Epic IP LLC v. Backblaze, Inc.
Plaintiff: Epic IP LLC
Defendant: Backblaze, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00141
Filed: January 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Gregory M Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 18, 2018 filed by Backblaze, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Backblaze, Inc. answer due 4/18/2018. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/22/2018. (mdb)
March 19, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to April 18, 2018 - filed by Backblaze, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 19, 2018 filed by Backblaze, Inc., Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Backblaze, Inc. answer due 3/19/2018.. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/14/2018. (mdb)
February 12, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to March 19, 2018 - filed by Backblaze, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy)
February 12, 2018 DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to Backblaze, Inc. re #8 Stipulation to EXTEND Time: This filing does not meet Judge Sleet's requirements for such requests. The parties shall refer to Judge Sleet's requirements for filing requests to extend time on the court's website. After reviewing the procedure, the parties may RE-FILE the stipulation/motion. (mdb)
February 12, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney David R. Bennett for Epic IP LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00139-GMS, 1:18-cv-00140-GMS, 1:18-cv-00141-GMS(nmg)
February 9, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to March 19, 2018 - filed by Backblaze, Inc.. (Anderson, Jeremy)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED - re (7 in 1:18-cv-00141-GMS, 7 in 1:18-cv-00140-GMS, 7 in 1:18-cv-00139-GMS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett filed by Epic IP LLC. Ordered by Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 2/2/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00140-GMS, 1:18-cv-00139-GMS, 1:18-cv-00141-GMS(mdb)
February 1, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Epic IP LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 31, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00139-GMS, 1:18-cv-00140-GMS, 1:18-cv-00141-GMS (rjb)
January 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Epic IP LLC. Backblaze, Inc. served on 1/26/2018, answer due 2/16/2018. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 25, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney David R. Bennett - filed by Epic IP LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios)
January 25, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Backblaze, Inc. on 1/25/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg)
January 24, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Epic IP LLC. (ceg)
January 24, 2018 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,434,599 B1. (ceg)
January 24, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg)
January 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Backblaze, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2308435.) - filed by Epic IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic IP LLC v. Backblaze, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic IP LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Backblaze, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy Douglas Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?