher)
May 20, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Quinn, Christopher)
May 20, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jesse P. Jensen, Jeremy P. Robinson, Richard Rykhouse, and Salvatore J. Graziano for Tore Heniz Markus Jagrelius, Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund, George A. Menold, and Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of Chicago added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures of the Underwriter Defendants filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC.(Seaman, John)
May 17, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Navient Defendants' Initial Disclosures filed by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams.(Farnan, Kelly) (Main Document 94 replaced on 5/20/2019 per request of counsel) (nmg).
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #92 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy Robinson, Esquire, #91 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Salvatore Graziano, Esquire, #93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jesse Jensen, Esquire, #90 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard Dykhouse, Esquire filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund, Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/2/2019. (dlw)
May 1, 2019 Filing 93 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jesse Jensen, Esquire - filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Quinn, Christopher)
May 1, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jeremy Robinson, Esquire - filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Quinn, Christopher)
May 1, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Salvatore Graziano, Esquire - filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Quinn, Christopher)
May 1, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard Dykhouse, Esquire - filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Quinn, Christopher)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 SO ORDERED re #87 Stipulation Substituting Lead Counsel. Attorney Joel E. Friedlander, Christopher M. Foulds, Christopher P. Quinn for Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, and Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund added. Attorney Richard M. Heimann; Sharon M. Lee; Bruce W. Leppla; R. Michael Lindsey; Michael J. Miarmi; Karen L. Morris; Patrick Francis Morris; Daniel P. Chiplock and Steven E. Fineman terminated. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/26/2019. (dlw)
April 24, 2019 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Joel Friedlander re #87 Stipulation by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Friedlander, Joel) Modified on 4/26/2019 (dlw).
April 24, 2019 Filing 87 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Substituting Lead Counsel by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Friedlander, Joel)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/4/2019. (dlw)
April 3, 2019 Filing 85 PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Morris, Patrick)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Setting Teleconference: Plaintiffs' counsel to initiate the call. A Telephone Conference is set for 4/12/2019 at 10:30 AM Eastern Time before Judge Mary Pat Thynge to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/2/19. (cak)
March 29, 2019 Filing 83 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #59 Amended Complaint, by Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC.(Seaman, John)
March 29, 2019 Filing 82 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #59 Amended Complaint, by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams.(Farnan, Kelly)
March 5, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation (cak)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 8/9/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2019. Fact Discovery completed by 2/14/2020. Opening Expert Reports due by 2/28/2020. Rebuttal Expert Reports due by 3/30/2020. Reply Expert Reports due by 4/19/2020. Expert Discovery due by 5/29/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2020. A Pretrial Conference is set for 1/11/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. A 7-day Jury Trial is set for 1/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Maryellen Noreika. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/4/2019. (dlw)
March 1, 2019 Filing 80 STIPULATION Proposed Scheduling Order re 77 Oral Order,,, by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter to [Proposed] Scheduling Order)(Morris, Patrick)
February 21, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel Kahn for Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #79 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Kahn filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Barclays Capital Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/19/2019. (dlw)
February 18, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel Kahn - filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Daniel Kahn, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Seaman, John)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #78 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Navient Corporation, Individual Defendants and Underwriter Defendants Answers to Second Amended Complaint to through and including March 29, 2019. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 2/8/2019. (dlw)
February 8, 2019 Filing 78 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants Navient Corporation, Individual Defendants and Underwriter Defendants Answers to Second Amended Complaint to through and including March 29, 2019 - filed by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORAL ORDER - In light of the Court's 1/29/2019 Memorandum Opinion #75 and Order #76 , paragraph 6 of the parties Scheduling Stipulation and Order #57 , and the judicial reassignment to Judge Noreika, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/30/2019. (dlw)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re #75 Memorandum Opinion. Defendants' motion to dismiss #63 is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART; Defendants' motion is GRANTED as to all claims based on the compliance statements and the Exchange Act claims based on the credit facility statements; Defendants' motion is DENIED in all other respects; The Securities Act and Exchange Act claims based on the compliance statements are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE; and The Exchange Act claims based on the credit facility statements are dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/29/2019. (dlw)
January 29, 2019 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/29/2019. (dlw)
October 19, 2018 Filing 74 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund (Morris, Patrick)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORAL ORDER - The plaintiffs shall provide the Court with one courtesy copy of the Amended Complaint ( #36 ) and the Second Amended Complaint ( #59 ) by 4:00 PM on Tuesday, October 9, 2018. The courtesy copies shall be double-sided and bound on the left margin. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/5/2018. (mdb)
September 20, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00075-MN, 1:16-cv-00084-MN, 1:16-cv-00112-MN (rjb)
May 2, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund of Withdrawal of Counsel (Morris, Patrick)
April 20, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund of Plaintiffs' Request for Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Morris, Patrick)
