DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC v. Integrated Device Technology, Inc.

Plaintiff: DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC
Defendant: Integrated Device Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00373
Filed: March 8, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: Kent
0 Judge: Christopher J Burke
1 Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 9, 2018 filed by Integrated Device Technology, Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/12/2018. (dlb)
April 12, 2018 10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 9, 2018 - filed by Integrated Device Technology, Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
April 12, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Eric B. Hanson,Dorian S. Berger,Daniel Hipskind for DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00373-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-00372-LPS-CJB(crb)
April 12, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. (9 in 1:18-cv-00373-LPS-CJB, 9 in 1:18-cv-00372-LPS-CJB) Proposed Procedures Order filed by DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 4/12/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00372-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-00373-LPS-CJB(dlb)
April 11, 2018 9 PROPOSED ORDER / Procedures Order by DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 26, 2018 8 Alias SUMMONS Returned Executed by DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC. Integrated Device Technology, Inc. served on 3/23/2018, answer due 4/13/2018. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 23, 2018 Summons Reissued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Integrated Device Technology, Inc. (ceg)
March 16, 2018 7 Featured Case ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/16/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00372-LPS, 1:18-cv-00373-LPS (ntl)
March 16, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:18-cv-00372-LPS, 6 in 1:18-cv-00373-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel P. Hipskind, Dorian S. Berger, and Eric B. Hanson filed by DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/16/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00372-LPS, 1:18-cv-00373-LPS (ntl)
March 16, 2018 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Daniel P. Hipskind, Dorian S. Berger, and Eric B. Hanson - filed by DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Daniel P. Hipskind, #2 Certification of Dorian S. Berger, #3 Certification of Eric B. Hanson)(Brauerman, Stephen)
March 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00372-LPS, 1:18-cv-00373-LPS (rjb)
March 12, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC. Integrated Device Technology, Inc. served on 3/9/2018, answer due 4/2/2018. (Brauerman, Stephen)
March 9, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Integrated Device Technology, Inc. on 3/9/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (fms)
March 8, 2018 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC. (fms)
March 8, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,881,413; 6,664,827; 7,106,758; 6,721,328. (fms)
March 8, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (fms)
March 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed with Jury Demand against Integrated Device Technology, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2337685.) - filed by DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(fms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC v. Integrated Device Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Device Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIFF Scale Operation Research, LLC
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Sara E. Bussiere
Represented By: Dorian S. Berger
Represented By: Eric B. Hanson
Represented By: Daniel Hipskind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?