Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al.

Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01039
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Leonard P Stark
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Corrected document added to D.I. 17 per request of counsel. (ntl)
September 4, 2018 17 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Sarah K. Tsou - filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/5/2018) (ntl).
September 4, 2018 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Amanda Hollis, Jay P. Lefkowitz and Gregory Springsted - filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
September 4, 2018 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff's First Set of Common Requests for the Production of Documents and Things to All Defendants; and (2) Plaintiff's First Set of Common Interrogatories to All Defendants filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 31, 2018 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures of Accused Products and Asserted Patents; and (2) The File History for the Asserted Patent filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 29, 2018 13 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation.(Silver, Daniel)
August 27, 2018 12 PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Daniel M. Silver, Esq. regarding Proposed Scheduling Order)(Silver, Daniel)
August 8, 2018 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. filed by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Keller, Karen)
August 8, 2018 10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis Elizabeth LLC filed by Actavis Elizabeth LLC. (Keller, Karen)
August 8, 2018 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Elizabeth LLC.(Keller, Karen)
August 7, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Robert W. Trenchard for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS(ceg)
July 27, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jane M. Love for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS(dmp, )
July 27, 2018 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Andrew Blythe for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS(dmp, )
July 24, 2018 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Actavis Elizabeth LLC served on 7/18/2018, answer due 8/8/2018. (Silver, Daniel)
July 24, 2018 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re (6 in 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 6 in 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 6 in 1:18-cv-01043-LPS, 6 in 1:18-cv-01040-LPS) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Robert Trenchard, Paul E. Torchia, and Andrew P. Blythe filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/24/18. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS (ntl)
July 23, 2018 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jane M. Love, Robert Trenchard, Paul E. Torchia, and Andrew P. Blythe - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certifications for Jane M. Love, Robert Trenchard, Paul E. Torchia, and Andrew P. Blythe)(Silver, Daniel)
July 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01038-LPS, 1:18-cv-01039-LPS, 1:18-cv-01040-LPS, 1:18-cv-01043-LPS (rjb)
July 13, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Actavis Elizabeth LLC on 7/13/2018; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. on 7/13/2018. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (rwc)
July 13, 2018 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Novartis AG for Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (rwc)
July 13, 2018 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,187,405. (rwc)
July 13, 2018 3 Supplemental information for patent cases involving an Abbreviated New Drug Application (ANDA) - Date Patentee(s) Received Notice: 11/28/16. Date of Expiration of Patent: 6/25/27. (rwc)
July 13, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT - filed against Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2419104.) - filed by Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin A. Smyth
Represented By: Daniel M. Silver
Represented By: Michael P. Kelly
Represented By: Jane M. Love
Represented By: Andrew Blythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?