Bayer HealthCare LLC v. Nektar Therapeutics et al

Plaintiff: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Defendant: Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics and Baxalta Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2018cv00396
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2018 62 Featured Case SO ORDERED Granting Stipulation And Order To Consolidate Cases For All Purposes (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/18/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-01316-RGA, 1:18-cv-00396-RGA(nms)
April 17, 2018 61 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Frederick L. Cottrell, III, regarding request for the scheduling of the Rule 16 Conference. (Cottrell, Frederick) Modified on 4/18/2018 (nms).
April 13, 2018 60 Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kelly E. Farnan regarding Request for Scheduling Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Farnan, Kelly)
April 12, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Angus Chen for Baxalta Incorporated,for Baxalta US Inc., and for Nektar Therapeutics added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
April 12, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Edgar H Haug for Baxalta Incorporated, for Baxalta US Inc., and for Nektar Therapeutics added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm)
April 2, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #59 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bradford J. Badke and Sona De, filed by Bayer Healthcare LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/2/2018. (nms)
April 2, 2018 59 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bradford J. Badke and Sona De - filed by Bayer Healthcare LLC. (Smith, Rodger)
April 2, 2018 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodger Dallery Smith, II on behalf of Bayer Healthcare LLC (Smith, Rodger)
March 29, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re #57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edgar H. Haug and Angus Chen, filed by Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics, Baxalta Incorporated. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/29/2018. (nms)
March 28, 2018 57 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Edgar H. Haug and Angus Chen - filed by Baxalta Incorporated, Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics. (Farnan, Kelly)
March 27, 2018 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Farnan on behalf of Baxalta Incorporated, Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics (Farnan, Kelly)
March 27, 2018 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Cottrell, III on behalf of Baxalta Incorporated, Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics (Cottrell, Frederick)
March 22, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 13, 2018 54 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 4/16/2018. (fms)
March 13, 2018 53 Record of case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number in Other District: 5:17-cv-05055. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
March 12, 2018 52 Featured Case Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #33 Motion to Dismiss and Granting #33 Motion to Transfer.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
March 12, 2018 51 Featured Case Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #48 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
February 5, 2018 50 **CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING THE NEXT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the 2/7/2018 Initial CMC is HEREBY CONTINUED to 4/25/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
January 31, 2018 49 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Bayer HealthCare LLC. (Badke, Bradford) (Filed on 1/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
January 24, 2018 48 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Baxalta Incorporated, Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JESSICA JAMIESON IN PARTIAL SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF MARK A. WILSON IN PARTIAL SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, #3 Declaration DECLARATION OF JONATHAN A. PATCHEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit REDACTED version of Ex 1 to the Patchen Declaration, #5 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex 1 to the Patchen Declaration, #6 Exhibit REDACTED version of Ex 2 to the Patchen Declaration, #7 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex 2 to the Patchen Declaration, #8 Exhibit REDACTED version of Ex 3 to the Patchen Declaration, #9 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex 3 to the Patchen Declaration, #10 Exhibit REDACTED version of Ex 4 to the Patchen Declaration, #11 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex 4 to the Patchen Declaration, #12 Exhibit REDACTED version of Ex 5 to the Patchen Declaration, #13 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex 5 to the Patchen Declaration, #14 Exhibit REDACTED version of Ex 6 to the Patchen Declaration, #15 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex 6 to the Patchen Declaration, #16 Exhibit Ex 7 to the Patchen Declaration, #17 Exhibit REDACTED version of Ex 8 to the Patchen Declaration, #18 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex 8 to the Patchen Declaration, #19 Exhibit REDACTED version of Ex 9 to the Patchen Declaration, #20 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex 9 to the Patchen Declaration, #21 Exhibit REDACTED version of Ex 10 to the Patchen Declaration, #22 Exhibit UNREDACTED version of Ex 10 to the Patchen Declaration, #23 Exhibit Ex 11 to the Patchen Declaration, #24 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL [CIVIL LOCAL RULES 7-11 AND 79-5])(Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
January 23, 2018 47 CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #33 ) before Judge Lucy H. Koh previously noticed for 1/25/18 at 1:30 PM has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 1/25/18 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
January 22, 2018 46 Featured Case Order Requiring Defendants to File Unredacted License Agreement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 1/22/2018. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
January 18, 2018 45 Featured Case Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
January 18, 2018 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12034792.) filed by Baxalta Incorporated, Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/18/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
January 17, 2018 43 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
January 17, 2018 42 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
January 17, 2018 41 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
January 17, 2018 40 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Wang, Sue) (Filed on 1/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
November 7, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing pursuant to ECF No. #39 . Initial Case Management Conference continued to 2/7/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
November 7, 2017 39 Featured Case Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting in Part and Denying in Part #34 Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Dates.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
November 7, 2017 38 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Badke, Bradford) (Filed on 11/7/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
October 31, 2017 37 REPLY (re #33 MOTION to Dismiss , Or In The Alternative To Transfer This Action To The District Of Delaware ) filed byBaxalta Incorporated, Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan A. Patchen, #2 Exhibit 1 to Patchen Declaration)(Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/31/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
October 24, 2017 36 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #33 MOTION to Dismiss , Or In The Alternative To Transfer This Action To The District Of Delaware ) filed byBayer HealthCare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Opposition, #2 Declaration of John Teare In Support of Opposition, #3 Declaration of Alan Stevenson In Support of Opposition, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Decl. of A. Stevenson, #5 Declaration of Caroline Bercier In Support of Opposition, #6 Exhibit 1 to the Decl. of C. Bercier, #7 Exhibit 2 to the Decl. of C. Bercier, #8 Exhibit 3 to the Decl. of C. Bercier, #9 Exhibit 4 to the Decl. of C. Bercier, #10 Exhibit 5 to the Decl. of C. Bercier, #11 Exhibit 6 to the Decl. of C. Bercier, #12 Exhibit 7 to the Decl. of C. Bercier, #13 Exhibit 8 to the Decl. of C. Bercier, #14 Exhibit 9 to the Decl. of C. Bercier, #15 Exhibit 10 to the Decl. of C. Bercier, #16 Exhibit 11 to the Decl. of C. Bercier, #17 Proposed Order)(Badke, Bradford) (Filed on 10/24/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
October 23, 2017 35 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #34 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Dates [Civil Local Rule 6-3 and 16-2(D)] ) Plaintiff Bayer Healthcare LLC's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Dates filed byBayer HealthCare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Kevin) (Filed on 10/23/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
