Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Ring Inc.

Plaintiff: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Defendant: Ring Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01627
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2018 15 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 8,856,221 B2. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(nms)
January 18, 2018 CASE CLOSED per D.I. #14 . (nms)
January 17, 2018 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC as to Ring Inc. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 16, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jay B. Johnson for Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
January 11, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jay Johnson, filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/11/2018. (nms)
January 10, 2018 13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jay Johnson - filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 5, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #12 STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Ring Inc. answer due 1/19/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/5/2018. (nms)
January 3, 2018 12 Featured Case STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint - filed by Ring Inc.. (Winter, Christopher) Modified on 1/5/2018 (nms).
December 21, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Neil J. McNabnay for Ring Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
December 21, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael A. Vincent for Ring Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
December 20, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Vincent, filed by Ring Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/20/2017. (nms)
December 20, 2017 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael A. Vincent - filed by Ring Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Winter, Christopher) Modified on 12/20/2017 (nms).
December 18, 2017 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel for Defendant by Ring Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Counsel)(Kraft, Denise)
December 18, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bret T. Winterle for Ring Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
December 15, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil McNabnay and Bret Winterle, filed by Ring Inc.. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/15/2017. (nms)
December 14, 2017 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Neil McNabnay and Bret Winterle - filed by Ring Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification)(Winter, Christopher) Modified on 12/15/2017 (nms).
December 14, 2017 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Aylwin Winter on behalf of Ring Inc. (Winter, Christopher)
November 21, 2017 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #6 Stipulation and Order For Extension of Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Ring Inc. answer due 1/8/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/21/2017. (nms)
November 21, 2017 CORRECTING ENTRY: The docket text for D.I. 6 has been amended to reflect the filing is a stipulation and not a motion. Counsel is reminded to use the appropriate filing event codes. (nms)
November 20, 2017 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Biggs on behalf of Ring Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian)
November 20, 2017 6 Featured Case Stipulation and Order For Extension of Time - filed by Ring Inc.. (Kraft, Denise) Modified on 11/21/2017 (nms).
November 15, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01626-RGA, 1:17-cv-01627-RGA, 1:17-cv-01628-RGA, 1:17-cv-01629-RGA, 1:17-cv-01630-RGA (rjb)
November 14, 2017 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Ring Inc. served on 11/14/2017, answer due 12/5/2017. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 13, 2017 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Ring Inc. on 11/13/2017. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (nmg)
November 9, 2017 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (nmg)
November 9, 2017 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 8,856,221 B2. (nmg)
November 9, 2017 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg)
November 9, 2017 1 COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Ring Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2264040.) - filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Ring Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ring Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Aylwin Winter
Represented By: Denise Seastone Kraft
Represented By: Bret T. Winterle
Represented By: Neil J. McNabnay
Represented By: Brian A. Biggs
Represented By: Michael A. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?