3G Licensing, S.A. et al v. Blackberry Limited et al
Plaintiff: 3G Licensing, S.A. and Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Defendant: Blackberry Limited and Blackberry Corporation
Case Number: 1:2017cv00082
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Christopher J. Burke
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 329 MOTION for Reargument re 324 Order, 323 Memorandum Opinion filed by Blackberry Limited, Blackberry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/16/21. (ntl)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/13/2018. (etg)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION re motion for judgment on the pleadings. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/22/18. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-00082-LPS et al. (ntl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3G Licensing, S.A. et al v. Blackberry Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3G Licensing, S.A.
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koninklijke KPN N.V.
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Joseph J. Farnan, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Rocco Magni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackberry Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackberry Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?