Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. v. Brother International Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.
Defendant: Brother International Corporation and Brother Industries (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00076
Filed: January 10, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: Christopher J Burke
1 Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. #59 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John T. Moehringer, Michael B. Powell, Danielle Vincenti Tully of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP filed by Brother Industries (USA), Inc., Brother International Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/6/2018. (dlb)
March 6, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. #61 Stipulation for Leave to File Amended Answer and to Extend Time filed by Brother Industries (USA), Inc., Brother International Corporation. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/6/2018. (dlb)
March 6, 2018 61 STIPULATION [Joint Stipulation and Order to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims and to Extend Time] by Brother Industries (USA), Inc., Brother International Corporation. (O'Byrne, Stephanie)
February 22, 2018 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and discuss, in person and/or by telephone, each of the matters listed on Chief Judge Stark's Case Management Checklist ("Checklist"). Within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the parties shall jointly file the following: (i) a copy of the "Checklist" indicating the names of Lead Counsel and Delaware Counsel for each party; (ii) a proposed Scheduling Order (consistent with the Chief Judge Stark's Revised Patent Form Scheduling Order); and (iii) a letter, not to exceed three pages, that contains the following: (a) a description of what this case is about; (b) the parties' positions regarding the disputes in the proposed Scheduling Order, and (c) a list of the three most significant topics (other than Scheduling Order disputes) discussed during the parties' review of the Checklist items, along with a brief description as to what was discussed as to those topics. Thereafter, the Court will schedule an in-person Case Management Conference/Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to be held with Judge Stark and/or Judge Burke. The Checklist and Revised Patent Form Scheduling Order can be found on this Court's website (www.ded.uscourts.gov/judge/chief-judge-leonard-p-stark). Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/21/2018. (dlb)
February 21, 2018 60 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, re: #37 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. by Brother Industries (USA), Inc., Brother International Corporation.(O'Byrne, Stephanie)
February 9, 2018 59 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John T. Moehringer, Michael B. Powell, Danielle Vincenti Tully of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP - filed by Brother Industries (USA), Inc., Brother International Corporation. (Palapura, Bindu)
February 8, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brett M. Pinkus,Jonathan T. Suder,Richard A. Wojcio, Jr for Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (dmp, )
February 7, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. #57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan T. Suder, Brett M. Pinkus, and Richard A. Wojcio, Jr. filed by Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/7/2018. (dlb)
February 2, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. #58 Proposed Procedures Order filed by Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/2/2018. (dlb)
February 2, 2018 58 PROPOSED ORDER Procedures Order by Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
February 2, 2018 57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan T. Suder, Brett M. Pinkus, and Richard A. Wojcio, Jr. - filed by Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
February 2, 2018 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan C. Haney on behalf of Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. (Haney, Megan)
February 2, 2018 55 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Bilson on behalf of Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. (Bilson, David)
February 2, 2018 54 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Phillips, Jr on behalf of Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. (Phillips, John)
January 31, 2018 53 Joint STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 by Brother Industries (USA), Inc., Brother International Corporation. (Moore, David)
January 31, 2018 52 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re Brother Industries (USA), Inc., Brother International Corporation: Entry of appearance of attorney David Ellis Moore. Attorney Kelly E. Farnan of Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A. terminated. (Moore, David)
January 24, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. #51 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to through and including February 21, 2018 filed by Brother Industries (USA), Inc., Brother International Corporation, Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Brother Industries (USA), Inc. answer due 2/21/2018; Brother International Corporation answer due 2/21/2018. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/24/2018. (dlb)
January 24, 2018 Featured Case ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 (Local Rules of Civil Practice and Procedure of the United States District Court for the District of Delaware, effective August 1, 2016) that within 21 days of the filing of the case with this District, the parties shall submit a statement identifying all pending matters which require judicial action. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 1/24/2018. (dlb)
January 23, 2018 51 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to through and including February 21, 2018 - filed by Brother Industries (USA), Inc., Brother International Corporation. (Farnan, Kelly)
January 23, 2018 50 Featured Case ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/23/18. (ntl)
January 17, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
January 10, 2018 49 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 2/12/2018. (fms)
January 10, 2018 48 Record of case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number in Other District: 8:17-cv-01145. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
