Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Defendant: Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC, Atlantic Broadband (NH-ME), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (MIAMI), LLC, Metrocast Cablevision of New Hampshire, LLC, Atlantic Broadband (CT), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (SC), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (PENN), LLC and Atlantic Broadband (DELMAR), LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00362
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to and including June 15, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Metrocast Cablevision of New Hampshire, LLC answer due 6/15/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2018. (nms)
May 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Amy E. Bergeron for Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
May 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney B. Trent Webb,Aaron E Hankel,Ryan D. Dykal,Robert H. Reckers for Sprint Communications Company L.P. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00363-RGA, 1:18-cv-00361-RGA, 1:18-cv-00362-RGA, 1:18-cv-00536-RGA(crb)
May 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie for Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
May 1, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robinson Vu for Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ceg)
April 30, 2018 18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to respond to Complaint to and including June 15, 2018 - filed by Metrocast Cablevision of New Hampshire, LLC. (Barillare, Jody)
April 30, 2018 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jody Barillare on behalf of Metrocast Cablevision of New Hampshire, LLC (Barillare, Jody)
April 30, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert H. Reckers of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Aaron E. Hankel, and Ryan D. Dykal of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P., and #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robinson Vu, Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie, and Amy E. Bergeron filed by Atlantic Broadband (SC), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Penn), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (CT), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (NH-ME), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Delmar), LLC, Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Miami), LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/30/2018. (nms)
April 30, 2018 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robinson Vu, Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie, and Amy E. Bergeron - filed by Atlantic Broadband (CT), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Delmar), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Miami), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (NH-ME), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Penn), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (SC), LLC, Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 27, 2018 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney B. Trent Webb, Aaron E. Hankel, and Ryan D. Dykal of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certifications)(Katona, Shanti)
April 27, 2018 14 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert H. Reckers of Shook, Hardy & Bacon, LLP - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Katona, Shanti)
April 26, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to June 15, 2018 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Atlantic Broadband (CT), LLC answer due 6/15/2018; Atlantic Broadband (Delmar), LLC answer due 6/15/2018; Atlantic Broadband (Miami), LLC answer due 6/15/2018; Atlantic Broadband (NH-ME), LLC answer due 6/15/2018; Atlantic Broadband (Penn), LLC answer due 6/15/2018; Atlantic Broadband (SC), LLC answer due 6/15/2018; Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC answer due 6/15/2018). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/25/2018. (nms)
April 25, 2018 13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to June 15, 2018 - filed by Atlantic Broadband (CT), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Delmar), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Miami), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (NH-ME), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (Penn), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (SC), LLC, Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC. (Mayo, Andrew)
April 12, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Atlantic Broadband (CT), LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Atlantic Broadband (MIAMI), LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Atlantic Broadband (DELMAR), LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Atlantic Broadband (PENN), LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Atlantic Broadband (NH-ME), LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Atlantic Broadband (SC), LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sprint Communications Company L.P.. Metrocast Cablevision of New Hampshire, LLC served on 4/10/2018, answer due 5/1/2018. (Katona, Shanti)
April 12, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The Summons returned executed at D.I. 5 has been removed from the docket. Counsel shall refile the returned summons each at there own docket item entries, thereby allowing the service date to be included and an answering due date to be set. (nms)
March 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00361-RGA, 1:18-cv-00362-RGA, 1:18-cv-00363-RGA (rjb)
March 8, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Atlantic Broadband (CT), LLC on 3/8/2018; Atlantic Broadband (DELMAR), LLC on 3/8/2018; Atlantic Broadband (MIAMI), LLC on 3/8/2018; Atlantic Broadband (NH-ME), LLC on 3/8/2018; Atlantic Broadband (PENN), LLC on 3/8/2018; Atlantic Broadband (SC), LLC on 3/8/2018; Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC on 3/8/2018; Metrocast Cablevision of New Hampshire, LLC on 3/8/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb)
March 7, 2018 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Corporation, Corporate Parent Sprint Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent SoftBank Corp. for Sprint Communications Company L.P. filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (crb)
March 7, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) See Attachment. (crb)
March 7, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
March 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Atlantic Broadband (CT), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (DELMAR), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (MIAMI), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (NH-ME), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (PENN), LLC, Atlantic Broadband (SC), LLC, Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC, Metrocast Cablevision of New Hampshire, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2336580.) - filed by Sprint Communications Company L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprint Communications Company L.P. v. Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Broadband Finance, LLC
Represented By: Robinson Vu
Represented By: Amy E. Bergeron
Represented By: Lindsay Volpenhein Cutie
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Broadband (NH-ME), LLC
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Broadband (MIAMI), LLC
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metrocast Cablevision of New Hampshire, LLC
Represented By: Jody Barillare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Broadband (CT), LLC
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Broadband (SC), LLC
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Broadband (PENN), LLC
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Broadband (DELMAR), LLC
Represented By: Andrew Colin Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sprint Communications Company L.P.
Represented By: Shanti Mulpuru Katona
Represented By: Robert H. Reckers
Represented By: Aaron E Hankel
Represented By: B. Trent Webb
Represented By: Ryan D. Dykal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?