April 16, 2018 Filing 70 DECLARATION re #69 Reply Brief,, Declaration of Brian A. O'Connell by Barclays Capital Inc., Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, John Kane, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Barry L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 and 7)(Farnan, Kelly)
April 16, 2018 Filing 69 REPLY BRIEF re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint Defendants' Reply Brief filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, John Kane, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Barry L. Williams. (Farnan, Kelly)
March 2, 2018 Filing 68 DECLARATION of Michael J. Miarmi in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Morris, Patrick)
March 2, 2018 Filing 67 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/9/2018. (Morris, Patrick)
January 24, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel re: Daniel R. Ciarrocki, formerly of Abrams & Bayliss LLP by Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC (Seaman, John)
January 16, 2018 Filing 65 DECLARATION re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint Declaration of Sian B. Jones by Barclays Capital Inc., Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, John Kane, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Barry L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 5)(Farnan, Kelly)
January 16, 2018 Filing 64 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, John Kane, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Barry L. Williams.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/30/2018. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 16, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Dismiss 2nd Amended Complaint - filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, John Kane, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, RBS Securities Inc., John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Barry L. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SO ORDERED - re #61 Stipulation regarding Page Limits for MTD Briefing filed by Navient Corporation, Somsak Chivavibul, John F. Remondi. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 1/10/2018. (mdb)
January 5, 2018 Filing 61 STIPULATION regarding Page Limits for MTD Briefing re #58 SO ORDERED, by Somsak Chivavibul, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi. (Farnan, Kelly)
December 12, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Sharon M. Lee for Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc.,Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc.,Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund,Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00112-GMS, 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 1:16-cv-00084-GMS(crb)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sharon M. Lee filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund, Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc.. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 12/7/2017. (mdb)
November 30, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven E. Fineman for Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00112-GMS, 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 1:16-cv-00084-GMS(nmg)
November 30, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael J. Miarmi for Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, and Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 1:16-cv-00112-GMS(nmg)
November 30, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Richard M. Heimann for Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund and Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
November 29, 2017 Filing 60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sharon M. Lee - filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Morris, Patrick)
November 17, 2017 Filing 59 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Morris, Patrick)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SO ORDERED - re #57 Stipulation of Scheduling and Proposed Order filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund, Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc.. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/3/2017. (mdb)
October 30, 2017 Filing 57 STIPULATION of Scheduling and Proposed Order re #56 Order, by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Morris, Patrick)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re #55 Memorandum - Defendants' motion to dismiss (D.I. 38) is GRANTED; Plaintiffs' consolidated amended class action complaint (D.I. #36 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; and if Plaintiffs do not file an amended complaint by November 5, 2017, the clerk of the court is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/6/2017. (mdb)
September 6, 2017 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 9/6/2017. (mdb)
August 28, 2017 Filing 54 OBJECTIONS by Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Barry L. Williams to #53 Notice (Other), Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority. (Farnan, Kelly)
August 10, 2017 Filing 53 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund re #43 Answering Brief in Opposition,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order in St. of Washington v. Navient Corp., #2 Exhibit B - Memo Opinion in Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Navient Corp.)(Morris, Patrick)
May 5, 2017 Filing 52 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Everen Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Securities LLC filed by Wells Fargo Securities LLC. (Seaman, John)
February 8, 2017 Filing 51 RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund re #45 Notice (Other),, Regarding Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice. (Morris, Patrick)
February 6, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Request for Oral Argument by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Morris, Patrick)
February 2, 2017 Filing 49 OBJECTIONS by Barclays Capital Inc., Somsak Chivavibul, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Navient Corporation, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC to #45 Notice (Other),, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Kelly)
January 30, 2017 Filing 48 JOINDER by Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC, joining in #46 Reply Brief /Underwriter Defendants' Joinder of Navient Corporation's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Navient Corporation and the Individual Defendants. (Seaman, John)
January 30, 2017 Filing 47 DECLARATION re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Declaration of Sian B. Jones by Somsak Chivavibul, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 through 8)(Farnan, Kelly)
January 30, 2017 Filing 46 REPLY BRIEF re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Somsak Chivavibul, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 27, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text descriptions of exhibits 2 and 3 of #45 Request for Judicial Notice have been swapped. (mdb)
January 26, 2017 Filing 45 REQUEST for Judicial Notice by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund re #43 Answering Brief in Opposition,, (Attachments: #1 Consumer Financial Protection Bureau v. Navient Complaint, #2 State of Washington v. Navient Complaint, #3 People of the State of Illinois v. Navient Complaint )(Morris, Patrick) Modified on 1/27/2017 (mdb). Modified on 1/27/2017 (mdb).