October 19, 2017 34 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference and Related Dates [Civil Local Rule 6-3 and 16-2(D)] filed by Baxalta Incorporated, Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics. Responses due by 10/23/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan A. Patchen, #2 Exhibit 1 to Patchen Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
October 10, 2017 33 MOTION to Dismiss , Or In The Alternative To Transfer This Action To The District Of Delaware filed by Baxalta Incorporated, Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 10/24/2017. Replies due by 10/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Angus Chen, #2 Exhibit 1 to Chen Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Chen Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Chen Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Chen Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Chen Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Chen Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Chen Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Chen Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Chen Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Chen Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Chen Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Chen Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Chen Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Chen Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Chen Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Chen Declaration, #18 Declaration of Jeffrey Prowda, #19 Declaration of Mark Wilson, #20 Proposed Order)(Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/10/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 28, 2017 32 Featured Case Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 28, 2017 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Grace L.W. St. Vincent on behalf of Bayer HealthCare LLC ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11756192.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/28/2017 filed by Bayer HealthCare LLC. (St. Vincent, Grace) (Filed on 9/28/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 25, 2017 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF PATENT NON-INFRINGEMENT against All Defendants. Filed byBayer HealthCare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Badke, Bradford) (Filed on 9/25/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 25, 2017 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Joseph O'Brien (O'Brien, Kevin) (Filed on 9/25/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 22, 2017 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bayer HealthCare LLC. Nektar Therapeutics served on 9/12/2017, answer due 10/3/2017. (Wang, Sue) (Filed on 9/22/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 22, 2017 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bayer HealthCare LLC. Baxalta US Inc. served on 9/12/2017, answer due 10/3/2017. (Wang, Sue) (Filed on 9/22/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 22, 2017 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bayer HealthCare LLC. Baxalta Incorporated served on 9/12/2017, answer due 10/3/2017. (Wang, Sue) (Filed on 9/22/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 21, 2017 25 Statement re #18 Notice (Other) in Opposition to Plaintiff's Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceedings by Baxalta Incorporated, Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan A. Patchen, #2 Exhibit 1 to Patchen Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Patchen Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Patchen Declaration)(Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/21/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 20, 2017 24 Featured Case Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 20, 2017 23 Featured Case Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 20, 2017 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Edgar Haug ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11733480.) filed by Baxalta Incorporated, Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics. (Haug, Edgar) (Filed on 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 20, 2017 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Angus Chen ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 097111733333.) Filing fee previously paid on Sep. 20, 2017 filed by Baxalta Incorporated, Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics. (Chen, Angus) (Filed on 9/20/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 19, 2017 20 NOTICE by Baxalta Incorporated, Baxalta US Inc., Nektar Therapeutics re #18 Notice (Other) of Intent to File Statement Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 3-13(c) (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 19, 2017 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Alan Patchen (Patchen, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 19, 2017 18 NOTICE by Bayer HealthCare LLC of Pendency of Other Action or Proceedings, pursuant to L.R. 3-13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Badke, Bradford) (Filed on 9/19/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 15, 2017 17 Featured Case Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 15, 2017 16 Featured Case Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 5, 2017 15 **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to Hon. Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for 11/29/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. A Joint Case Management Conference Statement is due 7-days before the scheduled conference date. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 5, 2017 14 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/camera. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 9/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 1, 2017 13 Summons Issued as to Baxalta US Inc.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 1, 2017 12 Summons Issued as to Baxalta Incorporated. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 1, 2017 11 Summons Issued as to Nektar Therapeutics. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 1, 2017 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
September 1, 2017 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bayer HealthCare LLC.. (De, Sona) (Filed on 9/1/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
August 31, 2017 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/21/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/28/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
August 31, 2017 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/14/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
August 31, 2017 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Caroline Bercier on behalf of Bayer HealthCare LLC ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11678108.) filed by Bayer HealthCare LLC. (Bercier, Caroline) (Filed on 8/31/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
August 31, 2017 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Bradford James Badke on behalf of Bayer HealthCare LLC ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11678068.) filed by Bayer HealthCare LLC. (Badke, Bradford) (Filed on 8/31/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
August 30, 2017 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sue Wang ON BEHALF OF BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC (Wang, Sue) (Filed on 8/30/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
August 30, 2017 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bayer HealthCare LLC (De, Sona) (Filed on 8/30/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
August 30, 2017 2 Proposed Summons. (De, Sona) (Filed on 8/30/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]
August 30, 2017 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF PATENT NON-INFRINGEMENT AND INVALIDITY against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11677626.). Filed byBayer HealthCare LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(De, Sona) (Filed on 8/30/2017) [Transferred from California Northern on 3/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bayer HealthCare LLC v. Nektar Therapeutics et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Flynn
Represented By: Rodger Dallery Smith, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxalta US Inc.
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Angus Chen
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Edgar H Haug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nektar Therapeutics
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Angus Chen
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Edgar H Haug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxalta Incorporated
Represented By: Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Represented By: Angus Chen
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Represented By: Edgar H Haug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?