T-Jat Systems 2006 Ltd. v. Expedia, Inc. (DE), et al.
Plaintiff: T-Jat Systems 2006 Ltd.
Defendant: Expedia, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00581
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 8/27/2019. (Polito, Rebecca)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM ORDER providing claim construction of multiple terms in U.S. Patent Nos. 8,064,434 and 9,.210,142. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/21/2019. (nms)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Motion for Reconsideration (D.I. 47 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/29/2019. (nms)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/26/2018. (nms)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Expedia, Inc. (WA), Expedia Inc. (DE), Orbitz Worldwide, Inc. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), b riefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 3/24/2017. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 3/7/17. (cak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T-Jat Systems 2006 Ltd. v. Expedia, Inc. (DE), et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T-Jat Systems 2006 Ltd.
Represented By: John G. Day
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?