December 29, 2016 Filing 44 DECLARATION re #43 Answering Brief in Opposition,, DECLARATION OF MICHAEL J. MIARMI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Morris, Patrick)
December 29, 2016 Filing 43 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/5/2017. (Morris, Patrick)
November 14, 2016 Filing 42 JOINDER by Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC, joining in #38 Motion to Dismiss, #39 Opening Brief in Support, Underwriter Defendants' Joinder of Navient Corporation's Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. (Seaman, John)
November 14, 2016 Filing 41 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Somsak Chivavibul, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi. (Farnan, Kelly)
November 14, 2016 Filing 40 DECLARATION re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Declaration of Christopher S. Turner by Somsak Chivavibul, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 5)(Farnan, Kelly)
November 14, 2016 Filing 39 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #38 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) OPENING BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) BY NAVIENT CORPORATION AND THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS filed by Somsak Chivavibul, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/1/2016. (Farnan, Kelly)
November 14, 2016 Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) - filed by Somsak Chivavibul, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Farnan, Kelly)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #37 Stipulation re: extend page limit for the Opening and Answering Briefs on Navient Corporations and the Individual Defendants Motion to Dismiss shall be extended to 25 pages and the page limit for Defendants Reply Brief shall be extended to 12 pages filed by Navient Corporation, Somsak Chivavibul, John F. Remondi. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/10/2016. (mdb)
November 9, 2016 Filing 37 STIPULATION re: extend page limit for the Opening and Answering Briefs on Navient Corporations and the Individual Defendants Motion to Dismiss shall be extended to 25 pages and the page limit for Defendants Reply Brief shall be extended to 12 pages. by Somsak Chivavibul, Navient Corporation, John F. Remondi. (Farnan, Kelly)
September 28, 2016 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint against All Defendants - filed by Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund.(Morris, Patrick) Modified on 9/29/2016 (mdb).
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SO ORDERED - re #34 Initial Scheduling Stipulation and [Proposed] Order. (Amended Complaint due by 9/28/2016. See Stipulation for more information). Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/21/2016. (mdb)
July 13, 2016 Filing 34 STIPULATION Initial Scheduling Stipulation and [Proposed] Order by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Morris, Patrick)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT IN CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 7/1/2016. (asw)
July 1, 2016 Remark - Pursuant to the Stipulation and Proposed Order, these cases are consolidated FOR ALL PURPOSES. All future filings shall ONLY be made in Lead C.A. No. 16-112-GMS. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00112-GMS, 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 1:16-cv-00084-GMS(mdb)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SO ORDERED - re (26 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 26 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 24 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 24 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 29 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS, 29 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS) Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Consolidation, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel. Signed by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 6/30/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00112-GMS, 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 1:16-cv-00084-GMS(mdb)
June 30, 2016 Filing 31 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Everen Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Wells Fargo Securities LLC filed by Wells Fargo Securities LLC. (Seaman, John)
May 12, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Richard M. Heimann for Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 1:16-cv-00112-GMS(cna)
May 3, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Daniel P. Chiplock for Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund,Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 1:16-cv-00112-GMS(klc)
April 29, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bruce W. Leppla for Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc.,Bruce W. Leppla for Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc.,Bruce W. Leppla for Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund,Bruce W. Leppla for Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
April 28, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Joy A. Kruse for Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc.,Joy A. Kruse for Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc.,Joy A. Kruse for Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund,Joy A. Kruse for Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
April 28, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Steven J. Fineman, Michael J, Miarmi for Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 1:16-cv-00112-GMS(cna)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (25 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 30 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS, 27 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven E. Fineman, Joy A. Kruse, Daniel P. Chiplock, Michael J. Miarmi, Richard M. Heimann and Bruce W. Leppla filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund, Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/26/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 1:16-cv-00112-GMS(mdb)
April 26, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Steven E. Fineman, Joy A. Kruse, Daniel P. Chiplock, Michael J. Miarmi, Richard M. Heimann and Bruce W. Leppla - filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Lindsey, R.)
