Trotter v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Kimberly D. Trotter
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2018cv00233
Filed: February 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; denying 27 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/15/2019. (nmf)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- re 27 MOTION to Reopen Case. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 6/12/2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/29/2019. (lih)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS DISMISSING CASE (copy to pltf.) (CASE CLOSED). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 5/16/2019. (nmf)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS- the court recommends dismissing the case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Please note that when filing Objections pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b)(2), briefing consists solely of the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages) and the Response to the Objections (no longer than ten (10) pages). No further briefing shall be permitted with respect to objections without leave of the Court. Objections to R&R due by 5/8/2019. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 4/24/2019. (lih)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trotter v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly D. Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?