Board of Regents, The University of Texas System et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Board of Regents, The University of Texas System and TissueGen, Inc.
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00392
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Gregory M. Sleet
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MEMORANDUM OPINION RE: Post Trial Motions. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 6/5/2024. (lnb) (Main Document 368 replaced on 6/5/2024) (lnb).
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 303 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 284 BSC's motion to quash Plaintiffs' subpoena is GRANTED-IN-PART and DENIED-IN-PART. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 1/20/23. (ntl)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 199 MOTION to Preclude Expert Testimony filed by Boston Scientific Corporation is DENIED; 191 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of David A. Haas filed by Board of Regents, The University of Texas System, TissueGen, Inc. is DENIED. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/12/22. (ntl)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 247 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Boston Scientific Corporation is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 12/2/22. (ntl)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MEMORANDUM OPINION re claim construction. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 11/17/22. (ntl)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 198 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Boston Scientific Corporation and 197 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Willful Infringement filed by Boston Scientific Corporation are DENIED. A Final Pre trial Conference is set for 1/12/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B. A 5-day Jury Trial is set for 1/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B. A Markman Hearing is set for 11/7/2022 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 10/6/22. (ntl)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 4/15/2021. (dlw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Regents, The University of Texas System et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Regents, The University of Texas System
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TissueGen, Inc.
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Karen L. Pascale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?