April 26, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and, MOTION to Appoint Counsel - filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Lindsey, R.)
April 25, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of non-opposition to pending motions for appointment as Lead Plaintiff by The City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust re (10 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 10 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 9 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 9 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 6 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS, 6 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (17 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS, 17 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS, 17 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel , (21 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 21 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 21 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Section of Lead Counsel , (14 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 14 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 13 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 13 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 10 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS, 10 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion of Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund, Amalgamated Bank, and Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System for Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (13 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 12 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 9 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff, (19 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 19 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 19 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION , (20 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Counsel, and to Consolidate Related Actions [NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION OF THE CITY OF MIAMI FIRE FIGHTERS AND POLICE OFFICERS RETIREMENT TRUST] (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 25, 2016 Filing 27 Amended Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Ciarrocki, Daniel)
April 21, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Anthony D. Marinello,Daniel C. Lewis,Adam S. Hakki for Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam S. Hakki, Daniel C. Lewis, and Anthony D. Marinello filed by J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Barclays Capital Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/21/2016. (mdb)
April 20, 2016 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman, Sachs & Co.; Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Bank of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated; Corporate Parent EVEREN Capital Corporation, Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Securities LLC; Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate Taunus Corporation, Other Affiliate DB USA Corporation, Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank A.G. for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.; Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc., Other Affiliate Credit Suisse Group AG, Other Affiliate Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Other Affiliate Credit Suisse AG, Other Affiliate Credit Suisse Group AG Guernsey Branch for Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC; Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.; Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc, Corporate Parent RBS Holdings USA Inc. for RBS Securities Inc.; Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets LLC; Corporate Parent J.P. Morgan Broker-Dealer Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co.. for J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC. (Seaman, John)
April 20, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of Chicago (Friedlander, Joel)
April 20, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam S. Hakki, Daniel C. Lewis, and Anthony D. Marinello - filed by Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Adam S. Hakki, #2 Certification of Daniel C. Lewis, #3 Certification of Anthony D. Marinello, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Seaman, John)
April 20, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Seaman on behalf of Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities LLC (Seaman, John)
April 12, 2016 Filing 22 DECLARATION re #21 Opening Brief in Support, #20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Counsel, and to Consolidate Related Actions by Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Andrews, Peter)
April 12, 2016 Filing 21 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #20 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Counsel, and to Consolidate Related Actions filed by Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/29/2016. (Andrews, Peter) Modified on 4/12/2016 (mdb).
April 12, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Counsel, and to Consolidate Related Actions - filed by Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Andrews, Peter) Modified on 4/12/2016 (mdb).
April 12, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: DI 20 and its attachments have been removed from the docket by the Docket Clerk, and therefore no longer exists. The parties are instructed to refrain from filing Notices of Motions. All briefs, memorandums, declarations, or appendices are to be filed as a separate docket item using the corresponding CM/ECF code. The movant shall refile the documents previously filed at DI 20, which no longer exists. (mdb)
April 11, 2016 Filing 19 DECLARATION re #17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel , #18 Opening Brief in Support, by Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Christine S. Azar, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Christine S. Azar, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Christine S. Azar, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of Christine S. Azar)(Azar, Christine)
April 11, 2016 Filing 18 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/28/2016. (Azar, Christine)
April 11, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases , MOTION Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel - filed by Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Order for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel, #2 Certificate of Compliance Certification of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1)(Azar, Christine)
April 11, 2016 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund Inc., Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Lindsey, R.)
April 11, 2016 Filing 15 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/28/2016. (Lindsey, R.)
