Clemons v. New Castle County et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Clemons
Defendant: Lieutenant Colonel Quinton Watson, New Castle County, Matthew Meyer, Vanessa S. Phillips, Vaughn M. Bond, Jr. and New Castle County Police Department
Case Number: 1:2018cv01120
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Delaware
Office: Wilmington Office
County: New Castle
Presiding Judge: Maryellen Noreika
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, or in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement - filed by Vaughn M. Bond, Jr., Matthew Meyer, New Castle County, New Castle County Police Department, Vanessa S. Phillips, Lieutenant Colonel Quinton Watson.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Certificate of Service)(Inkell, Joshua) Modified on 9/25/2018 (dlw).
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,or in the alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement - filed by Vaughn M. Bond, Jr., Matthew Meyer, New Castle County, New Castle County Police Department, Vanessa S. Phillips, Lieutenant Colonel Quinton Watson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Inkell, Joshua) Modified on 9/25/2018 (dlw).
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORAL ORDER - The referral of this action to the Magistrate Judge is hereby WITHDRAWN. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 9/7/2018. (dlw)
August 31, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED D.I. #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to September 24, 2018 filed by Lieutenant Colonel Quinton Watson, Vaughn M. Bond, Jr., Vanessa S. Phillips, New Castle County Police Department, Matthew Meyer, New Castle County. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 8/13/2018. (dlb)
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to September 24, 2018 - filed by Vaughn M. Bond, Jr., Matthew Meyer, New Castle County, New Castle County Police Department, Vanessa S. Phillips, Lieutenant Colonel Quinton Watson. (Jacobson, Mary)
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Clemons. Lieutenant Colonel Quinton Watson served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. (Allen, Michele)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Clemons. Vanessa S. Phillips served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. (Allen, Michele)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Clemons. Vaughn M. Bond, Jr. served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. (Allen, Michele)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Clemons. Matthew Meyer served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. (Allen, Michele)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Clemons. New Castle County Police Department served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. (Allen, Michele)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Clemons. New Castle County served on 8/1/2018, answer due 8/22/2018. (Allen, Michele)
August 2, 2018 REMARK: If the parties jointly consent to have a Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, then when Judge Burke enters a case schedule he will enter the respective pre-trial conference and trial dates onto his calendar and will honor them. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued on May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), then upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be considered ready for reassignment to a visiting District Judge. Whether the pre-trial conference and trial dates will stand after reassignment will depend on the availability of those dates on the visiting District Judge's calendar. (dlb)
August 2, 2018 REMARK: The parties should be aware that the Court encourages the participation of newer attorneys in courtroom proceedings and at oral argument. Please see the Court's Standing Order Regarding Courtroom Opportunities for Newer Attorneys, a link to which is provided here for the parties' convenience:#http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/forms/StandingOrder2017.pdf (dlb)
August 1, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) (rjb)
August 1, 2018 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include initials of VAC after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
July 31, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Vaughn M. Bond, Jr. on 7/31/2018; Matthew Meyer on 7/31/2018; New Castle County on 7/31/2018; New Castle County Police Department on 7/31/2018; Vanessa S. Phillips on 7/31/2018; Lieutenant Colonel Quinton Watson on 7/31/2018. (crb)
July 31, 2018 No Summons Issued. (crb)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Vaughn M. Bond, Jr., Matthew Meyer, New Castle County, New Castle County Police Department, Vanessa S. Phillips, Lieutenant Colonel Quinton Watson - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2429022.) - filed by Melissa Clemons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Delaware District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clemons v. New Castle County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Colonel Quinton Watson
Represented By: Joshua J. Inkell
Represented By: Mary A. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Castle County
Represented By: Joshua J. Inkell
Represented By: Mary A. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Meyer
Represented By: Joshua J. Inkell
Represented By: Mary A. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa S. Phillips
Represented By: Joshua J. Inkell
Represented By: Mary A. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn M. Bond, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua J. Inkell
Represented By: Mary A. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Castle County Police Department
Represented By: Joshua J. Inkell
Represented By: Mary A. Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Clemons
Represented By: Michele D. Allen
Represented By: Caitlyn E. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?