Magnacross LLC v. Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc.
Plaintiff: Magnacross LLC
Defendant: Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv01683
Filed: November 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2017)
Referring Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Biggs on behalf of Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond and reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to February 16, 2018 and March 16, 2018 filed by Magnacross LLC. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/22/18. (cak)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul Steadman - filed by Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 1/22/18. (cak)
January 19, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond and reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to February 16, 2018 and March 16, 2018 - filed by Magnacross LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Paul Steadman - filed by Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Counsel, #3 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Kraft, Denise)
January 12, 2018 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Dasan Networks, Inc. for Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc. filed by Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Disclosure)(Kraft, Denise)
January 12, 2018 Filing 9 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appendix, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise)
January 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Kraft, Denise)
December 4, 2017 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc. answer due 1/12/2017. (cak)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to January 12, 2018 filed by Magnacross LLC. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 12/4/17. (cak)
December 1, 2017 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to the Complaint to January 12, 2018 - filed by Magnacross LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 30, 2017 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for Magnacross LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED granting (6) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Magnacross LLC in case 1:17-cv-01682-VAC-MPT; granting (6) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Magnacross LLC in case 1:17-cv-01683-VAC-MPT; granting (5) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Magnacross LLC in case 1:17-cv-01684-VAC-MPT; granting (5) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Magnacross LLC in case 1:17-cv-01685-VAC-MPT. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 11/28/17. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01682-VAC-MPT, 1:17-cv-01683-VAC-MPT, 1:17-cv-01684-VAC-MPT, 1:17-cv-01685-VAC-MPT(cak)
November 27, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Magnacross LLC. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 27, 2017 ***NOTE: If the parties jointly consent to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynges jurisdiction to conduct all proceedings in this case, then the Pretrial Conference and Trial will be presided over by Judge Thynge consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be reassigned to a visiting District Judge, and any further dates in the Scheduling Order, including the Pretrial Conference and Trial dates, may be adjusted dependent on the availability of the visiting District Judge. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01682-VAC-MPT, 1:17-cv-01683-VAC-MPT, 1:17-cv-01684-VAC-MPT, 1:17-cv-01685-VAC-MPT(cak)
November 22, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Magnacross LLC. Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc. served on 11/22/2017, answer due 12/13/2017. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
November 22, 2017 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01682-VAC-MPT, 1:17-cv-01683-VAC-MPT, 1:17-cv-01684-VAC-MPT, 1:17-cv-01685-VAC-MPT (rjb)
November 22, 2017 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01682-VAC, 1:17-cv-01683-VAC, 1:17-cv-01684-VAC, 1:17-cv-01685-VAC (rjb)
November 20, 2017 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Magnacross LLC. (sar)
November 20, 2017 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,917,304 B1;. (sar)
November 20, 2017 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar)
November 20, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2269585.) - filed by Magnacross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magnacross LLC v. Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dasan Zhone Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Brian A. Biggs
Represented By: Denise Seastone Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnacross LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?