April 11, 2016 Filing 14 DECLARATION re (13 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 12 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 9 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Lindsey, R.)
April 11, 2016 Filing 13 DECLARATION re (13 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 12 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 9 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff LR7.1.1 Averment - filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund (Lindsey, R.)
April 11, 2016 Filing 12 DECLARATION re (11 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS) Opening Brief in Support, (10 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS, 10 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion of Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund, Amalgamated Bank, and Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System for Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases Declaration of Christopher Quinn by Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Friedlander, Joel)
April 11, 2016 Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion of Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund, Amalgamated Bank, and Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System for Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of Chicago.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/28/2016. (Friedlander, Joel)
April 11, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion of Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund, Amalgamated Bank, and Arkansas Public Employees Retirement System for Appoint as Lead Plaintiff, Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases - filed by Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedlander, Joel)
April 11, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appoint Lead Plaintiff - filed by Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund, Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc., Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lindsey, R.)
April 11, 2016 Filing 8 DECLARATION re (10 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 10 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS, 9 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 9 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS, 6 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS, 6 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (10 in 1:16-cv-00084-GMS) Opening Brief in Support, (11 in 1:16-cv-00075-GMS) Opening Brief in Support, (7 in 1:16-cv-00112-GMS) Opening Brief in Support, [of Norman M. Monhait] by The City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D to Monhait Declaration)(deLeeuw, Peter)
April 11, 2016 Filing 7 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by The City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 4/28/2016. (deLeeuw, Peter)
April 11, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Consolidate Cases - filed by The City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B -- Rule 7.1 Statement)(deLeeuw, Peter)
March 21, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter A. Wald, Christopher S. Turner, Christopher Harris, Abid R. Qureshi for Navient Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cna)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #5 Stipulation Answering Complaint; Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, etc. filed by Navient Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/17/2016. (mdb)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter A. Wald, Christopher R. Harris, Abid R. Quershi and Christopher S. Turner of Latham & Watkins LLP filed by Navient Corporation. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/17/2016. (mdb)
March 16, 2016 Filing 5 STIPULATION Answering Complaint; Appointing Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, etc. by Navient Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
March 16, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter A. Wald, Christopher R. Harris, Abid R. Quershi and Christopher S. Turner of Latham & Watkins LLP - filed by Navient Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certifications By Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)(Farnan, Kelly)
March 16, 2016 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (formerly DI 4) has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall re-file the motion with the required certifications. (mdb)
March 14, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Farnan on behalf of Navient Corporation (Farnan, Kelly)
March 2, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
February 29, 2016 No Summons Issued. (klc)
February 26, 2016 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (klc)
February 26, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Federal Securities Laws filed with Jury Demand against Barclays Capital Inc., Ann Torre Bates, Somsak Chivavibul, Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., William M. Diefenderfer, III, Diane Suitt Gilleland, Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, John Kane, Linda Mills, Barry A. Munitz, Navient Corporation, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, RBS Securities Inc., John F. Remondi, Steven L. Shapiro, Jane J. Thompson, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Barry J. Williams - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1885259) - filed by Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of R. Tuczak, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc., et al v. Navient Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navient Corporation
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Blake Rohrbacher
Represented By: Christopher Harris
Represented By: Christopher S. Turner
Represented By: Abid R. Qureshi
Represented By: Peter A. Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry A. Munitz
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R. Ciarrocki
Represented By: Daniel Kahn
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Represented By: Kevin G. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Diefenderfer, III.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Daniel R. Ciarrocki
