Redmond et al v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case

Lawyers from the UK and the US have filed a class action lawsuit in federal court in Delaware alleging that Facebook, Cambridge Analytica, and two other companies misused the personal data of more one million people in the UK and over 70 million people in the US.

Plaintiff: Ben Redmond, Lindsay Rathert, Salvador Ramirez, Gerry Galipault, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods and Jordan Hunstone
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Global Science Research Ltd., Aleksandr Kogan, SCL Group Limited, SCL Elections Ltd., SCL USA Inc., Cambridge Analytica LLC, Cambridge Analytica Holdings LLC, Cambridge Analytica Commercial LLC and Cambridge Analytica Political LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00531
Filed: April 10, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2017)
Referring Judge: Mary Pat Thynge
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2018 Remark: Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:18-cv-03642, filed 06/18/2018. (fms)
June 18, 2018 Case transferred electronically to United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (fms)
June 18, 2018 23 TRANSFER ORDER by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring the action(s) on the attached schedule to the Northern District of California for the reasons stated in the order of June 6, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Vince Chhabria. (fms)
June 7, 2018 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Global Science Research Ltd. on 5/8/18. (Global Science Research Ltd. answer due 5/29/2018). (rwc)
June 7, 2018 Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Global Science Research Ltd. answer due 5/29/2018. (rwc)
June 6, 2018 21 PRAECIPE filed by David Gerard Holmes on behalf of Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods requesting Clerk to issue //Letter to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynge Regarding Service of Complaint on Global Science Research Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Holmes, David)
May 31, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Orin Snyder,Brian M. Lutz,Joshua S. Lipshutz,Kristin A. Linsley for Facebook, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (fms)
May 29, 2018 20 STATEMENT re 19 MOTION for Protective Order //Motion of Plaintiffs for Preservation Order - Statement Pursuant to D. Del. LR 7.1.1 by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Simon, Christopher)
May 23, 2018 19 MOTION for Protective Order //Motion of Plaintiffs for Preservation Order - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Simon, Christopher)
May 18, 2018 18 NOTICE of Suggestion By Defendant Facebook, Inc. of Bankruptcy of Defendants Cambridge Analytica LLC and SCL USA Inc. by Facebook, Inc. (Ross, David)
May 8, 2018 17 Letter to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge from Christopher P. Simon, Esq. regarding Notifying the Court of a related action. (Simon, Christopher)
May 3, 2018 16 SO ORDERED: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendant Facebook, Inc., subject to concurrence and order by the Court, that: 1. The requirement for Facebook to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, shall be stayed in this action pending the decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on the pending Motion to Transfer and for Consolidation (MDL No. 2843, Dkt. No. 1), subject to paragraph 2; 2. Should the Motion to Transfer and for Consolidation be denied, Facebook will have thirty (30) days from the date of such denial to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint; and 3. Plaintiffs and Facebook reserve all other rights.(cak)
May 3, 2018 15 Postal Receipt(s) for the mailing of process to Global Science Research Ltd. (crb)
May 3, 2018 14 Joint STIPULATION re 1 Complaint,, "Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding a Response of Facebook, Inc. to Complaint Pending JPML Ruling" by Facebook, Inc.. (Ross, David)
April 30, 2018 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Orin Snyder, Joshua S. Lipshutz, Brian M. Lutz and Kristin A. Linsley - filed by Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/30/18. (cak)
April 27, 2018 13 AFFIDAVIT of Christopher P. Simon, Esq. re Summons Issued, 12 Praecipe, Regarding Service of Process Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4(f)(2)(C)(ii) filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. (Simon, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 12 PRAECIPE filed by Christopher Page Simon on behalf of Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods requesting Clerk to issue Summons and Complaint upon Defendant Global Science Research Ltd. (Simon, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Salvador Ramirez, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods, Lindsay Rathert, Jordan Hunstone, Gerry Galipault. (Simon, Christopher)
April 27, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Global Science Research Ltd. on 4/10/2018. (jcs)
April 26, 2018 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Orin Snyder, Joshua S. Lipshutz, Brian M. Lutz and Kristin A. Linsley - filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motions referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(Ross, David)
April 26, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by David Evan Ross on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Ross, David)
April 26, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Cambridge Analytica Holdings LLC on 4/26/2018. (jcs)
