Freed et al v. St. Jude Medical, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen M. Freed and Richman Freed
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, Inc., St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc. and Advanced Neuromodulation Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01128
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Mark A. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying motion to dismiss, (D.I. 42 ).. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/11/2019. (mlc)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Motion to Dismiss, (D.I. 20 ). Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/1/2019. (mlc)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 9/15/2017. (nmfn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freed et al v. St. Jude Medical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen M. Freed
Represented By: David G. Culley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richman Freed
Represented By: David G. Culley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin P. Chapple
Represented By: Diana Rabeh
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Medical S.C., Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin P. Chapple
Represented By: Diana Rabeh
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin P. Chapple
Represented By: Diana Rabeh
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Neuromodulation Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin P. Chapple
Represented By: Diana Rabeh
Represented By: Brian M. Rostocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?