United States of America v. McMahon

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Cheryl McMahon
Case Number: 1:2018cv01053
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: Delaware District Court
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Richard G Andrews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Cheryl McMahon served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Welsh, Jennifer)
September 12, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: The executed summons filed at D.I. 3 has been removed from the docket as the service date was not entered for the party being served. Counsel shall refile the executed summons accordingly. (nms)
August 24, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Cheryl McMahon on 8/24/2018. Summons placed in U.S Attorney's Office mailbox. (crb)
July 18, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 17, 2018 No Summons Issued. (jcs)
July 17, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs)
July 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed against Cheryl McMahon - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. - filed by United States of America. ($400 Filing Fee Waived) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcs) Modified on 7/18/2018 (jcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer K. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?