April 26, 2018 8 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. Amendment to 7 Waiver of Service Executed,, . (Simon, Christopher)
April 24, 2018 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Salvador Ramirez, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods, Lindsay Rathert, Jordan Hunstone, Gerry Galipault: For Cambridge Analytica Commercial LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; Cambridge Analytica Holdings LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; Cambridge Analytica LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; Cambridge Analytica Political LLC waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; SCL Elections Ltd. waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; SCL Group Limited waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; SCL USA Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018. (Simon, Christopher)
April 24, 2018 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Salvador Ramirez, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods, Lindsay Rathert, Jordan Hunstone, Gerry Galipault: For Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018. (Simon, Christopher)
April 18, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED granting 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert F. Ruyak, Esquire, Korula T. Cherian, Esquire, Richard Ripley, Esquire and Rebecca Anzidei, Esquire of Ruyak Cherian LLP - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/18/18. (cak)
April 18, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED granting 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew Jury, Esquire of McCue & Partners, LLP - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/18/18. (cak)
April 18, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED granting 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard W. Fields, Esquire of Fields PLLC - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. Signed by Judge Mary Pat Thynge on 4/18/18. (cak)
April 17, 2018 ***NOTE: If the parties jointly consent to Chief Magistrate Judge Thynges jurisdiction to conduct all proceedings in this case, then the Pretrial Conference and Trial will be presided over by Judge Thynge consistent with 28 U.S.C. § 636. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be reassigned to a visiting District Judge, and any further dates in the Scheduling Order, including the Pretrial Conference and Trial dates, may be adjusted dependent on the availability of the visiting District Judge. (cak)
April 11, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) Motion referred to Mary Pat Thynge.(rjb)
April 11, 2018 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
April 10, 2018 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Robert F. Ruyak, Esquire, Korula T. Cherian, Esquire, Richard Ripley, Esquire and Rebecca Anzidei, Esquire of Ruyak Cherian LLP - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. (Holmes, David)
April 10, 2018 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Matthew Jury, Esquire of McCue & Partners, LLP - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. (Holmes, David)
April 10, 2018 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard W. Fields, Esquire of Fields PLLC - filed by Gerry Galipault, Jordan Hunstone, Salvador Ramirez, Lindsay Rathert, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods. (Holmes, David)
April 10, 2018 No Summons Issued. (nmfn)
April 10, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmfn)
April 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Cambridge Analytica Commercial LLC, Cambridge Analytica Holdings LLC, Cambridge Analytica LLC, Cambridge Analytica Political LLC, Facebook, Inc., Global Science Research Ltd., Aleksandr Kogan, SCL Elections Ltd., SCL Group Limited, SCL USA Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2358041.) - filed by Salvador Ramirez, Ben Redmond, Kyle Westendorf, Robert Woods, Lindsay Rathert, Jordan Hunstone, Gerry Galipault. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmfn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redmond et al v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Redmond
Represented By: David Gerard Holmes
Represented By: Christopher Page Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Rathert
Represented By: David Gerard Holmes
Represented By: Christopher Page Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Ramirez
Represented By: David Gerard Holmes
Represented By: Christopher Page Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Galipault
Represented By: David Gerard Holmes
Represented By: Christopher Page Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Westendorf
Represented By: David Gerard Holmes
Represented By: Christopher Page Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Woods
Represented By: David Gerard Holmes
Represented By: Christopher Page Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Hunstone
Represented By: David Gerard Holmes
Represented By: Christopher Page Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Science Research Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleksandr Kogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCL Group Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCL Elections Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCL USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Analytica LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Analytica Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Analytica Commercial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Analytica Political LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?