Compagnie des Grands Hotels d'Afrique S.A. v. Starwood Capital Group Global I LLC et al
Plaintiff: Compagnie des Grands Hotels d'Afrique S.A.
Defendant: Starwood Capital Group Global I LLC and Starman Hotel Holdings LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00654
Filed: April 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Andrews
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:207
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Defendant Starman's motion for issuance of a letter of request (D.I. 91 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/26/2019. (nms)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The motion for issuance of a letter of request (D.I. 82 ) is GRANTED. Starman's proposed alterations are DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/15/2019. (nms)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 15 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/9/2019. (nms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Compagnie des Grands Hotels d'Afrique S.A. v. Starwood Capital Group Global I LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compagnie des Grands Hotels d'Afrique S.A.
Represented By: Paul Damon Brown
Represented By: Cynthia Chen
Represented By: Joseph Benedict Cicero
Represented By: Charlita Mays
Represented By: David Spears
Represented By: Gregory Erich Stuhlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood Capital Group Global I LLC
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starman Hotel Holdings LLC
Represented By: Nicholas D. Mozal
Represented By: David Evan Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?