H. Lundbeck A/S et al v. Apotex Inc., et al
Plaintiff: H. Lundbeck A/S, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd., Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Takeda Pharmaceuticals International AG and Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Defendant: Apotex Inc., Apotex Corp. and Apotex Research Private Limited
Case Number: 1:2018cv00088
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P. Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 991 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 908 Motion for Partial Judgment On The Pleadings As To Counts V-VI of Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint and To Dismiss For Lack Of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Lek Pharmaceuticals D.D., Sandoz Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/8/21. (ntl)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 990 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding the Court's decisions on motions in limine, pretrial order issues, and other trial related matters. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/7/21. (ntl)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 716 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' motion and letters regarding Defendants' use of Dr. Rothschild as an expert (D.I. 698 , 704 , 711 ), and having heard argument on March 13, 2020, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' requests to disqualify Dr. Rothschild as an expert and to prevent him from receiving access to materials designated as Confidential Information under the Protective Order are DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Hall on 3/18/2020. (ceg)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 682 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/18/20. (ntl)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 541 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 378 Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Lek Pharmaceuticals d.d., Sandoz Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/15/19. (ntl)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/16/19. (ntl)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H. Lundbeck A/S et al v. Apotex Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Lundbeck A/S
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Ltd.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceuticals International AG
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Represented By: Jack B. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Dellinger
Represented By: Maryellen Noreika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Research Private Limited
Represented By: Kenneth Laurence Dorsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?