January 9, 2018 47 Featured Case ORDER Transferring Case to the District of Delaware and Vacating Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue by Judge James V. Selna. The Court, having read and considered the Parties' Stipulation #46 to Transfer to the District of Delaware and Vacate the Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue [Dkt. 42, 45], HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: The Case shall be transferred to the District of Delaware, and the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue currently scheduled for January 29, 2018 is vacated as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. Original file, copy of the transfer order and docket sheet electronically sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dro) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
January 8, 2018 46 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to District of Delaware and Vacate Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pinkus, Brett) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
November 14, 2017 45 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Resetting Hearing Date and Extending Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue, Re Stipulation #44 . The hearing on Defendant Brother's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer shall be moved to January 29, 2018 at 1:30 p.m., with responsive and reply pleadings due on January 8, 2018 and January 15, 2018, respectively. (mt) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
November 9, 2017 44 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response and Plaintiff's Reply and to Reset Hearing Date as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #42 filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Reset Hearing Date and Extend Briefing Schedule)(Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
November 6, 2017 43 Featured Case ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING DATES; PREPARATION FOR TRIAL; AND GOVERNING ATTORNEY AND PARTY CONDUCT AT TRIAL before Judge James V. Selna. (See Document for Details and Deadlines) (kt) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
October 27, 2017 42 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Brother IIndustries USA Inc, Brother International Corp.. Motion set for hearing on 12/4/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue, #2 Declaration of John T. Moehringer in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue, #3 Declaration of Sally M. Bankert in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue, #4 Declaration of Terry Brower in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Venue, #5 Proposed Order) (Oines, Ronald) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
October 16, 2017 41 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge James V. Selna. The Court and counsel confer. The Court sets an Interim Status Conference for 1/29/2018 at 11:00 AM and the Markman/Claim Construction Hearing for 9/10/2018 at 3:00 PM. The Court sets the following case management dates with the agreement of counsel Discovery cut-off 11/16/ 2018; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 11:00 AM; and the Jury Trial set for 9/17/2019 at 8:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES) Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (kt) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
October 11, 2017 40 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: granting #34 Non-Resident Attorney John T. Moehringer APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Brother International Corp., Brother Industries (U.S.A.), Inc., Defendants, designating Ronald P. Oines as local counsel. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
October 10, 2017 39 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.(Pinkus, Brett) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
October 10, 2017 38 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Presumptive Schedule of Pretrial Dates)(Pinkus, Brett) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
October 7, 2017 37 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exh. A US Pat 6,197,466, #2 Appendix Ex. B US Pat 6,453,127)(Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
October 6, 2017 36 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting Joint Stipulation to Amend/Correct Complaint #35 . As per the Parties' Stipulation, the First Amended Complaint is deemed filed as of October 6, 2017 for purposes of calculating response deadlines. Plaintiff shall additionally file a copy of the First Amended Complaint through the Courts ECF system. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
October 6, 2017 35 STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
October 4, 2017 34 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John T. Moehringer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Brother IIndustries USA Inc, Brother International Corp. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20612582) filed by Defendants Brot her IIndustries USA Inc, Brother International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Oines, Ronald) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
September 8, 2017 33 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
September 7, 2017 32 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott R Hansen on behalf of Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. (Attorney Scott R Hansen added to party Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.(pty:pla))(Hansen, Scott) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
August 31, 2017 31 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James V. Selna, Granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), #30 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants BROTHER INTERNATIONAL CORP. and BROTHER INDUSTRIES (U.S.A.), INC. (Brother) are granted an extension of time of an additional thirty (30) days, to and including October 6, 2017, to respond to the complaint in this action. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
August 31, 2017 30 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 6, 2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Brother IIndustries USA Inc, Brother International Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oines, Ronald) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
August 9, 2017 29 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: granting #28 REQUEST to Withdraw as Attorney. Added attorney Marc Joseph Frechette for Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. Attorney Hemant Hari Kewalramani terminated (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
August 9, 2017 28 REQUEST of H. H. (Shashi) Kewalramani to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kewalramani, Hemant) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
August 9, 2017 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hemant Hari Kewalramani counsel for Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. Adding Marc Joseph Frechette as counsel of record for Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. (Kewalramani, Hemant) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
