Monument Peak Ventures, LLC v. Hasselblad Inc.

Plaintiff: Monument Peak Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Hasselblad Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00732
Filed: May 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: Vacant Judgeship (2017)
1 Judge: Sherry R Fallon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Oral Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for 9/26/2018 at 10:00 M in Courtroom 6C before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the conference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 9/21/2018. The Court's form of scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/13/2018. (lih)
June 8, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly E. Farnan on behalf of Hasselblad Inc. (Farnan, Kelly)
May 30, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Marc C. Belloli,Margaret Elizabeth Day for Monument Peak Ventures, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (fms)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc Belloli and Margaret Elizabeth Day. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/29/2018. (lih)
May 24, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc Belloli and Margaret Elizabeth Day - filed by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Marc Belloli, #2 Certification of Margaret Elizabeth Day)Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Brauerman, Stephen)
May 24, 2018 **NOTE: If the parties jointly consent to Magistrate Judge Fallons jurisdiction to conduct all proceedings in this case, then the Pretrial Conference and Trial will be presided over by Judge Fallon consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be reassigned to a visiting District Judge, and any further dates in the Scheduling Order, including the Pretrial Conference and Trial dates, may be adjusted dependent on the availability of the visiting District Judge.** (lih)
May 23, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) (nms)
May 23, 2018 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (nms)
May 22, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen B. Brauerman on behalf of Monument Peak Ventures, LLC (Brauerman, Stephen)
May 16, 2018 Filing 18 Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 6/15/2018. (nmf)
May 16, 2018 Filing 17 Record of case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number in Other District: 2:18-cv-02214. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE: STIPULATED TRANSFER OF DEFENDANT HASSELBLAD INC. TO THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court hereby orders this case transferred as to Defendant Hasselblad Inc. to the United States District Court of Delaware. All dates and deadlines are vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 15 Joint STIPULATION for Order of the Transfer of Defendant Hasselblad, Inc to the District of Delaware filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Belloli, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 14 Effective April 19, 2018, Judge Rosenberg will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 550 on the 5th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 550 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil and criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services is located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hasselblad Inc. answer now due 5/10/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Hasselblad Inc..(Attorney Guy Ruttenberg added to party Hasselblad Inc.(pty:dft))(Ruttenberg, Guy) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. Notice of Pendency of Other Action Under Rule 83-1.4 (Belloli, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC, upon Defendant Hasselblad Inc. served on 3/20/2018, answer due 4/10/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon L. Gares, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Belloli, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-02210 RGK(AGRx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm and Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-02214 RGK(AGRx). Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Hasselblad A S, Hasselblad Inc., Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Belloli, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC, identifying Monument Patent Holdings, LLC. (Belloli, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Belloli, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Belloli, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21426781 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Monument Peak Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Marc C Belloli added to party Monument Peak Ventures, LLC(pty:pla))(Belloli, Marc) [Transferred from California Central on 5/16/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monument Peak Ventures, LLC v. Hasselblad Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hasselblad Inc.
Represented By: Kelly E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monument Peak Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Day
Represented By: Stephen B. Brauerman
Represented By: Marc C. Belloli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?