Kyowa Hakko Bio, Co., Ltd, et al v. Ajinomoto Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Kyowa Hakko Bio, Co., Ltd,, Kyowa Hakko Bio U.S. Holdings, Inc., BioKyowa, Inc. and Kyowa Hakko U.S.A., Inc.
Defendant: Ajinomoto Co., Ltd., Ajinomoto Animal Nutrition Group, Inc., Ajinomoto North America, Inc., Ajinomoto Heartland, Inc. and Ajinomoto Windsor, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00313
Filed: March 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2017)
Presiding Judge: Sherry R. Fallon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lloret
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard A. Lloret on 4/1/2019. (nmg)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Mitchell S. Goldberg on 2/12/2018. (fms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kyowa Hakko Bio, Co., Ltd, et al v. Ajinomoto Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyowa Hakko Bio, Co., Ltd,
Represented By: Ronald P. Golden, III
Represented By: Douglas Edward McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyowa Hakko Bio U.S. Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald P. Golden, III
Represented By: Douglas Edward McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BioKyowa, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald P. Golden, III
Represented By: Douglas Edward McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyowa Hakko U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Ronald P. Golden, III
Represented By: Douglas Edward McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajinomoto Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Stephen G. Baxter
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Lisa M. Mandrusiak
Represented By: Robert C. Mattson
Represented By: Sasha S. Rao
Represented By: Eric W. Schweibenz
Represented By: Chad S.C. Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajinomoto Animal Nutrition Group, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen G. Baxter
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Lisa M. Mandrusiak
Represented By: Robert C. Mattson
Represented By: Sasha S. Rao
Represented By: Eric W. Schweibenz
Represented By: Chad S.C. Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajinomoto North America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen G. Baxter
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Lisa M. Mandrusiak
Represented By: Robert C. Mattson
Represented By: Sasha S. Rao
Represented By: Eric W. Schweibenz
Represented By: Chad S.C. Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajinomoto Heartland, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen G. Baxter
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Lisa M. Mandrusiak
Represented By: Robert C. Mattson
Represented By: Sasha S. Rao
Represented By: Eric W. Schweibenz
Represented By: Chad S.C. Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajinomoto Windsor, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen G. Baxter
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Lisa M. Mandrusiak
Represented By: Robert C. Mattson
Represented By: Sasha S. Rao
Represented By: Eric W. Schweibenz
Represented By: Chad S.C. Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?