August 7, 2017 26 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Brother IIndustries USA Inc answer now due 9/6/2017; Brother International Corp. answer now due 9/6/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Brother IIndustries USA Inc; Brother International Corp..(Attorney Ronald P Oines added to party Brother IIndustries USA Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Ronald P Oines added to party Brother International Corp.(pty:dft))(Oines, Ronald) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 24, 2017 25 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #20 Non-Resident Attorney Richard A. Wojcio Jr APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations Inc, designating Hemant H. (Shashi) Kewalramani as local counsel. (lwag)[Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 24, 2017 24 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan T. Suder APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plainitff Commerical Copy Innovations Inc, designating Hemant H. (Shashi) Kewalramani as local counsel. (lwag) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 24, 2017 23 Featured Case ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Brett M. Pinkus APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, designating Hemant H. (Shashi) Kewalramani as local counsel. (lwag) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 12, 2017 22 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan T. Suder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20168020) #19 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard A. Wojcio, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20168166) #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Superseded version of Form G-64 used. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 12, 2017 21 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brett Michael Pinkus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20167370) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 12, 2017 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard A. Wojcio, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20168166) filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovatio ns, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate Of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kewalramani, Hemant) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 12, 2017 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan T. Suder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20168020) filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, I nc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Of Courts To Which Admitted, #2 Exhibit List of Previously Admitted PHV Cases, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Kewalramani, Hemant) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 12, 2017 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brett Michael Pinkus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20167370) filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations , Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Of Courts To Which Admitted, #2 Exhibit List of Previously Admitted PHV Cases, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Kewalramani, Hemant) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 11, 2017 17 Featured Case ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/10/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (kt) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 11, 2017 16 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (kt) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 11, 2017 15 Featured Case ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:17-cv-01145-JVS (JDEx). (mba) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 7, 2017 14 Featured Case ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:17-cv-00437-JVS-KESx. Case transferred from Judge Andrew J. Guilford to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:17-cv-01145-JVS-KESx. Signed by Judge James V. Selna. (dv) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 6, 2017 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard A Wojcio, Jr. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 6, 2017 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brett M Piinkus. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 6, 2017 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan T Suder. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 6, 2017 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Brother IIndustries USA Inc. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 6, 2017 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Brother International Corp. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 6, 2017 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 6, 2017 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 5, 2017 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #4 filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. (Kewalramani, Hemant) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 5, 2017 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #4 filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. (Kewalramani, Hemant) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 5, 2017 4 Certification And NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc., identifying Wi-Lan Technologies, Inc., Quarterhill Inc., Brother International Corp., Brother Industries (U.S.A.) Inc.. (Kewalramani, Hemant) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 5, 2017 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. (Kewalramani, Hemant) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 5, 2017 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. (Kewalramani, Hemant) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]
July 5, 2017 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20130276 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Hemant Hari Kewalramani added to party Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kewalramani, Hemant) [Transferred from California Central on 1/10/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc. v. Brother International Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brother International Corporation
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brother Industries (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Bindu Ann George Palapura
Represented By: David Ellis Moore
Represented By: Stephanie E. O'Byrne
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commercial Copy Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Megan C. Haney
Represented By: Jonathan T. Suder
Represented By: John C. Phillips, Jr.
Represented By: Brett M. Pinkus
Represented By: David A. Bilson
Represented By: Richard A. Wojcio, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?