Represented By: Daniel Kahn
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Represented By: Kevin G. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Securities Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R. Ciarrocki
Represented By: Daniel Kahn
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Represented By: Kevin G. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Suitt Gilleland
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Daniel R. Ciarrocki
Represented By: Daniel Kahn
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Represented By: Kevin G. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kane
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel R. Ciarrocki
Represented By: Daniel Kahn
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Represented By: Kevin G. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Somsak Chivavibul
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities LLC
Represented By: Daniel R. Ciarrocki
Represented By: Daniel Kahn
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Represented By: Kevin G. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L. Shapiro
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC
Represented By: Daniel R. Ciarrocki
Represented By: Daniel Kahn
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Represented By: Kevin G. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities USA LLC
Represented By: Daniel C. Lewis
Represented By: Daniel R. Ciarrocki
Represented By: Daniel Kahn
Represented By: Anthony D. Marinello
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Represented By: Kevin G. Abrams
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry L. Williams
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Torre Bates
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Remondi
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Mills
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane J. Thompson
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Daniel R. Ciarrocki
Represented By: Daniel Kahn
Represented By: John M. Seaman
Represented By: Kevin G. Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Policemen's Annuity & Benefit Fund of Chicago
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Gorris
Represented By: Christopher P. Quinn
Represented By: Joel E. Friedlander
Represented By: Richard Rykhouse
Represented By: Jesse P. Jensen
Represented By: Salvatore J. Graziano
Represented By: Jeremy P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George A. Menold
Represented By: Craig J. Springer
Represented By: David M. Sborz
Represented By: Peter B. Andrews
Represented By: Richard Rykhouse
Represented By: Jesse P. Jensen
Represented By: Salvatore J. Graziano
Represented By: Jeremy P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lord Abbett Equity Trust - Lord Abbett Calibrated Mid Cap Value Fund
Represented By: Bruce W. Leppla
Represented By: Karen L. Morris
Represented By: Michael J. Miarmi
Represented By: R. Michael Lindsey
Represented By: Sharon M. Lee
Represented By: Steven E. Fineman
Represented By: Patrick Francis Morris
Represented By: Richard M. Heimann
Represented By: Daniel P. Chiplock
Represented By: Joy A. Kruse
Represented By: Joel E. Friedlander
Represented By: Christopher M. Foulds
Represented By: Christopher P. Quinn
Represented By: Richard Rykhouse
Represented By: Jesse P. Jensen
Represented By: Salvatore J. Graziano
Represented By: Jeremy P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lord Abbett Affiliated Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce W. Leppla
Represented By: Karen L. Morris
Represented By: Michael J. Miarmi
Represented By: R. Michael Lindsey
Represented By: Sharon M. Lee
Represented By: Steven E. Fineman
Represented By: Patrick Francis Morris
Represented By: Richard M. Heimann
Represented By: Daniel P. Chiplock
Represented By: Joy A. Kruse
Represented By: Joel E. Friedlander
Represented By: Christopher M. Foulds
Represented By: Christopher P. Quinn
Represented By: Richard Rykhouse
Represented By: Jesse P. Jensen
Represented By: Salvatore J. Graziano
Represented By: Jeremy P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tore Heniz Markus Jagrelius
Represented By: Mary K. Blasy
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: Norman M. Monhait
Represented By: Richard Rykhouse
Represented By: Jesse P. Jensen
Represented By: Salvatore J. Graziano
Represented By: Jeremy P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lord Abbett Investment Trust - Lord Abbett High Yield Fund
Represented By: Bruce W. Leppla
Represented By: Karen L. Morris
Represented By: Michael J. Miarmi
Represented By: R. Michael Lindsey
Represented By: Sharon M. Lee
Represented By: Steven E. Fineman
Represented By: Patrick Francis Morris
Represented By: Richard M. Heimann
Represented By: Daniel P. Chiplock
Represented By: Joy A. Kruse
Represented By: Joel E. Friedlander
Represented By: Christopher M. Foulds
Represented By: Christopher P. Quinn
Represented By: Richard Rykhouse
Represented By: Jesse P. Jensen
Represented By: Salvatore J. Graziano
Represented By: Jeremy P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lord Abbett Bond Debenture Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce W. Leppla
Represented By: Karen L. Morris
Represented By: Michael J. Miarmi
Represented By: R. Michael Lindsey
Represented By: Sharon M. Lee
Represented By: Steven E. Fineman
Represented By: Patrick Francis Morris
Represented By: Richard M. Heimann
Represented By: Daniel P. Chiplock
Represented By: Joy A. Kruse
Represented By: Joel E. Friedlander
Represented By: Christopher M. Foulds
Represented By: Christopher P. Quinn
Represented By: Richard Rykhouse
Represented By: Jesse P. Jensen
Represented By: Salvatore J. Graziano
Represented By: Jeremy P. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Employees' Retirement System of the City of Providence
Represented By: Peter B. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Represented By: Christine S. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The City of Miami Fire Fighters' and Police Officers' Retirement Trust
Represented By: Peter Bradford deLeeuw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?