MOAEC Technologies, LLC v. SoundCloud et al

Plaintiff: MOAEC Technologies, LLC
Defendant: SoundCloud Inc. and SoundCloud
Case Number: 1:2018cv00376
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
0 Judge: Christopher J Burke
1 Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. (10 in 1:18-cv-00375-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Joshua L. Raskin, Allan A. Kassenoff, and Vimal M. Kapadia filed by Deezer Inc., (9 in 1:18-cv-00377-LPS-CJB) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Stefani E. Shanberg and Michael J. Guo of Morrison & Foerster LLP filed by Spotify USA, Inc., Spotify AB. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/1/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00375-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-00376-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-00377-LPS-CJB(dlb)
March 28, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Leonard A. Gail,Jeremy G. Mallory,Christopher L. May,Kenneth M. Goldman for MOAEC Technologies, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00375-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-00376-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-00377-LPS-CJB(crb)
March 27, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to June 14, 2018 filed by SoundCloud, SoundCloud Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/27/2018. (dlb)
March 26, 2018 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Respond to the Complaint to June 14, 2018 - filed by SoundCloud, SoundCloud Inc.. (Rawnsley, Jason)
March 22, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benjamin Hershkowitz,R. Scott Roe for SoundCloud Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (nmg)
March 21, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED D.I. #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leonard A. Gail, Kenneth M. Goldman, Christopher L. May, and Jeremy G. Mallory filed by MOAEC Technologies, LLC, and D.I. #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin Hershkowitz and R. Scott Roe filed by SoundCloud, SoundCloud Inc. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/21/2018. (dlb)
March 20, 2018 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Leonard A. Gail, Kenneth M. Goldman, Christopher L. May, and Jeremy G. Mallory - filed by MOAEC Technologies, LLC. (Farnan, Brian)
March 19, 2018 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benjamin Hershkowitz and R. Scott Roe - filed by SoundCloud, SoundCloud Inc.. (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 19, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED (6 in 1:18-cv-00375-LPS-CJB, 6 in 1:18-cv-00376-LPS-CJB, 6 in 1:18-cv-00377-LPS-CJB) Proposed Procedures Order filed by MOAEC Technologies, LLC. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 3/19/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00377-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-00375-LPS-CJB, 1:18-cv-00376-LPS-CJB(dlb)
March 16, 2018 6 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Procedures Order re (5 in 1:18-cv-00377-LPS-CJB, 5 in 1:18-cv-00375-LPS-CJB, 5 in 1:18-cv-00376-LPS-CJB) Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, by MOAEC Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark)(Farnan, Brian)
March 16, 2018 5 Featured Case ORAL REFERRAL ORDER: This case will be governed by Judge Stark's Revised Procedures for Managing Patent Cases (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). In accordance with the Revised Procedures, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. any and all matters relating to scheduling, including entry of a Scheduling Order, are referred to Magistrate Judge Burke; 2. any and all motions to dismiss, stay, and/or transfer venue, relating to all or any part of the case, whenever such motions may be filed, are referred to Judge Burke for disposition or report and recommendation, to the full extent permitted by the Constitution, statute, and rule; and 3. within seven (7) days of the date of this Referral Order, the plaintiff(s) shall file the Procedures Order, which is found on Judge Stark's website (see www.ded.uscourts.gov). ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/16/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00375-LPS, 1:18-cv-00376-LPS, 1:18-cv-00377-LPS (ntl)
March 15, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOAEC Technologies, LLC. SoundCloud Inc. served on 3/9/2018, answer due 4/2/2018. (Farnan, Brian)
March 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00375-LPS, 1:18-cv-00376-LPS, 1:18-cv-00377-LPS (rjb)
March 9, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to SoundCloud Inc. on 3/9/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (crb)
March 9, 2018 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,232,539 B1. (crb)
March 9, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
March 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against SoundCloud, SoundCloud Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2338018.) - filed by MOAEC Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOAEC Technologies, LLC v. SoundCloud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOAEC Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Leonard A. Gail
Represented By: Jeremy G. Mallory
Represented By: Kenneth M. Goldman
Represented By: Christopher L. May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoundCloud Inc.
Represented By: R. Scott Roe
Represented By: Benjamin Hershkowitz
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoundCloud
Represented By: Jason James Rawnsley
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?